Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation v. Bedard Pharmacy Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10131-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morton R. Branzburg +1 215 569 3007 +1 215 568 6603

Toggle Switch Represented by bodoffslavitt.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Slavitt +1 617 742 7300 +1 617 742 9969

Toggle Switch Represented by Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Joseph Borger +1 215 569 4159 +1 215 568 6603 mborger@klehr.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by bodoffslavitt.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Slavitt +1 617 742 7300 +1 617 742 9969
No Logo Bedard Pharmacy Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Bedard Pharmacy Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh J. Gorman, III +1 617 345 9000 +1 617 345 9020 hgorman@haslaw.com
Space Charles E. Schaub +1 617 345 9000 +1 617 345 9020 cschaub@haslaw.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Bedard Pharmacy Inc., Counter-Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/20/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/20/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedard Pharmacy Inc., Bedard Pharmacy Inc., Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Gorman, Hugh)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
      Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered denying [5] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Denied for failure to pay the filing fee. (Patch, Christine)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
        Electronic NOTICE re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. As filing fee for both attorneys has been paid, motion is granted and both attorneys are admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Patch, Christine) Modified on 2/14/2006 (Patch, Christine).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
          Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [18] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee was not paid in full. Received $50.00 on 1/9/06, but Court still requires an additional $50, as the fee is $50 per attorney. (Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
            Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 69593 regarding Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew J. Borger (Patch, Christine)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Evan Slavitt of Jason Caron (Slavitt, Evan)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 69466 regarding Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Patch, Christine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF
                  NOTICE issued to Attorney Jason Caron regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Patch, Christine)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Terminate Documents
                    Documents terminated: [16] MOTION for Order to Resolving Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation,, Bedard Pharmacy Inc. (motion addressed by subsequent Court action.) (Alba, Robert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                      Bedard Long Term Care's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Bedard Pharmacy Inc..(Gorman, Hugh)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                        Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to Counterclaim and, First COUNTERCLAIM against Bedard Pharmacy Inc. by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Slavitt, Evan)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Gorman, Hugh)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Gorman, Hugh)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                              Bedard Pharmacy, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint of AmericsourceBergen Drug Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM of Bedard Pharmacy, Inc. and Bedard LTC against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation by Bedard Pharmacy Inc..(Gorman, Hugh)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Report and Recommendations
                                Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for [6] Motion to Dismiss filed by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.,, [15] Report and Recommendations. (Patch, Christine)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Slavitt, Evan)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Borger in Support re [18] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morton R. Branzburg and Matthew J. Borger filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Slavitt, Evan)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Morton R. Branzburg in Support re [18] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morton R. Branzburg and Matthew J. Borger filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Slavitt, Evan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005, Terminated: 1/25/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morton R. Branzburg and Matthew J. Borger by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Slavitt, Evan)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines
                                          Reset Answer Deadlines for Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. 4/27/05 (Alba, Robert)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                            Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2005 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bedard Pharmacy Inc. (Alba, Robert)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 4/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2005 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bedard Pharmacy Inc..(Gorman, Hugh)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Terminate Documents
                                                Documents terminated: [13] Stipulation filed by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.,, [14] Stipulation filed by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.,. (Patch, Christine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                  Joint MOTION to Approve Stipulation Resolving Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation) Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Stipulation
                                                    STIPULATION Resolving Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Setting Date for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Gorman, Hugh)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Stipulation
                                                      STIPULATION Resolving Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Gorman, Hugh)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh J. Gorman, III on behalf of Bedard Pharmacy Inc. (Gorman, Hugh)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document Nos. 13 and 14 terminated because Document No. 13 was entered using the wrong event and Document No. 14 should have been filed as an attachment to Document No. 13. Please refer to Document No. 16 for corrected filing. (Patch, Christine)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine filed by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.; Recommendation: Recommend leave be granted to WITHDRAW Motion to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 4/18/2005.(Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                              Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine:Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2005 09:15 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered REFERRING [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine filed by Bedard Pharmacy Inc., to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings(Alba, Robert)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Declaration
                                                                    DECLARATION re [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine, [9] Opposition to Motion, by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Slavitt, Evan)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Opposition re [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine with certificate of service filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Slavitt, Evan)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Affidavit
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Michael R. Nadeau re [7] Memorandum in Support of Motion, to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Schaub, Charles)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine filed by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Prime Vendor Agreement)(Schaub, Charles)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005, Terminated: 4/26/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Maine by Bedard Pharmacy Inc..(Schaub, Charles)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Russell B. Pierce and Adrian P. Kendall by Bedard Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Russell B. Pierce in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# (2) Affidavit of Adrian P. Kendall in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Schaub, Charles)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Bedard Pharmacy Inc. served on 1/31/2005, answer due 2/22/2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation re [2] Amended Complaint. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bedard Pharmacy Inc., filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Bedard Pharmacy Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61602, filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Bedard Pharmacy Inc. served on 1/20/2005, answer due 2/9/2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?