Abiomed, Inc. v. Turnbull
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10105-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abiomed, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, World Heart Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Boudett +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 mboudett@foleyhoag.com
Space Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
v.
No Logo Michael L. Turnbull, Defendant

Represented by Birnbaum & Godkin, LLP

No Logo ADR Panel member, Mediator
Office Boston
Filed 1/14/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 6/26/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 04-5487[Suffolk Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Dolan, Kathleen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Nicewicz, Craig)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Michael L. Turnbull. (Godkin, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 OrderCourt Filing
        Judge Robert B. Collings : NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
          Electronic Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings appointed. The Court will contact counsel with regard to scheduling.(Tyler, Rebecca)
            LREF
            Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Nicewicz, Craig)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [22] Motion to Amend (Nicewicz, Craig)
                LREF
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Motion to Amend
                Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Michael L. Turnbull.(Recht, Erica)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                  First NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian Peter Pezza (Pezza, Brian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [2] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Michael L. Turnbull. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [11] Motion for Leave to File (Nicewicz, Craig)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Michael L. Turnbull.(Recht, Erica)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket No 19 was deleted because: it was a duplication of Docket No 17. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. See Order for details.(Nicewicz, Craig)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Abiomed, Inc..(Helmer, Gabriel)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Scheduling Conference held on 7/14/2005. Pretrial conference 12/4/06 at 3:00 p.m., jury trial 2/5/07 at 9:00 a.m. Refer to ADR in 1/06. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter none.) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [13] Joint submission Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) by David S. Godkin on behalf of Michael L. Turnbull. (Godkin, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by David S. Godkin (Godkin, David)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Memorandum and ORDER entered denying [2] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Joint submission
                                        JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Abiomed, Inc., Michael L. Turnbull.(Helmer, Gabriel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2005 02:45 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005, Terminated: 7/26/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: Motion to Dismiss by Michael L. Turnbull. (Attachments: # (1) reply memorandum)(Recht, Erica)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Erica B. Abate Recht on behalf of Michael L. Turnbull (Recht, Erica)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel M. Helmer on behalf of Abiomed, Inc. (Helmer, Gabriel)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Boudett on behalf of Abiomed, Inc. (Boudett, Michael)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Declaration
                                                    DECLARATION of Gabriel M. Helmer in Opposition re [2] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person by Abiomed, Inc. (Barrette, Mark)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                      Opposition re [2] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Abiomed, Inc.. (Barrette, Mark)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by David S. Godkin (Barrette, Mark)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 state court record
                                                          STATE COURT Record. (Barrette, Mark)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Michael L. Turnbull. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Ex. A -- Michael Turnbull Affidavit)(Pezza, Brian)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005, Terminated: 7/11/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person by Michael L. Turnbull.(Pezza, Brian)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Notice of Removal
                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael L. Turnbull from Suffolk Superior Court, case number 04-5487. $ 150, receipt number 61526, filed by Michael L. Turnbull. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrette, Mark)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to The New Magistrate Judge. (Barrette, Mark)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?