Edwards, et al v. Snowden, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 15-3032

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 6:04 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009412609 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
[10262349] Mandate issued. [15-3032]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009412606 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    [10262348] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [15-3032]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009412414 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      [10262216] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Horace B. Edwards, John and Jane Does 1-10 to dismiss case. Served on: 04/08/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [15-3032] JL
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009403167 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        [10257162] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion for 14-day extension of time to file memo. brief. Appellant's memorandum brief now due 04/06/2015 for Horace B. Edwards. Served on 03/23/2015. [15-3032]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009402947 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          [10257052] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Horace B. Edwards to extend time to file appellant's memo. brief until 04/06/2015. Served on: 03/20/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [15-3032] --[Edited 03/23/2015 by SLS to correct docket relief.] JL
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009402252 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            [10256665] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Horace B. Edwards. Served on 03/19/2015. Manner of Service: email. [15-3032] JL
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009401468 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              [10256281] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Jean Lamfers for Mr. Horace B. Edwards. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/19/2015. Manner of Service: email. [15-3032]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009399813 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                [10255491] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/17/2015. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 04/27/2015 for Horace B. Edwards. [15-3032]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 01009388691 Filed: 2/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  [10249723] Order filed by Judges Hartz and Phillips denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellant Mr. Horace B. Edwards (see order for details). [15-3032]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009388683 Filed: 2/22/2015, Entered: None
                    [10249721] Petition for rehearing, for rehearing en banc filed by Mr. Horace B. Edwards. Original and 12 copies. Served on 02/22/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [15-3032] JL
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 01009388632 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                    [10249704] Order filed by Hartz and Phillips denying Appellant's motion for injunction filed by Appellant Mr. Horace B. Edwards. The motion for leave to exceed page limit is granted. All other motions are denied. Served on 02/20/2015. [15-3032]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009388459 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                      [10249634] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Horace B. Edwards to seal transcript & DVD. Served on 02/20/2015. Manner of Service: email. [15-3032]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009388453 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                        [10249633] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Horace B. Edwards requesting permission to exceed page limit. Served on 02/20/2015. Manner of Service: email. [15-3032]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009388396 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                          [10249617] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Horace B. Edwards to expedite case and for injunction pending appeal. Served on 02/20/2015. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/20/2015 by BV - To attach addition exhibits] [15-3032]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009387563 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                            [10249205] Civil case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/19/2015. Fee is due by 03/05/2015 for Horace B. Edwards. Docketing statement due 03/05/2015 for Horace B. Edwards. Transcript order form due 03/05/2015 for Jean Lamfers. Notice of appearance due on 03/05/2015 for Horace B. Edwards, Participant Media, LLC, Laura Poitras, Praxis Films, Inc., Jeffrey Skoll, Weinstein Company LLC and Diane Weyermann. [15-3032]--[Edited 02/19/2015 by KLP to attached the preliminary record prepared by district court.]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 58 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?