Commerce Insurance Company v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:04-cv-11401-TSH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commerce Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pojani, Hurley, Ritter & Salvidio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Hurley, Jr. +1 508 798 2480 +1 508 797 9561 jhurley@phrslaw.com
v.
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Space Brooke P. Seliger +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 seliger@burnsandfarrey.com
Office Worcester
Filed 6/18/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand $196000
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Worcester
Terminated 4/18/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Stipulation
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Seliger, Brooke)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Jones, Sherry)
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2006, Status Conference set for 10/11/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl.(Roland, Lisa)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
        Notice of Reassignment. Judge Timothy S. Hillman added upon his appointment to the bench of this Court. Judge Charles B. Swartwood no longer assigned to case. (Hassett, Kathy)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Status Conference
          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Status Conference held on 2/15/2006. Case called, Counsel (Hurley, Farrey, Seliger) appear by telephone, Counsel request a 60-day extention, Amended Scheduling Order to issue. (Digital Recording 2:44 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Joint statement of counsel
            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Agreement to Extend Scheduling Order. (Seliger, Brooke)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
              Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [16] Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re [16] MOTION to Amend [14] Scheduling Order, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Motion to Amend
                  ASSENTED TO MOTION to Amend [14] Scheduling Order, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Commerce Insurance Company, c/s.(Hassett, Kathy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      Judge Charles B. Swartwood : SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/15/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2005. Discovery due by 2/1/2006. Motions due by 10/1/2006, cc/cl.(Roland, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Scheduling Conference
                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Scheduling Conference held on 3/7/2005. Case called, Counsel (Hurley, Seliger) appear, The Court reviews dates with counsel, Scheduling order to issue. (3:42 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 signed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Seliger, Brooke)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                            JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Seliger, Brooke)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                              Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (cc/cl)(Hassett, Kathy)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
                                  CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commerce Insurance Company, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Jones, Sherry)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                    CERTIFICATION OF CONSULTATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., c/s.(Jones, Sherry) Modified on 2/28/2005 (Jones, Sherry).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                      NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 3/7/2005 10:45 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2005 10:45 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
                                          Case transferred in from Boston Division. Case Number 04-11401. Case assigned to Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV. (Jones, Sherry)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Order on Motion to Transfer Case
                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [7] Motion to Transfer Case Between Divisions. (Abaid, Kim)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Motion to Transfer Case
                                              MOTION to Transfer Case Between Divisions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commerce Insurance Company. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 state court record
                                                    STATE COURT Record Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 6/3/2004, answer due 6/23/2004.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Answer
                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey III, Brooke P. Seliger on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Notice of Removal
                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. from Middlesex Superior Court, case number 04-2170. $ 150, receipt number 56734, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?