NUMEREX CORP., et al v. , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-04378
District Judge Stewart Dalzell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 1:48 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DAVID GROSS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Craig

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC TOPAZ + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 abrody@ssbny.com
No Logo JOHN EADES, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo CHARLES L. McNEW, Defendant
No Logo EUGENE J. WHITE, Defendant
No Logo FREDERICK C. SHAY, Defendant
No Logo Gwynedd Resources, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH H. FAY +1 215 963 5712 efay@morganlewis.com
No Logo KENNETH F. MANSER, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN, Defendant
No Logo Numerex Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander D. Bono +1 215 979 1181 +1 215 689 4472 abono@duanemorris.com
No Logo PRUDENTIAL BACHE SECURITIES, Defendant
No Logo Prudential Securities Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "PRUDENTIAL SECURITIES INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Jay Levin +1 215 665 8500 +1 215 864 9755 levinmj@ballardspahr.com
No Logo RICHARD L. MOOERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Pieslak Pohlmann +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 kpohlmann@morganlewis.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL ARE HEREBY DIRECTED TO DONATE THE AFORESAID $23,038.00 TO THE PUBLIC INTEREST CIVIL LITIGATION FUND, A NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION THAT SUPPORTS LEGAL SERVICES FOR THE POOR IN CASES FILED IN THIS DISTRICT. UPON REMISSION TO THIS COURT OF THE DONATION SPECIFIED IN THE PRECEDING PARAGRAPH, PLFF'S CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR ARE HEREBY DISCHARGED FROM ANY FURTHER RESPONSIBILITY IN CONNECTION WITH THE SETTLEMENT OF THIS CASE. THIS ORDER SUPERSEDES THE ORDER ENTERED ON 8/1/01. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 9/13/01 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gn) (Entered: 09/13/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None
    ORDER THAT PLFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO DONATE ANY UNCLAIMED SETTLEMENT FUNDS REMAINING AFTER TAXES TO THE PUBLIC INTEREST CIVIL LITIGATION FUND, A NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION THAT SUPPORTS LEGAL SERVICES FOR THE POOR. UPON REMISSION TO THIS COURT OF THE DONATION SPECIFIED IN THE PRECEDING PARAGRAPH, PLFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR ARE HEREBY DISCHARGEFD FROM ANY FURTHER RESPONSIBILITY IN CONNECTION WITH THE SETTLEMENT OF THIS CASE. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 8/2/01 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED ON 8/1/01. (gn) Modified on 08/02/2001 (Entered: 08/02/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None
      ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND TO VALID CLAIMANTS, ALLOWING LATE-FILED CLAIMS, DISALLOWING REJECTED CLAIMS, AND ALLOWING RETENTION OF RESERVE FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES IS GRANTED, ETC. (SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL) 12/11/98 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (adr) (Entered: 12/11/1998)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: None
        MOTION by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES FOR ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND TO VALID CLAIMANTS, ALLOWING LATE-FILED CLAIMS, DISALLOWING REJECTED CLAIMS, AND ALLOWING RETENTION OF RESERVE FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn) (Entered: 11/04/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
          Certified copy of order from USCA dated 11/20/97 re: The foregoing motion is hereby granted. This matter is hereby dismissed pursuant to FRAP 42(b). (gn) (Entered: 11/20/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: None
            ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT THAT THE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED, ETC. THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY ON THE MERITS AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND MEMBERS OF THE CLASS, ETC. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS ACTION STATISTICALLY. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 3/3/97 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (fe) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: None
              Supplemental Memorandum of PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES in support of petition for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of litigation costs and expenses and award to four of the six plffs, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 02/26/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: None
                ORDER THAT BY 2:00 P.M. ON 2/26/97, PLFFS' COUNSEL SHALL FILE & DELIVER TO CHAMBERS A MEMORANDUM ADDRESSING: 1. WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ADOPT THE PERCENTAGE OF RECOVERY APPROVED IN THE BIOSCIENCE OPINION AFTER THE METICULOUS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION OF THE HON. ARLIN M. ADAMS IN THAT MATTER, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 2/24/97 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw) (Entered: 02/24/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: None
                  Joint Affidavit of Sherrie R. Savett & Stuart H. Savett in support of settlement, joint petition for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses and award of incentive payments, Certificate of Service. (gn) Modified on 02/21/1997 (Entered: 02/21/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: None
                    Petition of PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES for an award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of litigation costs and expenses and award to four of the six plffs, Certificate of Service. (Exhibit attached) (gn) Modified on 02/21/1997 (Entered: 02/21/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: None
                      MOTION by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES FOR APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn) (Entered: 02/21/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: None
                        Notice of Pendency of Class Action, conditional class determination, proposed settlement of class action and settlement hearing. (gn) (Entered: 01/09/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: None
                          Stipulation of Settlement. (gn) (Entered: 12/19/1996)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: None
                            ORDER GRANTING PLFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF A SETTLEMENT CLASS. THE TERMS OF THESTIPULATION AND THE SETTLEMENT IT CONTAINS ARE PRELIMINARILY APPROVED SUBJECT TO FURTHER CONSIDERATION AT A HEARING WHICH SHALL BE HELD ON 2/26/97 AT 4:00PM IN COURTROOM 5C. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 12/18/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gn) (Entered: 12/18/1996)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: None
                              MOTION BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF A SETTLEMENT CLASS , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fb) (Entered: 12/16/1996)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: None
                                Certified copy of order from USCA dated 11/22/96 re: The foregoing motion to remand to the district court for consideration of settlement is granted. (gn) (Entered: 11/25/1996)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
                                  Copy of Clerk's notice to USCA re: [28-1] appeal . (gn) (Entered: 02/20/1996)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
                                    Notice of appeal by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES, NOTICE ONLY LEWIS N. EPPIHIMER, NOTICE ONLY RUTH E. EPPIHIMER from the order entered on 1/24/96. Fee Status: $105.00 . Appeal record due on 3/17/96 Copies to: JUDGE STEWART DALZELL , Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk, and DEBORAH R. GROSS, KAREN ANNE PIESLAK, ELIZABETH H. FAY, ALEXANDER D. BONO, MARK J. LEVIN, JULES BRODY, MARC TOPAZ, ANDREW L. BARROWAY, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 02/20/1996)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED; AND THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE STATISTICALLY. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 1/24/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 01/24/1996)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: None
                                        ORDER THAT THE PARTIES PROFFERED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DISAPPROVED. (SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL). 1/5/96 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (fe) (Entered: 01/05/1996)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: None
                                          Joinder by DEFENDANT RICHARD L. MOOERS, DEFENDANT GWYNEDD RESOURCES in the reply memorandum of defts Numerex, et al in support of their motion to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 12/20/1995)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: None
                                            Supplemental Memorandum by DEFENDANT NUMEREX CORPORATION, DEFENDANT EUGENE J. WHITE, DEFENDANT CHARLES L. McNEW, DEFENDANT FREDERICK C. SHAY, DEFENDANT KENNETH F. MANSER, DEFENDANT MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN in support of joint motion to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 12/20/1995)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: None
                                              Reply Memorandum by DEFENDANT NUMEREX CORPORATION, DEFENDANT EUGENE J. WHITE, DEFENDANT CHARLES L. McNEW, DEFENDANT FREDERICK C. SHAY, DEFENDANT KENNETH F. MANSER, DEFENDANT MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN, DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL SECURITIE, DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL BACHE SE supporting their motion to dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 12/19/1995)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                Opposition by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES to defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, Certificate of Service. (fe) (Entered: 12/08/1995)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER DENYING DEFTS' CROSS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER STAYING ALL DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. GRANTING PLFFS' MOTION FOR ADOPTION OF PLFFS' PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 11/27/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 11/27/1995)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THAT DISCOVERY BE COMPLETED BY 6/17/96. THE PARTIES WILL SUBMIT A STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER TO THE COURT FOR ITS CONSIDERATION BY 12/12/95. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BE FILED AND SERVED BY 9/30/96. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 11/27/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 11/27/1995)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                      Joinder by DEFENDANT RICHARD L. MOOERS, DEFENDANT GWYNEDD RESOURCES in the response of defts Numerex Corp. et al opposing plffs' motion for adoption of proposed case management plan, and cross motion for protective order staying all discovery pending resolution of motions to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 11/21/1995)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                        Joinder by DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL SECURITIE, DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL BACHE SE in the response of deft NUMEREX CORP. ET AL opposing plffs' motion for adoption of proposed case management plan and cross motion for protective order staying all discovery pending resolution of motions to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 11/20/1995)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                          Response by DEFENDANT NUMEREX CORPORATION, DEFENDANT EUGENE J. WHITE, DEFENDANT CHARLES L. McNEW, DEFENDANT KENNETH F. MANSER, DEFENDANT MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN in opposition to plffs' motion for adoption of plffs' proposed case management plan, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (gn) Modified on 11/20/1995 (Entered: 11/20/1995)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                            Memorandum by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES in support of their case management plan and discovery schedule, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES FOR ADOPTION OF PLFFS' PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn) (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER THAT PLFF MAY RESPOND TO DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS BY 12/7/95. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 11/14/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 11/14/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                  Joinder by DEFENDANT RICHARD L. MOOERS, DEFENDANT GWYNEDD RESOURCES in the JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 11/13/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                    JOINT MOTION by DEFENDANT NUMEREX CORPORATION, DEFENDANT EUGENE J. WHITE, DEFENDANT CHARLES L. McNEW, DEFENDANT FREDERICK C. SHAY, DEFENDANT KENNETH F. MANSER, DEFENDANT MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN, DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL SECURITIE, DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL BACHE SE TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn) (Entered: 11/08/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn) (Entered: 11/07/1995)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                        Consolidated Class Action Complaint by PLAINTIFF DAVID GROSS, PLAINTIFF JOHN EADES, Certificate of Service. (gn) (Entered: 10/23/1995)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH VII.A OF OUR 9/7/95 ORDER IS AMENDED TO PROVIDE THAT A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY 10/20/95; AND ALL SUBSEQUENT DEADLINES IN THE 9/7/95 ORDER ARE EXTENDED BY 10 DAYS. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 10/10/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 THAT ALL PLEADINGS IN ACTIONS 95-4761 AND 95-4762 BE FILED UNDER 95-4378 AND BE TITLED WITH THE CAPTION: IN RE: NUMEREX CORPORATION SECURITIES LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT WHEN A PLEADING IS INTENDED TO BE APPLICABLE TO ALL OF THE ACTIONS ALREADY CONSOLIDATED OR TO BE CONSOLIDATED BY THIS ORDER, THE WORDS "ALL ACTIONS" SHALL APPEAR IMMEDIATELY BELOW THE WORDS "THIS DOCUMENT RELATES TO:" IN THE CAPTION SET FORTH, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 9/8/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 09/08/1995)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                              Entry of Appearance of ELIZABETH H. FAY for DEFENDANT GWYNEDD RESOURCES, LTD., withdrawal of appearance of Alexander D. Bono, Esq., certificate of service. (aa) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR THE DEFTS PRUDENTIAL BACHE SE, and PRUDENTIAL SECURITIE (Attorney: MARK J. LEVIN) until 9/20/95 to answer the complaint. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 8/14/95 ENTERED AND MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 08/14/1995)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE CAPTIONED ACTIONS 95-4378, 95-4761 AND 95-4762 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES BEFORE THIS COURT PURSUANT TO RULE 42(a) OF THE FRCP. ALL PLEADINGS SHALL BE, EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY, FILED UNDER 95-4278 AND BE TITLED WITH THE FOLLOWING OPTION: IN RE: NUMEREX CORPORATION SECURITIES LITIGATION AND PLFFS' COUNSEL SHALL FORTHWITH SERVE COPIES OF THIS ORDER UPON ALL DEFTS IN THE CONSOLIDATED CASES. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 8/8/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 08/08/1995)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' NUMERREX CORP., EUGENE J. WHITE, CHARLES L. MCNEW, FREDERICK C. SHAY, KENNETH F. MANSWER, RICHARD L. MOOERS, MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN AND GWYNEDD RESOURCES, LTD. TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 9/20/95 (Attorney: ALEXANDER D. BONO) ( SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ) 8/7/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn) (Entered: 08/07/1995)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                      Acceptance of service by A. Bono, Esq. re: accepted summons and complaint for DEFENDANT NUMEREX CORPORATION, DEFENDANT EUGENE J. WHITE, DEFENDANT CHARLES L. McNEW, DEFENDANT FREDERICK C. SHAY, DEFENDANT KENNETH F. MANSER, DEFENDANT RICHARD L. MOOERS, DEFENDANT MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN, DEFENDANT GWYNEDD RESOURCES on 7/28/95 . (ph) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                        Affidavit of: Gerard Menichini re: served summons and complaint upon DEFENDANT NUMEREX CORPORATION, DEFENDANT EUGENE J. WHITE, DEFENDANT CHARLES L. McNEW, DEFENDANT FREDERICK C. SHAY, DEFENDANT KENNETH F. MANSER, DEFENDANT RICHARD L. MOOERS, DEFENDANT MATTHEW J. FLANIGAN . Served by: personal service on 7/21/95 . (gn) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                          Complaint. filing fee $ 120 receipt # 56680 (mrs) (Entered: 07/17/1995)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?