Angel Guard Products, Inc. v. Hopkins Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-40009-FDS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:46 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Angel Guard Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis M. Ciavarra +1 508 926 3408 +1 508 929 3011 lciavarra@bowditch.com
v.
No Logo Hopkins Manufacturing Company, Inc., Defendant
Office Worcester
Filed 1/18/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Worcester
Terminated 7/26/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PATENT
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Jones, Sherry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Angel Guard Products, Inc.. (Ciavarra, Louis)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angel Guard Products, Inc. (Hassett, Kathy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Report on the filing/termination of patent/tradema
        REPORT on the filing of patent/trademark case. (Hassett, Kathy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Louis M. Ciavarra on behalf of Angel Guard Products, Inc. (Hassett, Kathy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against Hopkins Manufacturing Company, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 404494, filed by Angel Guard Products, Inc.(Hassett, Kathy)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Hopkins Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Hassett, Kathy)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 52 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?