LaSala v. RBC Dain Rauscher, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-04839
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 11:53 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph P. LaSala, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Schiffrin +1 610 667 7706 + 610 667 7056
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED,ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That defendants' motion to dismiss is granted, with prejudice; any other pending motions in those actions are denied as moot; and this action is closed. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, Clerk on 7/18/07) (dt) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. RBC Dain Rauscher, Inc. served on 9/5/2006, answer due 9/25/2006. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala. (dle, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that for the reasons stated in the 2/24/06 opinion and order in 04cv9237 and 6/20/06 memorandum opinion and order in 06cv2567, this action is dismissed with prejudice. However, for the reasons stated in the 4/28/06 opinion and order in 04cv9237, entry of final judgment in this action is hereby stayed pending resolution of the appeal captioned LaSala v. Needham & Co., no. 06-2643 (2d Cir. June 2, 2006). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/24/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (lb, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
          MOTION for an order staying this action in the interests of justice and in deference to a related action in this court, in re IPO Sec. Litigation, no. 21 MC 92 (SAS) Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala. (dle, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION: The parties hereby stipulate and agree that this action shall be governed by the attached Stipulation and Order filed in the related action titled LaSala V. Goldman, Sachs & Co., No 06-cv-2567 (SAS). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala.(laq, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against RBC Dain Rauscher, Inc., Tucker Anthony Cleary Gull, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 583140)Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala.(laq, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 69 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?