Rasetta et al v. Crane Rental Co., Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10071-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis G. Rasetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Banknorth, NA, Defendant
No Logo Crane Rental Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Feinman Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. Feinman +1 978 475 0080 +1 978 475 0852 mbf@feinmanlaw.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/11/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Suffolk
Terminated 5/18/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Terminate Motions
Motions terminated pending the resolution of Bankruptcy proceedings. MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, [23]MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [14]MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant filed by John J. Shaughnessy et al...(note: court will re-visit the above motions if necessary, once bankruptcy proceedings are resolved.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
    LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Answer
    ANSWER of Trustee by Banknorth N.A.. (Filo, Jennifer)
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE STAY/CLOSING entered. (Filo, Jennifer)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Terminated Case
        Civil Case Terminated. (Filo, Jennifer)
          LREF
          Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crane Rental Co., Inc. re [28] Suggestion of Bankruptcy. (Feinman, Michael)
            LREF
            Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
            SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Crane Rental Company, Inc. by Crane Rental Co., Inc.. (Feinman, Michael)
              LREF
              Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
              SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Banknorth N.A. served on 5/11/2005, answer due 5/31/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci re [24] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                  Proposed Document(s) submitted by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. Document received: Order for Temporary Restraining Order. (Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [23] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (With Notice) filed by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment to Memorandum - TRO# (2) Exhibit Attachment to Memorandum - TRO(1of2)# (3) Exhibit Attachment to Memorandum - TRO(2of2)# (4) Exhibit Attachment to Memorandum - TRO)(Geiman, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion for TRO
                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (With Notice) by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. Document received: Order for Preliminary Injunction. (Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci re [19] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [16] MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B1 - (1of2)# (3) Exhibit Exhibit B2 (2of2)# (4) Exhibit Exhibit C)(Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Exhibit
                              EXHIBIT re [16] MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Exhibit
                                EXHIBIT re [16] MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Attachment to Amended Complaint)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                  MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Summons to Trustee Issued
                                    Summons to Trustee Issued as to Banknorth N.A.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant filed by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) proposed writ of attachment# (3) Affidavit James Bucci# (4) Affidavit Anne R. Sills)(Filo, Jennifer)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                          Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion for Reconsideration: Upon review of the affidavit submitted in connection with the Motion for Reconsideration and the memorandum of law, I conclude that plaintiffs have met the requirements of G.L. c. 246 section 1 -- that there is a reasonable likelihood that the plaintiff will recover judgment in an amount equal to or greater than the amount of the trustee process over and above any liability insurance known or reasonably believed to be available, and that there is a clear danger that the defendant will dissipate assets. While plaintiff's initial motion sought an ex parte attachment, the instant motion was served on the defendant. Defendant has offered no evidence countering the plaintiff's submission on either front. Accordingly, trustee proess will issue in the amount of $255,993.39. (Gertner, Nancy)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crane Rental Co., Inc. re [11] Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. (Feinman, Michael)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                              Opposition re [10] MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Order filed by Crane Rental Co., Inc.. (Feinman, Michael)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crane Rental Co., Inc. re [8] Answer to Complaint. (Feinman, Michael)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Rental Co., Inc..(Feinman, Michael)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Crane Rental Co., Inc. served on 3/22/2005, answer due 4/11/2005. (Sills, Anne)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Affidavit
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman re [10] MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Order by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Order by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Order on Motion for Order
                                                          Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered denying [2] Motion for Order of Trustee Process. (Gertner, Nancy)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of Certificate Re Trustee Process by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta re [2] MOTION for Order (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills re [2] MOTION for Order by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Affidavit
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci re [2] MOTION for Order by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION for an Ex Parte Order of Attachment by Trustee Process filed by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                    MOTION for an Ex Parte Order of Attachment by Trustee Process by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                      Summons Issued as to Crane Rental Co., Inc., Banknorth N.A.. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Crane Rental Co., Inc., Banknorth N.A. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61351, filed by Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?