Sibilia v. Snow
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10096-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony P. Sibilia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy A. Harris +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 charris@katorparks.com
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keane & Beane

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Holtzman +1 617 482 7211 +1 617 482 7212 pholtzman@kb-law.com
v.
No Logo John W. Snow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rayford A. Farquhar +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3971 rayford.farquhar@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 1/14/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Bristol
Terminated 7/24/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-10096-PBS, 1:06-cv-10801-PBS, 1:07-cv-10595-PBS(Patch, Christine)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
    Judge Patti B. Saris : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT granting (54 in 1:05-cv-10096-PBS) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by John W. Snow Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-10096-PBS, 1:06-cv-10801-PBS, 1:07-cv-10595-PBS(Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by John W. Snow. (Farquhar, Rayford)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Status Conference
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 7/16/2007. Mr. Sibilia appears with counsel. Upon inquiry of the Court, the parties agree that all three outstanding cases 05-cv-10096, 06-cv-10801, 07-cv-10595 are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff to file proposed order of dismissal. (Court Reporter Lee Marzilli.) Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-10801-PBS, 1:05-cv-10096-PBS, 1:07-cv-10595-PBS(Alba, Robert)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
          Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [52] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Kator for Anthony P. Sibilia, Cathy A. Harris for Anthony P. Sibilia (Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Anthony P. Sibilia. Document received: Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: # (1) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Holtzman, Paul)
              LREF
              Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 7/10/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Kator and Cathy A. Harris Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1585248. by Anthony P. Sibilia.(Holtzman, Paul) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2007 (Patch, Christine).
                LREF
                Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Paul V. Holtzman on behalf of Anthony P. Sibilia (Holtzman, Paul) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2007 (Patch, Christine).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting (21) Motion for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Disclosures in case 1:06-cv-10801-PBS; granting (50) Motion for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Disclosures in case 1:05-cv-10096-PBS Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-10096-PBS, 1:06-cv-10801-PBS(Patch, Christine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Disclosures by Anthony P. Sibilia.Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-10096-PBS, 1:06-cv-10801-PBS(Patch, Christine)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE and JURY TRIAL:Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2007 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Jury Trial set for 8/13/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                        2nd REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Lovett, Jarrett)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                          2nd NOTICE of ADR Conference: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 5/24/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander.(Lovett, Jarrett)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                            REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Lovett, Jarrett)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : Electronic ORDER entered granting [46] Motion for Permission to have Counsel Present During ADR Conference (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION for Permission to Have Counsel Present During ADR Conference by Anthony P. Sibilia (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of ADR Conference: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 3/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander.(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of assignment to ADR Provider. U.S. Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander appointed. The Court will contact counsel with regard to scheduling. (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                      Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander, by agreement of the parties.(Alba, Robert)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Status Conference
                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 11/28/2006. (Court Reporter Marie Cloonan.) (Alba, Robert)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 11/28/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                            Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting in part and denying in part [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John W. Snow. "Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 26) is allowed on Counts I and III and denied on Count II."(Patch, Christine)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution ProviderCourt Filing
                                              REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. U.S. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin reports that the case did not settled. (See report). (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Exhibit
                                                EXHIBIT re [39] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, by Anthony P. Sibilia. (Patch, Christine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Anthony P. Sibilia in Opposition re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Anthony P. Sibilia. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12)(Patch, Christine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2006 re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John W. Snow. Court hears argument of parties. Plaintiff to file a supplemental affidavit within one week. Defendant to respond within one week thereafter. Court takes motion under advisement. (Court Reporter Lee Marzilli.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING. The Motion Hearing previously rescheduled to May 3, 2006, has been further rescheduled to May 9, 2006, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: The Summary Judgment Motion Hearing previously set for 5/4/06 has been rescheduled to 5/3/2006 04:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING. The Summary Judgment Motion Hearing previously rescheduled to May 4, 2006, has been further rescheduled to May 3, 2006, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING. At the request of the plaintiff, the Summary Judgment Motion Hearing previously scheduled for April 24, 2006, has been rescheduled to May 4, 2006, at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to File an Untimely Motion for Summary Judgment and/or in the Alternative, MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by April 14, 2006 and Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Postpone Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Until After Mediation by Anthony P. Sibilia.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Anthony P. Sibilia.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered denying [33] Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 31 terminated because it was filed using the incorrect event. Please refer to Document No. 32 for corrected filing. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Terminate Documents
                                                                      Documents terminated: [31] Response to Motion filed by John W. Snow,. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John W. Snow. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [25] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John W. Snow. (Farquhar, Rayford)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Opposition re [25] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Anthony P. Sibilia. (Patch, Christine) Modified on 3/17/2006 (Patch, Christine).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 27 corrected because the Memorandum in Support was not efiled. Document has been corrected and Memo is now on the docket. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [25] Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment on Monday March 6, 2006 Instead of on Wednesday March 1, 2006. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 28 terminated because it was filed using the incorrect event. Please refer to Document No. 29 for corrected filing (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Terminate Documents
                                                                                    Documents terminated: [28] Addendum to Motion/Memorandum filed by John W. Snow,. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Statement of Facts
                                                                                      STATEMENT of facts re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                                                        ADDENDUM re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts filed by John W. Snow. (Farquhar, Rayford)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John W. Snow. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Farquhar, Rayford) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2006 (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006, Terminated: 10/20/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by John W. Snow.(Farquhar, Rayford)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by John W. Snow.(Farquhar, Rayford)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Notice of ADR Conference
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF ADR CONFERENCE. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 5/23/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. A brief mediation memoranda should be submitted no later than five (5) days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing". In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, please notify opposing counsel and the court as soon as possible. (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of assignment to ADR Provider. U.S. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin appointed mediator.(Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution A.S.A.P.(Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered allowing [23] Joint MOTION for a Reference to Mediation by Anthony P. Sibilia, John W. Snow. "ALLOWED. HOWEVER, I DO NOT SUSPEND THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE." (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 22 terminated because it was filed using the incorrect event. Please refer to Document No. 23 for corrected filing. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Terminate Documents
                                                                                                          Documents terminated: [22] Joint statement of counsel. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for a Reference to Mediation by Anthony P. Sibilia, John W. Snow. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                              JOINT STATEMENT of counsel motion for a reference to mediation. (Farquhar, Rayford)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING The Summary Judgment Motion Hearing/Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 4/17/06 has been rescheduled to 4/24/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of John W. Snow (Farquhar, Rayford)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Order on Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : ElectronicORDER entered denying as moot [18] Motion for Clarification. "Denied as moot. You must confer with opposing counsel before filing motions." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Opposition re [18] MOTION for Clarification filed by John W. Snow. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Clarification by Anthony P. Sibilia.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                          Judge Patti B. Saris : ElectronicORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Cease and Desist and Restrain. "The record is highly disputed. Because of the factual disputes, I do not find a likelihood of success, and therefore deny the motion to cease and desist. To obviate the exhaustion issue, I suggest that plaintiff exhaust his claim through the administrative process." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of special Agent Anthony P. Sibilia re [16] Opposition to Motion by Anthony P. Sibilia. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              Opposition re [14] MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and Leave to File Opposition filed by Anthony P. Sibilia. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and Leave to File Opposition filed by John W. Snow. (Attachments: # (1))(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 9/26/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and Leave to File Opposition by John W. Snow.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [11] MOTION for Mini Trial filed by John W. Snow. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                      Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered denying [11] Motion for Mini Trial (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion to Ceast and Resist and Restrain. "Allowed without opposition from the government." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Cease and Desist and Restrain by Anthony P. Sibilia.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Mini Trial by Anthony P. Sibilia.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider ADR Panel member Elizabeth Neumeier. Further efforts to settle this case at this time are, in my judgment, unlikely to be productive. The case should be restored to your trial list. (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Notice of ADR Conference
                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing with principals present set for 7/11/2005 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before ADR Panel member Elizabeth Neumeier.Confidential mediation statements should be submitted 5 days prior to mediation and sent directly to Atty. Neumeier at 28 Coggeshall Road, Gloucester, MA 01930.(Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of assignment to ADR Provider. ADR Panel member Elizabeth Neumeier appointed mediator.(Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2006. Summary Judgment Motion due by 3/1/2006; opposition due by 3/31/06. Hearing on Summary Judgment or Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Case to be referred to Mediation program: Summer, 2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: Summer, 2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2005. Court sets discovery and motion filing schedule. Court refers parties to mediation in Summer, 2005. (Court Reporter Valerie O'Hara.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 6 terminated because it was filed using the incorrect event. Please refer to Document No. 7 for corrected filing. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Terminate Documents
                                                                                                                                                            Documents terminated: [6] Certificate of Consultation filed by John W. Snow,. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by John W. Snow. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 16.1(D)(3) by Jeffrey Mark Cohen on behalf of John W. Snow. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2005 04:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by John W. Snow.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                        Reset Answer Deadlines for John W. Snow. Answer due 4/27/05. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2005 to File Answer and/or otherwise respond by John W. Snow. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005, Terminated: 3/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2005 to File Answer and/or otherwise respond by John W. Snow.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against John W. Snow Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61465, filed by Anthony P. Sibilia. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to New Magistrate Judge. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to John W. Snow, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?