Newthink LLC v. Lenevo Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:12-cv-00782
District Judge James C. Dever, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 12:08 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Newthink, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crumley Roberts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Leighton Kinsley +1 336 333 9899 +1 336 333 9894 blkinsley@crumleyroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline K. Burt +1 404 996 0861 +1 205 547 5502 jburt@hgdlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Miller +1 404 996 0863 +1 205 547 5506 jmiller@hgdlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Lenovo, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Lenovo, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Joseph Klein +1 214 969 2800 +1 214 969 4343 eklein@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Irvin Williams +1 512 499 6218 +1 512 499 6290 fwilliams@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond M. Bennett +1 919 755 2158 +1 919 755 6068 rbennett@wcsr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hayden J. Silver, III +1 919 755 2188 +1 919 755 6099 jsilver@wcsr.com
No Logo Newthink, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Newthink LLC. (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 58 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/25/2013. (Sawyer, D.) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
      Second MOTION to Stay Stipulated By The Parties Pending Settlement by Newthink LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Grantin Motion to Stay) (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 56 Motion to Stay Deadlines for a period of 30 days. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/24/2013. (Sawyer, D.) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by Lenovo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 3/22/2013. (Sawyer, D.) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
              Rule 26(f) Report (joint) by Newthink LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule) (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Fred I Williams on behalf of Lenovo, Inc. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Lenovo, Inc. (Klein, Eric) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Jonathan R. Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kinsley, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kinsley, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kinsley, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kinsley, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kinsley, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 1/14/2013. (Sawyer, D.) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond M. Bennett on behalf of Lenovo, Inc. (Bennett, Raymond) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Hayden J. Silver, III on behalf of Lenovo, Inc. (Silver, Hayden) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should reflect therevised case number 5:12-CV-782-D. Senior Judge James C. Fox no longer assigned to case. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 12/7/2012. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                        Letter from Susan Edwards, Deputy, to Counsel of Record advising of Local Rules 83.1(c) and 83.1(d). (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                          Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:12-cv-05443. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 28 defendant Lenovo Motion to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the USDC Eastern District of North Carolina at Raliegh. Entire case and documents electronically set to USDC Eastern District of North Carolina at Raliegh on 12/5/12. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (Attachments: # 1 cv 22). (lc) Modified on 12/5/2012 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Order Vacating Hearing on MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 and Scheduling Conference 22 scheduled for December 3, 2012 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary.The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report 36 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                  STATUS REPORT of MEETING OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc.. (Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Jacqueline K. Burt in opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of Bryan K. Mills in opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of Bryan Kelly Mills Opposition MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                            OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of David M. Stein in Support of MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 Supplemental Declaration of David M. Stein filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of David M. Stein In Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit B to Supplemental Declaration of David M. Stein In Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer)(Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Kurt Cranor MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina 28 filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc.. (Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of North Carolina filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Tranfser to the Eastern District of North Carolina, # 2 Declaration of David M. Stein re Certification of Conference with Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 7.3, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 21 filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Newthink LLC.(Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fred I. Williams on behalf of Defendant, designating David Stein as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric Klein on behalf of Defendant, designating David Stein as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Eric Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11029033 paid.) filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Fred I. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11028865 paid.) filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 12/3/12 1:30 PM; compliance with FRCP 26(f) and filing of report and other instructions. Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties,including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright II. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint 15 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Newthink LLC filed by defendant Lenovo, Inc..(lc) (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc. of Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims of Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc. to First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement. (Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Lenovo (United Sates) Inc. filed by Defendant Lenovo, Inc. identifying Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David M Stein on behalf of Defendant Lenovo, Inc. (Stein, David) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jacqueline Burt on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Jacqueline K. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10957636 paid.) filed by plaintiff Newthink LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Lenovo, Inc. amending Corrected Complaint 10 Jury Demand,filed by plaintiff Newthink LLC (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2012: # 1 exhibit A) (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Steven W Ritcheson counsel for Plaintiff Newthink LLC. Changing firm name to Heninger Garrison Davis. Changing e-mail to swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com. Adding Steven W. Ritcheson as attorney as counsel of record for Newthink, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Newthink, LLC (Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lenovo, Inc. answer now due 9/7/2012, filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC.(Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC, upon Defendant Lenovo, Inc. served on 7/19/2012, answer due 8/9/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Hughes - Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by plaintiff Newthink LLC, (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CORRECTED COMPLAINT against defendant Lenovo, Inc. correcting Complaint - (Discovery) 1 Jury Demand filed by plaintiff Newthink LLC (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2012: # 1 issued alias summons) (lc). Modified on 8/20/2012 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: re: Errata 8 .The Court accepts the Notice of Errata 8 and orders the clerks office tofile the Corrected Complaint and Corrected Certificate of Interested Party ONLYas of todays date. Counsel shall have summons on the corrected complaint issued by civil Intake section. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. correcting Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Complaint, # 2 Corrected Certification of Interested Parties)(Ritcheson, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER REGARDING PATENT CASES by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II:This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filling the motion. The Court hears motions on Mondays, Criminal at 10:00 a.m. and Civil at 1:30 p.m. The Court requires delivery of one non-blue backed Mandatory Chambers Copies of only the following manual and electronically filed documents to Judge Wrights document box outside the entrance to chambers near courtrooms 10 and 12: (1) All noticed motion and related documents; (2) All ex parte applications and related documents; and (3) All exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [ Refer to the Courts General Order No. 10-07 regarding ECF Courtesy paper Copies.] Attention ECF Attorneys- Chambers Email Addresses are available under your Utilities menu. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge George H. King. Case transferred from Judge George H. King to Judge Otis D Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads CV 12-05443 ODW(JCx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jacqueline Knapp Burt for Plaintiff Newthink LLC. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent (Initial Notification) filed by Newthink LLC. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Plaintiff Newthink LLC. (ghap) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Defendant Lenevo Inc. Case assigned to Judge George H. King for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Newthink LLC.(ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2012: # 1 Ntc of Asgmt, # 2 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 12/6/2012.] (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?