Akamai Technologies, Inc. v. Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10132-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Akamai Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by grantboston.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederic D. Grant, Jr. +1 617 357 6555 +1 617 357 5030 grant@grantboston.com
v.
No Logo Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/20/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $671000
Nature of Suit 195 - Contract Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Middlesex
Terminated 8/30/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff (Nici, Richard)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 8/30/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
    MOTION for Default Judgment by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Aaron Ahola# (2) Affidavit of Frederic Grant Jr.# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, Frederic)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Nici, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
        NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD. (Nici, Richard)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Affidavit of Service
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. Acknowledgement filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Grant, Frederic)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Request for notice of default
            Request for notice of default against both defendants (with Certificate of Service). (Grant, Frederic)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE to Court by Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD. (Nici, Richard)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed (Nici, Richard)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD. served on 5/30/2005, answer due 6/20/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Second summons)(Nici, Richard) Modified on 6/8/2005 Other document not scanned(Nici, Richard).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Grant, Frederic)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61601, filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint Part 2# (2) Cover Sheet)(Nici, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Summons Issued
                        Summons Issued as to Art-In Internet Technologies & Electronic Commerce LTD.. (Nici, Richard)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge New Magistrate Judge. (Nici, Richard)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 59 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?