United States of America et al v. The Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10112-RCL

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
No Logo Coalition For Buzzards Bay, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Ettinger +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 jettinger@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
No Logo Robert W. Golledge, Jr., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "The Commonwealth of Massachusetts"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierce O. Cray +61772 722 00x2084 +1 617 727 5785 Pierce.Cray@state.ma.us
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
No Logo The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierce O. Cray +61772 722 00x2084 +1 617 727 5785 Pierce.Cray@state.ma.us
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
v.
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierce O. Cray +61772 722 00x2084 +1 617 727 5785 Pierce.Cray@state.ma.us
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
No Logo Robert W. Golledge, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierce O. Cray +61772 722 00x2084 +1 617 727 5785 Pierce.Cray@state.ma.us
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Commonwealth of Massachusetts"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierce O. Cray +61772 722 00x2084 +1 617 727 5785 Pierce.Cray@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
No Logo The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierce O. Cray +61772 722 00x2084 +1 617 727 5785 Pierce.Cray@state.ma.us
Space Seth Schofield +6177272 200 ext2436 +1 617 727 9665 seth.schofield@state.ma.us
United States Coast Guard United States Coast Guard, Counter-Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Counter-Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean T. Connaughton +1 202 274 2880 +1 202 654 5647

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Hachey +1 617 345 1034 +1 866 891 9579 ahachey@nixonpeabody.com
Space George J. Skelly +1 617 345 1000 gskelly@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Jonathan Benner +1 202 274 2880 +1 202 654 5647 jbenner@reedsmith.com
No Logo Bimco, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean T. Connaughton +1 202 274 2880 +1 202 654 5647

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Hachey +1 617 345 1034 +1 866 891 9579 ahachey@nixonpeabody.com
Space George J. Skelly +1 617 345 1000 gskelly@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Jonathan Benner +1 202 274 2880 +1 202 654 5647 jbenner@reedsmith.com
No Logo Chamber of Shipping of America, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean T. Connaughton +1 202 274 2880 +1 202 654 5647

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Hachey +1 617 345 1034 +1 866 891 9579 ahachey@nixonpeabody.com
Space George J. Skelly +1 617 345 1000 gskelly@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Jonathan Benner +1 202 274 2880 +1 202 654 5647 jbenner@reedsmith.com
No Logo Amici Curiae, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip N. Beauregard +1 508 993 0333 +1 508 990 2045 bbf.robeson@verizon.net
No Logo Coalition For Buzzards Bay, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP (Boston)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Ettinger +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 jettinger@foleyhoag.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/18/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause JS 44 Sec. IV - no matching citation currently in database
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Suffolk
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 6/22/2007
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '06-2361'['First Circuit'], '06-2362'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, REMAND
  Entries (239) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ENDORSED ORDER entered. Regarding 125 Sealed Administrative Record of Social Security proceedings by United States of America (York, Steve) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER - STATISTICAL CLOSING entered, without prejudice to either party moving to restore this case to the docket if any further action is required.(York, Steve) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT by United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
        MANDATE of USCA as to 172 Notice of Appeal and 174 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. Mandate issued in the USCA 7/11/2011 (Ramos, Jeanette) Modified to add link to 172 on 8/18/2011 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
          OPINION of USCA No. 10-1664, 10-1668. Opinion issued in the 5/17/2011 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
            USCA Judgment as to 174 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The district court's entry of summary judgment is reversed, the injunction is vacated and the case is returned to the district court with instructions to remand it to the Coast Guard for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Judgment issued in the USCA 5/17/2011 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
              USCA Judgment as to 172 Notice of Appeal, filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The district court's entry of summary judgment is reversed, the injunction is vacated and the case is returned to the district court with instructions to remand it to the Coast Guard for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Judgment issued in the USCA 5/17/2011 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on November 18, 2009, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. COA Case No. 10-1668. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at 617-439-3214 Redaction Request due 8/31/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 10, 2009, before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. COA Case No. 10-1668. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young 508/384-2003, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: None. Digital Recording transcribed by Maryann Young. Redaction Request due 7/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [126] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Joshua E. Gardner for United States of America. Attorney Steven Y. Bressler terminated (Simeone, Maria)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Mitt Romney, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection for proceedings held on 11/18/09 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                            Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered Allowed in part and Denying in part [91] Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction; The Motion is Allowed insofar as it seeks a Preliminary Injunction (York, Steve)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Mitt Romney, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin, (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Order on Report and Recommendations
                                Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered Approving [116] Report and Recommendations. A Preliminary Injunction as prayed for will enter forthwith. (York, Steve)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                  Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 174 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 126 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney by United States of America.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 171 Judgment, Permanent Injunction, 170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,,,,, by Coalition For Buzzards Bay Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-2924278 Fee Status: N. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. Appeal Record due by 6/16/2010. (Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE by United States of America Regarding the Administrative Record (Bressler, Steven)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                          Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 172 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
                                            Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [124] Motion to Stay; The Court adopts the schedule proposed in paragraph 3 as an Order of the Court. The defendants' response to the pending Motion for Summary Judgment is STAYED; they shall respond in accordance with the schedule set forth in paragraph 3. The proponents of the pending Motion shall file a notice upon the close of discovery stating either their intent to rely on the Motion as filed or to replace it with a revised Motion to be filed at the appropriate time on the schedule set forth in paragraph 3. The Motion to Stay (#124) is ALLOWED. (Simeone, Maria)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 171 Judgment, Permanent Injunction, 170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,,,,, by Robert W. Golledge, Jr(in his capacity as Commissioner of the Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection), Mitt Romney(in his capacity as Governor of Massachusetts), The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection Fee Status: Y. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. Appeal Record due by 6/16/2010. (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008, Terminated: 6/26/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                MOTION to Stay Defendants' Joint Motion to Continue Stay of Summary Judgment Opposition Period by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts.(Cray, Pierce)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION.(Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                    OBJECTION to [116] Report and Recommendations Defendants' Response to Report and Recommendation on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Cray, Pierce)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 134 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting summary judgment [112 & 131]; adopting Report and Recommendations 116 ; adopting Report and Recommendations re [154 & 156]. (Woodlock, Douglas) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Recommendations for Scheduling Order
                                                        Recommendations for Scheduling Order Joint Motion of Plaintiffs, Defendants, and Intervenor-Defendant for Entry of a Scheduling Order. (Cray, Pierce)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 121 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 25, 2008 to File Objections to Report and Recommendation by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(DeLisle, Elisabeth M.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security re 167 Supplemental Reply Brief re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,, Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [121] Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court issued its Report and Recommendation on June 6, 2008. Therefore, the deadline for filing Objections was June 16, 2008, not June 23, 2008. Nevertheless, the Court ALLOWS the motion for an extension of time until June 25, 2008. (Tyler, Rebecca)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Supplemental Reply Brief re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,, Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 11/24/2009 (York, Steve). (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [119] Motion for Extension of Time. The Commonwealth need not file its response on June 26, 2008 as the Court will stay consideration of the motion for summary judgment until after the District Judge renders a decision on the Report and Recommendation for a Preliminary Injunction. If any party objects to the stay of summary judgment proceedings before a ruling on the R&R, it must file a statement indicating its reason(s) by close of business on June 27, 2008. (Tyler, Rebecca)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY TO OBJECTION to 156 , 154 Report and Recommendations This is a Reply to the Objections of the Intervenor-Plaintiffs [Dckt. # 162] filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Cray, Pierce) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sorokin Referred for: full pretrial case management, including all dispositive motions (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY TO OBJECTION to 156 , 154 , 116 Report and Recommendations filed by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 26, 2008 to File Oppositions to Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Both the Defendants and the Intervenor-Defendants by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts.(Cray, Pierce)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            OBJECTION to 156 , 154 , 116 Report and Recommendations Joinder In The Commonwealth's Rule 72(b) Objections To The June 6, 2008 and July 29, 2009 Reports And Recommendations filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                OBJECTION to 156 , 154 , 116 Report and Recommendations filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 20, 2007, before Judge Sorokin. Court Reporter: Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/27/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    OBJECTION to 156 , 154 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Skelly, George) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that the Plaintiff United States of America Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction (Docket #91) be ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion should be ALLOWED insofar as it seeks a preliminary injunction re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr re 159 Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendations,. (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [115] Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY TO OBJECTION to 156 , 154 Report and Recommendations Joinder In The Commonwealth's Reply To The United States' Objections filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 19, 2008 to File Oppositions by Defendants and Intervenor Defendant to Intervenor-Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts.(Cray, Pierce)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY TO OBJECTION to 156 , 154 Report and Recommendations filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USCG NEPA Manual)(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 114 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [112] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin(York, Steve) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    OBJECTION to 156 , 154 Report and Recommendations filed by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 113 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [112] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners. (Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Objections (Assented-to by All Other Parties) by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners.(Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that Commonwealth of Massachusetts Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docket #134) be DENIED, and that the United States of Americas Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket #139) be ALLOWED. I further recommend that the Court DENY the Coalition for Buzzard Bays Motion for SummaryJudgment (Docket #136)In addition, at the joint request of the Parties, I have enlarged the time within which theParties may file written objections to these proposed findings and recommendations from ten to thirty days (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners.(Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to File and Respond to Objections (Assented-To By All Other Parties) by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Response
                                                                                                                  Answer by United States of America to [105] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,. (Bressler, Steven) Modified on 4/15/2008 (York, Steve).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Joinder in the Defedants' Counterclaimants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay, 139 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security, 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. Recommendation: Commonwealth of Massachusetts Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docket #134) be DENIED, and that the United States of Americas Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket #139) be ALLOWED. Further recommended that the Court DENY the Coalition for Buzzard Bays Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket #136) Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2009(LaRoche, Donald) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 109 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Motion re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction Filed Pursuant to the Court's Order of March 3, 2008 filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Ex. A - Decl. of J. Venezia and Exhibits 1-2, # (2) Exhibit Decl. Venezia Exhibits 3-6)(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by United States of America, United States Coast Guard re Status Conference, (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction Filed Pursuant to the Court's Order of March 3, 2008, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of J.M. Sollosi)(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Motion re 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial AND REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR-PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Skelly, George) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 107 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the United States shall file by March 13, 2008, a reply memorandum not to exceed seven pages addressing the Commonwealths argument and the relationship, if any, of the Coast Guards Puget Sound rulemaking to the issues now pending before the Court. The Commonwealth may file a surreply, not to exceed five pages, by March 20, 2008.(Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 139 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial, 147 MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) A Supplemental Memorandum Addressing the U.S. Supreme Court's Decision in Wyeth v. Levine and to Adjust the Briefing Schedule MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) A Supplemental Memorandum Addressing the U.S. Supreme Court's Decision in Wyeth v. Levine and to Adjust the Briefing Schedule filed by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [106] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States of America answer due 4/14/2008. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008, Terminated: 2/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 14, 2008 to File Answer re [105] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by United States of America.(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial (Re U.S. Supreme Court's Wyeth Decision) filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 105 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                          Third Amended ANSWER to [1] Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney(in his capacity as Governor of Massachusetts), Robert W. Golledge, Jr(in his capacity as Commissioner of the Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection).(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial (Re U.S. Supreme Court's Wyeth Decision) filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Wyeth v. Levine, 555 U.S. __ (Mar. 4, 2009) (slip opinion))(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Electronic ORDER entered granting [104] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) A Supplemental Memorandum Addressing the U.S. Supreme Court's Decision in Wyeth v. Levine and to Adjust the Briefing Schedule by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed-Third Amended Answer and Counterclaim by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney(in his capacity as Governor of Massachusetts), Robert W. Golledge, Jr(in his capacity as Commissioner of the Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Third Amended Answer and Counterclaim, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 139 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and THE INDUSTRY-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT And REPLY to INDUSTRY-INTERVENORS AND THE UNITED STATES OPPOSITIONS TO THE COMMONWEALTHS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2007 re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America.; Court hears the oral argument of counsel and will take the motion under advisement and issue an order. (Digital Recording #d.)(Attorneys present: Various counsel) (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 139 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 103 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction in Response to Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum, Docket Entry No. 102, filed by United States of America. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 - Transcript of Oct. 15, 2007 Status Conference, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 2 - Pl.s Responses and Objections to Defs. First Requests for Production of Documents, # (3) Exhibit Ex. 3 - Pl.s Suppl. Resp. to Defs. Req. No. 1)(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Deadlines in the Scheduling Order by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction :The Motion Hearing has been reset for 12/20/2007 01:45 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Intervenor-Plaintiffs by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners.(Hachey, Andrew) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered granting [101] Motion to Continue ; ALLOWED. The hearing is reset to December 20, 2007 at 1:45 p.m. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of the United States and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts for an Extension of the Briefing Deadlines in the Scheduling Order by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 12/3/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion [91] for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction to December 20, 2007 at 1:45 pm by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, United States of America, Chamber of Shipping of America, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 139 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial filed by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts)(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [98] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States of America, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re [1] Complaint Stipulation of Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff's and Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Claims for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Against Operation of M.G.L. c. 21 § 50C(d) (Concerning Financial Assurance Requirements for Certain Vessels) Only by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, United States of America, Chamber of Shipping of America, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners. (Hachey, Andrew) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction : The Court will hold a hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction on December 21, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #14. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment , Joinder in the Defedants' Counterclaimants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007, Terminated: 11/30/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File -Unopposed-Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim)(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts as to which There is No Genuine Issue)(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin(York, Steve) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment -Partial by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [95] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time for One-Week Extension of the Briefing Deadlines in the Scheduling Order by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners Regarding Motion for Summary Judgment (Hachey, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007, Terminated: 11/27/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction with attached Certificate of Service filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Deadlines in the Scheduling Order by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on October 15, 2007 before Judge Lindsay. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-4410 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff's and Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Claims for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Against Operation of M.G.L. c. 21M, § 6(a) & (b) (setting tugboat escort requirements for certain vessels) pertaining to vessels in Mount Hope Bay and Vineyard Sound Only by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, United States of America, Chamber of Shipping of America, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Schofield, Seth) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [91] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by United States of America. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by United States of America.(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Status Conference held on 10/15/2007. Steven Bressler, Captain Frederick Kenney, C. Jonathan Benner and Andrew Hachey for the plaintiffs. Pierce Cray, Seth Schofield, Jonathan Ettinger, Elisabeth Delisle for the defendants. Government to file briefs by 10/29/07. Defendants to file briefs by 11/16/07. Counsel may conduct discovery and briefs may be supplemented once discovery has been taken and motions not ruled on yet. Discovery to be completed by 2/15/08. Counsel to turn over discovery on items 1 and 2 to defendants. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Schofield on behalf of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr (Schofield, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing :Status Conference set for 10/15/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to [77] Notice of Appeal, filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, [78] Notice of Appeal, filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appeal Record Returned: [77] Notice of Appeal, [78] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Notice of Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Reginald C. Lindsay added. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Judgment as to[77] Notice of Appeal, filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, [78] Notice of Appeal, filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District or Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The district court's entry of judgment and the permanent injunction for the United States are vacated, and the matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. No costs are awarded. Judgment issued in the USCA 6/21/2007 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number 06-2362 for [78] Notice of Appeal, filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 06-2361 for [77] Notice of Appeal, filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [78] Notice of Appeal, [77] Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 81 (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [78] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [77] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1))(Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT NOTICE re: Transcript and Statement of Issues to be presented on appeal by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr (Abaid, Kim) Modified on 9/19/2006 (Abaid, Kim). *** Please note this is a duplicate of entry 79. ***
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 80 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coalition For Buzzards Bay re [79] Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay re [78] Notice of Appeal,, [77] Notice of Appeal, Joint Notice Regarding Transcript And Statement Of Issues To Be Presented On Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing fee: $ 455.00, receipt number 74941 for [78] Notice of Appeal (Abaid, Kim) Modified on 9/12/2006 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filing fee: $ 455.00, receipt number 74871 for [77] Notice of Appeal, (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006, Terminated: 6/22/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. $ 455 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 9/27/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006, Terminated: 6/22/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts. $ 455 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 9/27/2006. (Cray, Pierce)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re: [74] Order. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered - MEMORANDUM.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. [22] Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is ALLOWED. [29] Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is ALLOWED.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Terminated Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil Case Terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [73] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 E-mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-Mail Notice returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Nora Chorover. The ECF Help Desk has contacted the Attorney General's office, who advised that this attorney is no longer employed by that office. The attorney's email address has been removed from the ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. 3/30/2006: Motion hearing held: motions under advisement;Court reporter, Jim Gibbons. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONICNOTICE of Hearing on Motions Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr Defendants' List of Individuals They Wish to Depose (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's L.R. 16.1 Certification# (2) Defendants' L.R. 16.1 Certification# (3) Intervenor-Plaintiffs' L.R. 16.1 Certification# (4) Intervenor-Defendant's L.R. 16.1 Certification)(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [68] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added C. Jonathan Benner for American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners and BIMCO, granting [69] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sean T. Connaughton for American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners and BIMCO (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 70201 regarding [68] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and [69] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/9/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean T. Connaughton by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Connaughton Declaration)(Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/9/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C. Jonathan Benner by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A -- Benner Declaration)(Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONICNotice Resetting or Cancelling Hearing. Conference rescheduled for 2/16/2006 AT 2:15P.M. (PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 2/9/2006), filings shall now be due 2/13/2006. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : RULE 26 DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Notice of hearing(other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of CONFERENCE re STATUS :CONFERENCE set for 2/9/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered [22] Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and [29] Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMICI CURIAE Memorandum in Support of [43] Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Save the Bay. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered denying as moot [23] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot [34] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot [39] Motion for Summary Judgment (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [64] Stipulation of Dismissal of Counterclaim is ALLOWED.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counterclaim by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, United States Coast Guard, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by United States of America re [34] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Defendants' Counterclaim, [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim, [39] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim (Attachments: # (1) 75 Fed. Reg. 75954 (December 22, 2005) ("Marine Casualties and Investigations; Chemical Testing Following Serious Marine Incidents"))(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ElectronicORDER entered finding as moot [44] Motion for Leave to File, finding as moot [46] Motion for Leave to File, finding as moot [52] Motion leave (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by United States of America re [34] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Defendants' Counterclaim, [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim, [39] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim of Public Record (Attachments: # (1) Department of Homeland Security Executive Order 12866 Submissions Under Review by the Executive Office of Management and Budget, Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs, as of October 7, 2005)(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Skelly, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by United States of America. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim, [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Motion re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [53] Motion for Leave to File (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Motion re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Motion re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 52 corrected because: Added a signed version of the motion to the docket entry .(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [50] Motion for Leave to File, granting [51] Motion for Leave to File (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim, [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed SUR-REPLY to Motion re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Surreply And Reply Memoranda by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Permission to File Two Surreply Memoranda re [48] Opposition to Motion,, [50] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss# (2) Summary Judgment Surreply Memoranda)(Chorover, Nora) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/29/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Attachments: # (1) 1. Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Skelly, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/29/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the United States' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF COUNSEL re [38] Addendum to Motion/Memorandum,, [41] Response and LR 56.1 Statement by United States of America. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [39] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim, [34] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Defendants' Counterclaim filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stefan Venckus)(Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [46] MOTION for Leave to File to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Seeking Leave to File Brief in Support of Defendants filed by Amici Curiae. (Beauregard, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Seeking Leave to File Brief in Support of Defendants by Amici Curiae.(Beauregard, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum of Law as Amicus Curiae by Save the Bay. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Memorandum)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Cray, Pierce)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries 37 and 38 corrected because: Changed docket entry to reflect title of actual document filed. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [39] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim, [40] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (part 1 of 4)# (2) Exhibit A (part 2 of 4)# (3) Exhibit A (part 3 of 4)# (4) Exhibit A (part 4 of 4)# (5) Exhibit B and C# (6) Exhibit D (part 1 of 2)# (7) Exhibit D (part 2 of 2)# (8) Exhibit E through I)(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by Coalition For Buzzards Bay to [26] Statement of facts And Statement Of Additional Material Facts. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim And In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005, Terminated: 1/15/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment On Intervenor Defendant's Counter-Claim by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [26] Statement of Material Facts filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Chorover, Nora) Modified on 7/13/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Richard Packard in Opposition re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim and in Support of State Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Their Counterclaim filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Chorover, Nora) Modified on 7/13/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Nora J. Chorover in Opposition re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim and in Support of State Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on their Counterclaim filed by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005, Terminated: 1/15/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Defendants' Counterclaim by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [31] Motion for Extension of Time (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time - Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to United States' Motion for Summary Judgment to 7/12/2005 and to Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings to 7/15/2005 by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [31] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 22, 2005 to File Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Intervenor-Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings , in part, filed by United States of America. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 22, 2005 to File Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Intervenor-Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [29] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005, Terminated: 1/23/2006 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America.(Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [28] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2005 to File Response/Reply (Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motions of the United States and Intervenor-Plaintiffs) (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005, Terminated: 6/6/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2005 to File Response/Reply (Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motions of the United States and Intervenor-Plaintiffs) by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Coalition For Buzzards Bay, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Robert W. Golledge, Jr, Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Answer to Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries 22-26 corrected because: Attachments to documents should be exhibits. Memorandum of Law and Statement of Facts should be their own entries. Removed from the Motions and entered them separately. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Dispute. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim filed by United States of America. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [22] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by United States of America. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005, Terminated: 1/15/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of W. Douglas Rabe, and Exhibit 1 Thereto)(Bressler, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005, Terminated: 1/23/2006 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by United States of America. Bressler, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [21] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005, Terminated: 5/17/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for All Parties, in Support of, or in Opposition to, Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket entry 20. corrected because: Re-entered to include Counterclaim. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Intervenor COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America.(Hachey, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Attorney Ettinger's account modified again to receive notice. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Attorney Ettinger's account updated to receive e-mail notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [6] Motion to Intervene (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Electronic Order dated 04-21-2005 corrected because: The order that was attached should have been attached to 18, changed numbers of following docket entries to reflect the number removal of the electronic order. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. The Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene as defendants in this proceeding filed by The Coalition for Buzzards Bay on March 31, 2005 is ALLOWED. The Coalition's Answer, which was attached to its Motion for Leave to Intervene shall be deemed filed.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion to Intervene (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to [1] Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nora J. Chorover on behalf of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr (Chorover, Nora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Mark Rasmussen in Support re [12] MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed Motion Of The Coalition For Buzzards Bay For Leave To Intervene) with [Proposed] Order and Answer Of The Coalition For Buzzards Bay To Plaintiff United States Of America's Complaint filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [12] MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed Motion Of The Coalition For Buzzards Bay For Leave To Intervene) with [Proposed] Order and Answer Of The Coalition For Buzzards Bay To Plaintiff United States Of America's Complaint filed by Coalition For Buzzards Bay. (Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005, Terminated: 4/20/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed Motion Of The Coalition For Buzzards Bay For Leave To Intervene) with [Proposed] Order and Answer Of The Coalition For Buzzards Bay To Plaintiff United States Of America's Complaint by Coalition For Buzzards Bay.(Ettinger, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Pierce O. Cray on behalf of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Soren Larsen by BIMCO. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION to Intervene filed by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene by American Waterways Operators International Association of Independent Tanker Owners, BIMCO, Chamber of Shipping of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Robert W. Golledge, Jr waiver sent on 1/28/2005, answer due 3/29/2005. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Mitt Romney waiver sent on 1/28/2005, answer due 3/29/2005. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection waiver sent on 1/21/2005, answer due 3/22/2005. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed The Commonwealth of Massachusetts waiver sent on 1/21/2005, answer due 3/22/2005. (Bressler, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against all defendants Filing fee: $ 0., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Category Sheet# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Massachusetts Department of Environmental Protection, Mitt Romney, Robert W. Golledge, Jr. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to the New Magistrate Judge. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?