Chambers et al v. Hill et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10061-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Beverly Chambers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
Space Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com
No Logo Dennis Renfroe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
Space Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com
No Logo Diane Kowlaski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
Space Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com
No Logo Richard Chambers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
Space Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com
v.
No Logo A.J.C. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Charles B. Curtis, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth T. Kennan, Defendant
No Logo George Putnam, III, Defendant
No Logo Jameson Adkins Baxter, Defendant
No Logo John A. Hill, Defendant
No Logo John Doe's No. 1 through 100, Defendant
No Logo John H. Mullin, III, Defendant
No Logo Paul L. Joskow, Defendant
No Logo Putnam Investment Managment, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Putnam Investments, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Robert E Patterson, Defendant
No Logo Ronald J. Jackson, Defendant
No Logo W. Nicholas Thorndike, Defendant
No Logo W. Thomas Stephens, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Barnstable
Terminated 4/28/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Pastor (Pastor, David)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Nicewicz, Craig)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Summons Returned Executed
      SUMMONS Returned Executed Putnam Investments, Inc., served on 1/27/2005, answer due 2/16/2005. (Barrette, Mark)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Summons Returned Executed
        SUMMONS Returned Executed Putnam Investment Managment, Inc. served on 1/27/2005, answer due 2/16/2005. (Barrette, Mark)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by all plaintiffs (Pastor, David)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Remark
            Remark: Clerk called counsel in California to find out party designation so that Motion to Transfer and Consolidate by Franklin Advisors, Inc. could be docketed. Counsel stated that they would have to contact original counsel in Virginia to obtain information. (Barrette, Mark)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Complaint
              Class Action COMPLAINT against John A. Hill, Jameson Adkins Baxter, Charles B. Curtis, Ronald J. Jackson, Paul L. Joskow, Elizabeth T. Kennan, John H. Mullin, III, Robert E. Patterson, George Putnam, III, A.J.C. Smith, W. Thomas Stephens, W. Nicholas Thorndike, Putnam Investments, Inc.,, Putnam Investment Managment, Inc., John Doe's No. 1 through 100 Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61345, filed by Diane Kowlaski, Dennis Renfroe, Richard Chambers, Beverly Chambers. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrette, Mark)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Summons Issued
                Summons Issued as to John A. Hill, Jameson Adkins Baxter, Charles B. Curtis, Ronald J. Jackson, Paul L. Joskow, Elizabeth T. Kennan, John H. Mullin, III, Robert E. Patterson, George Putnam, III, A.J.C. Smith, W. Thomas Stephens, W. Nicholas Thorndike, Putnam Investments, Inc.,, Putnam Investment Managment, Inc., John Doe's No. 1 through 100. (Barrette, Mark)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to the New Magistrate Judge. (Barrette, Mark)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 54 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?