USA v. Toussaint
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10046
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:48 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stephen J Toussaint, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 108

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Paul J. Garrity +1 603 434 4106 +1 603 437 6473 garritylaw@verizon.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Stephen J Toussaint by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
    First MOTION to Withdraw Document First Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Stephen J Toussaint by USA. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
      Certificate of Service as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
        Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued in case as to Stephen J Toussaint (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
          CLERK'S NOTICE of Post-Judgment Garnishment as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Stephen J Toussaint (1). (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
              First MOTION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Stephen J Toussaint by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christopher R. Donato appearing for USA. Notice of Appearance (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                  Memorandum from Probation regarding Transfer to Low Intensity Caseload as to Stephen J Toussaint. Requested action: USDJ Review (Nichols, April) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Exceed Statutory Fee Limits as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 20) (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Stephen J Toussaint (1), Count(s) 1s-5s, 6s, 7s-8s, 9s-11s, Court establishes range. Motion for downward departure is DENIED. Court hears recomendations. TOL 23, CHC I. 46 months in custody of BOP, concurrently. 36 months of SR. Restitution in amount of $ 465,800 to Ms. Pitera. SA1100. See Judgment for details. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                        Supplemental EX PARTE MOTION for services other than counsel as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                          Letter (non-motion) re character reference of Stephen Toussaint. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Stephen J Toussaint (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION for downward departure Departure as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Continue to for fourteen days to sentencing as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                  Ex Parte Motion as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Continue to November l9, 2008 to sentencing as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/26/08. as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2008: # 1 Corrected Arrest Warrant) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth). (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Continue to for 45 days to sentencing as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Stephen J Toussaint (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                            SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) as to Stephen J Toussaint (1) count(s) 1s-5s, 6s, 7s-8s, 9s-11s. (Attachments: # 1 js45)(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                              WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Stephen J Toussaint (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Continue to 90 days to trial as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Continue to earlier/later to pretrial conference as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Continue to November 29, 2007 to pretrial conference as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Continue to for 30 days to pretrial conference as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Excludable Delay from 9/13/07 to for30 days as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Continue to for aperiod of 30 days to pretrial conference as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference as to Stephen J Toussaint Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2007. This case is hereby returned to Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Excludable Delay from April 10, 2007 to July 17, 2007 (98 days) as to Stephen J Toussaintby USA. (Hasib, S.) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Continue to July l3, 2007 to conference as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Garrity, Paul) Motions referred to Joyce London Alexander. (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Excludable Delay from February 16, 2007 to April 9, 2007 as to Stephen J Toussaintby USA. (Hasib, S.) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : REPORT AND ORDER on Initial Status Conference as to Stephen J Toussaint: Interim Status Conference set for 6/13/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter (non-motion) regarding automatic discovery as to Stephen J Toussaint (Hasib, S.) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE re automatic disclosure pursuant to Local Rule 116.1 as to Stephen J Toussaint (Garrity, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Stephen J Toussaint. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/18/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            Unsecured Bond Entered as to Stephen J Toussaint in amount of $ 10,000 (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/18/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : ORDER entered: CJA 20 as to Stephen J Toussaint: Appointment of Attorney Paul J. Garrity for Stephen J Toussaint. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/18/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Summons Issued as to Stephen J Toussaint; sent to Deft via 1st class & certified mail: Initial Appearance set for 2/16/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander Reason for referral: PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS as to Stephen J Toussaint (Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to Stephen J Toussaint (1) count(s) 1-5, 6, 7-8, 9-11. (Attachments: # 1 js45) (Diskes, Sheila) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2007 (Diskes, Sheila). (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 538 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?