Rasetta et al v. Moore's Crane Rental Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10031-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis G. Rasetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Hadley Moore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Murphy +1 207 774 1200 +1 207 774 1127 dmurphy@bernsteinshur.com
No Logo Kennebunk Savings Bank, Defendant
No Logo Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Murphy +1 207 774 1200 +1 207 774 1127 dmurphy@bernsteinshur.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis B. Butterfield +1 207 774 6001 +1 207 775 6407 lbutterfield@moss-shapiro.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Barnstable
Terminated 10/5/2006
Origin 4
Reopened 11/29/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Nici, Richard)
    LREF
    Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of Suit by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Geiman, Gregory)
      LREF
      Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
        LREF
        Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Writ Issued
        WRIT of Attachment issued. (Russo, Noreen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 OrderCourt Filing
          Judge Robert B. Collings : AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTACHMENT OF PERSONAL PROPERTY OF DEFENDANT MOORE'S CRANE RENTAL CORP. (#20) entered.(Dolan, Kathleen)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
            Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order on Motion to Vacate
              Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [29] Motion to Vacate. The motion is ALLOWED to the extent that the amount of the attachment is reduced to $69,142.25; otherwise, the motion is DENIED. An Amended Order shall enter this date.
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Opposition to Motion
                Opposition re [29] MOTION to Vacate [28] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Motion to Vacate
                  MOTION to Vacate [28] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore.(Murphy, Daniel)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                    Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered granting [20] Motion for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Rental Crane Corp. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Order on Motion to Vacate
                      Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered reserving ruling on [29] Motion to Vacate. The Court shall await the plaintiff's response before ruling on the motion. However, the defendant is manifestly incorrect as to when his opposition was due. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(B)(2) (D. Mass.), the opposition was due within fourteen (14) days. Since this period of time is greater than eleven (11) days, Saturdays, Sundays and holiday are included. Rule 6(a). Fed. R. Civ. P. Accordingly, the opposition was due on February 15, 2006. The Court did not rule until the following week; no response/opposition had been filed when the Court ruled.
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING [20] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (With Notice) filed by John J. Shaughnessy,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4,, Christopher Barletta,, Louis G. Rasetta, to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings.(Rynne, Michelle)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta. Document received: Writ of Attachment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta. Document received: Finding and Order of Approval of Attachment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                              AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills in Support re [20] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (With Notice) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support re [20] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (With Notice) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Louis G. Rasetta in Support re [20] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (With Notice) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [20] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (With Notice) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006, Terminated: 2/23/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (With Notice) by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/31/2006. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Scheduling Conference
                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2006. Status report due 3/31/06. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Status Conference reset for 1/26/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Status Report
                                              STATUS REPORT by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/20/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status report due 12/13/05. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order on Motion to Reopen Case
                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [18] Motion to Reopen Case (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005, Terminated: 11/29/2005 Motion to Reopen Case
                                                    MOTION to Reopen Case by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: [17] settlement order pdf replaced to correct case caption on order. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Rynne, Michelle) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2005 (Rynne, Michelle).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Terminated Case
                                                          Civil Case Terminated. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [15] Motion for Discharge of attachment by trustee process. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005, Terminated: 8/4/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                              MOTION to Stay Proceedings by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005, Terminated: 8/4/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION For Discharge of Attachment by Trustee Process re [3] MOTION for Order to Motion for an Order of Attachment by Trustee Process by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Louis Butterfield for Moore's Crane Rental Corp. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Receipt
                                                                    Receipt #64178 $50 for Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 5/17/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Louis Butterfield by Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Visiting Attorney's Certificate)(Murphy, Daniel) Modified on 5/17/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore. (Murphy, Daniel)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Answer
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore.(Murphy, Daniel)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
                                                                            SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Kennebunk Savings Bank served on 3/21/2005, answer due 4/11/2005. (Sills, Anne)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Moore's Crane Rental Corp. served on 3/22/2005, answer due 4/11/2005; Hadley Moore served on 3/22/2005, answer due 4/11/2005. (Sills, Anne)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER of Trustee by Kennebunk Savings Bank. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered granting [3] Motion for Order of Attachment by Trustee Process in the amount of $113,638.76. The file is returned to the Clerk's Office with instructions that the Clerk issue the requested attachments on trustee process in the amount approved. (Irwin, Nancy)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [3] MOTION for Order to Motion for an Order of Attachment by Trustee Process filed by John J. Shaughnessy,, Louis G. Rasetta, to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] MOTION for Order to Motion for an Order of Attachment by Trustee Process filed by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Motion for an Order of Attachment by Trustee Process by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                Certificate re Trustee Process by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore, Kennebunk Savings Bank. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Moore's Crane Rental Corp., Hadley Moore, Kennebunk Savings Bank Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61258, filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis G. Rasetta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Cover sheet)(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?