LACHANCE v. HARRINGTON, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:94-cv-04383
District Judge WILLIAM H. YOHN, JR, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge WILLIAM H. YOHN, JR
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 1:26 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo SANDRA LACHANCE, Plaintiff

Represented by ABBEY GARDY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN T. RODD +1 212 889 3700 + 212 684 5191

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene A. Spector +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 espector@srkw-law.com

Represented by STARR AND HOLMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ZACHARY A. STARR

Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 abrody@ssbny.com
v.
No Logo JOHN J. TURCHI, JR., Defendant
No Logo KEVIN HARRINGTON, Defendant

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abbe F. Fletman +1 215 279 9388 abbe.fletman@flastergreenberg.com

Represented by Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK L. ALDERMAN
No Logo MARK P. HERSHHORN, Defendant
No Logo NATIONAL MEDIA, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS FUNDS. ORDER THAT MILBERG BERSHAD HNES & LERACH LLP BE PAID THE SUM OF $4,311.70 FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND IN REIMBURSEMENT OF ITS EXPENSES INCURRED IN CONNECTION WITH ADMINISTERING THE SETTLEMENT HEREIN, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 8/6/97 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED; 8/5/97 COPIES FAXED. (fe) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: None
MOTION by PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE FOR DISBURSEMENT OF CLASS FUNDS , (jl) (Entered: 07/09/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/14/1997, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S MEMO DATED 4/2/97 IS AMENDED, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 4/14/97 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED 4/14/97. (sc) (Entered: 04/14/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS FINAL JUDGMENT, THE COURT ADOPTS AND INCORPORATES THE DEFINITIONS IN THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, ETC. THIS ACTION IS HEREBY DISMISSED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, WITHOUT COSTS, ETC. PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN THE ACTION ARE HEREBY AWARDED ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $323,428.75 AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSE IN THE AMOUNT OF $86,801.68, TO BE PAID IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 4/3/97 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 04/03/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: None
Transcript of Hearing on 1/24/97. (fe) (Entered: 03/05/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: None
Minute entry: Settlement Hearing on 1/24/97 at 2:00 p.m. (fe) (Entered: 01/28/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: None
Supplemental Affidavit of Steven G. Schulman Re: in support of joint petition for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses. (fe) (Entered: 01/24/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: None
JOINT APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, (fe) (Entered: 01/06/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: None
Affidavit of Steven G. Schulman Re: in support of approval of the proposed settlement. (fe) (Entered: 12/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: None
Memorandum by PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE in support of proposed settlement. (fe) (Entered: 12/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: None
ORDER WITH RESPECT TO NOTICE, HEARING AND ADMINISTRATION OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. A HEARING (THE "SETTLEMENT HEARING") SHALL BE HELD BEFORE THIS COURT ON 1/24/97 AT 2:00 P.M., COURTROOM 3-B, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 9/17/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 09/17/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: None
Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing by PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE. (fe) (Entered: 08/21/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/13/1996, Entered: None
Minute entry: Hearing on 8/8/96 at 4:30 p.m. (fe) (Entered: 08/14/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: None
Transcript of Hearing on 8/8/96. (fe) (Entered: 08/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: None
ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE IS SCHEDULED FOR 8/8/96 AT 4:15 P.M. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 8/5/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED; 8/2/96 COPIES FAXED. (fe) (Entered: 08/05/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: None
MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE , MEMORANDUM. (fe) (Entered: 07/23/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED, ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT SANDRA LACHANCE, BRUCE EFRON AND PHILIP COHEN ARE APPOINTED AS CLASS REPRESENTATIVES. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 7/10/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 07/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED. THE FOLLOWING CLASS IS CERTIFIED PURSUANT TO RULES 23(a) AND 23(b)(3) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT SANDRA LACHANCE, BRUCE EFRON AND PHILIP COHEN ARE APPOINTED AS CLASS REPRESENTATIVES. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. ) 4/30/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (fe) (Entered: 04/30/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None
Response by DEFENDANT KEVIN HARRINGTON, DEFENDANT MARK P. HERSHHORN, DEFENDANT JOHN J. TURCHI JR., DEFENDANT NATL MEDIA to plaintiffs' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, Certificate of Service. (fe) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION , MEMORANDUM, AFFIDAVIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fe) (Entered: 03/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CLASS CERTIFICATION IS NOT APPROVED AS OF THIS TIME, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR.) 2/8/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (cl) (Entered: 02/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS' UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR AN ORDER WITH RESPECT TO NOTICE, SETTLEMENT HEARING AND ADMINISTRATION IS DENIED AS MOOT. (SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR.) 2/8/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (cl) (Entered: 02/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: None
UNCONTESTED MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE FOR ORDER WITH RESPECT TO NOTICE, SETTLEMENT HEARING AND ADMISTRATION , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fe) (Entered: 01/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: None
Copy of defendants' cross-motion for conditional class certification with exhibit A. (fe) (Entered: 08/31/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: None
CROSS MOTION BY DEFENDANTS FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fe) (Entered: 08/28/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: None
MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SANDRA LACHANCE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fe) (Entered: 08/14/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER, THAT THE ABOVE ENTITLED ACTIONS (94-4383 AND 94-6800) ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES AND THAT CIVIL ACTION NO. 94-4383 SHALL BE THE LEAD CASE; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED UNDER CIVIL ACTION 94-4383; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED NOVEMBER 2, 1994 IN CA 94-4383 SHALL APPLY TO THE CONSOLIDATED CASE; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT CIVIL ACTION 94-6800 IS HEREBY CLOSED FOR STATISCAL PURPOSES. (SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR.), 2/24/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 02/24/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: None
SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CUTOFF 7/3/95; DEADLINE FOR FILING OF MOTINS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 7/3/95; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM DUE WITHIN TEN DAYS AFTER THE CLOSE OF THE DISCOVERY PERIOD; DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM DUE WITHIN TWENTY DAYS AFTER THE CLOSE OF THE DISCOVERY PERIOD; TRIAL DATE FOR 9/5/95 AT 10:00 A.M. (SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR.), 11/3/94 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: None
Answer to complaint by DEFENDANT KEVIN HARRINGTON, DEFENDANT MARK P. HERSHHORN, DEFENDANT JOHN J. TURCHI JR., DEFENDANT NATIONAL MEDIA (Attorney MARK L. ALDERMAN), certificate of service. (fe) (Entered: 09/15/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/1994, Entered: None
ORDER, REASSIGNING FROM THE CALENDAR OF JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA TO THE CALENDAR OF JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. (SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ) 8/3/94 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 08/03/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/19/1994, Entered: None
Complaint. filing fee $ 120.00 receipt # 531032 (tj) (Entered: 07/19/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 99 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?