McNally et al v. A.C.T. Abatement Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10147-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo James Merloni, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis Mandarini, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Martin F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Paul J. McNally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo A.C.T. Abatement Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunbar Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Bagley, Jr. +1 617 244 3550 bagley@dunbarlawpc.com
Space Ronald William Dunbar +1 617 244 3550 +1 617 244 6363 dunbar@dunbarlawpc.com
Space Andrew E. Goloboy +1 617 244 3550 +1 617 244 6363 goloboy@dunbarlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo ACT Abatement Corp., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 1/25/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Stayed Pending Bankruptcy
County Middlesex
Terminated 7/8/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Hourihan, Lisa)
    LREF
    Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
    SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to ACT Abatement Corp. by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
      LREF
      Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Anne R. Sills (Sills, Anne)
        LREF
        Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by A.C.T. Abatement Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Court Order Appointing Receiver)(Bagley, William)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion to Amend
            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered denying [39] Motion for Leave to Supplement its Opposition to Motion for Attachment without prejudice because the moving party has failed to comply with Local Rule 7.1.(Hourihan, Lisa)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered denying [31] Motion for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (York, Steve)
                LREF
                Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion to Amend
                MOTION to Amend [37] Opposition to Motion,, [38] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by A.C.T. Abatement Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Supplement To Opposition To Motion For Attachment)(Bagley, William)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [31] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) filed by A.C.T. Abatement Corp.. (Goloboy, Andrew)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Opposition to Motion
                    Opposition re [31] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) filed by A.C.T. Abatement Corp.. (Goloboy, Andrew)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Goloboy on behalf of A.C.T. Abatement Corp. (Goloboy, Andrew)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 7/8/2008 ~Motion for Writ
                        MOTION for Writ of Attachment by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. Document received: Finding and Order of Approval of Attachment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                            AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman in Support re [31] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) filed by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A1# (2) Exhibit A2)(Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [31] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) filed by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant, or in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Disbursement of the Proceeds of the Sale of Personal Property (With Notice) by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Scheduling Conference
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2007. Anne Sills for the plaintiffs. William Bagley for the defendants. Plaintiffs to conduct an audit forthwith. Plaintiffs may file a motion for attachment of the equipment.Motions due by 10/31/2007. If no motion for summary judgment filed, counsel to file a joint status report by 10/31/07.(Court Reporter None Present.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceScheduling Conference set for 8/22/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by A.C.T. Abatement Corp..(Bagley, William)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Request for notice of default
                                        Request for notice of default. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Sills, Anne)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Order on Motion for Trustee Process
                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered withdrawing [21] Motion for Trustee Process, granting [27] Motion to Withdraw Motion for Trustee Process (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007, Terminated: 2/26/2007 Motion to Withdraw
                                            MOTION to Withdraw [21] Emergency MOTION for Trustee Process (With Notice) by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Sills, Anne)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal (as to Peabody Construction only) by James Merloni, Jr, ACT Abatement Corp., Peabody Construction Co., Inc., Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, A.C.T. Abatement Corp., Peabody Construction Company, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Beltram, Myles)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund (Sills, Anne)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [21] Emergency MOTION for Trustee Process (With Notice): Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Statement of counsel
                                                    STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Gregory A. Geiman re [21] Emergency MOTION for Trustee Process (With Notice) by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Sills, Anne)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Affidavit
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman re [21] Emergency MOTION for Trustee Process (With Notice) Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 4.2(g) by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Sills, Anne)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [21] Emergency MOTION for Trustee Process (With Notice) filed by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Sills, Anne)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 2/26/2007 Motion for Trustee Process
                                                          Emergency MOTION for Trustee Process (With Notice) by James Merloni, Jr, Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Sills, Anne)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACT Abatement Corp., Peabody Construction Co., Inc. (Leave to File Granted on February 1, 2007), filed by Louis Mandarini, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' District Council, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M)(Sills, Anne)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (York, Steve)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Terminate Motions
                                                                Motions terminated: [18] MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund,, Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, Paul J. McNally,, James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund,. (This motion has been terminated because it was updated and re-filed by counsel as docket entry [19])(York, Steve)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007, Terminated: 2/1/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Revised Amended Complaint with Revised Exhibits by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 1A# (3) Exhibit 1B# (4) Exhibit 1C# (5) Exhibit 1D# (6) Exhibit 1E# (7) Exhibit 1F# (8) Exhibit 1G# (9) Exhibit 1H# (10) Exhibit 1I# (11) Exhibit 1J# (12) Exhibit 1K# (13) Exhibit 1L# (14) Exhibit 1M# (15) Exhibit 2a# (16) Exhibit 2b# (17) Exhibit 2b-1# (18) Exhibit 2b-2# (19) Exhibit 2c# (20) Exhibit 2d)(Sills, Anne)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [18] MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (York, Steve)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007, Terminated: 1/17/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E-1a# (7) Exhibit E-1b# (8) Exhibit E-2# (9) Exhibit E-3# (10) Exhibit F# (11) Exhibit G# (12) Errata H# (13) Exhibit I# (14) Exhibit J# (15) Exhibit K# (16) Exhibit L# (17) Exhibit 2a# (18) Exhibit 2b# (19) Exhibit 2b1# (20) Exhibit C# (21) Exhibit 2d# (22) Exhibit 2e)(Sills, Anne)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [11] MOTION of John J. McNamara for leave to Withdraw as counsel for Reach and Apply Defendant Construction Co., INC. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2006 to File Agreement for Judgment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, A.C.T. Abatement Corp., Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Sills, Anne) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2006 (Hourihan, Lisa).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to March 1, 2006 to File Agreement for Judgment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, A.C.T. Abatement Corp., Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to February 14, 2006 to File Agreement for Judgment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.( (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 14, 2006 to File Agreement for Judgment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Sills, Anne)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2005 re [11] MOTION to Withdraw filed by Peabody Construction Company,. No one appears on behalf of Peabody Construction as required by the court. Counsel requests time to submit an affidavit from the Officer of the Corporation, Mr. Fish, re: withdrawal of counsel for Peabody Construction. (Court Reporter C. Scott.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of RESCHEDULING Hearing on Motion [11] MOTION to Withdraw: Motion Hearing reset for 12/14/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [11] MOTION to Withdraw: Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ElectronicORDER entered taking under advisement [11] Motion of John J. McNamara and Myles C. Beltram, for leave to Withdraw as counsel for Reach and apply Defendant Construction Co., INC. and granting [12] MOTION to Seal Affidavit of John J McNamara. The motion to withdraw as counsel is taken under advisement pending a hearing on the motion. The clerk shall set a date for the hearing, and counsel seeking to withdraw appearances shall notify their client that the motion to withdraw has been filed and that the client should be present at the time and place of the hearing. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                          Sealed Affidavit. (York, Steve)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [12] MOTION to Impound Affidavit of John J McNamara filed by Peabody Construction Company. (York, Steve)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [12] MOTION to Impound Affidavit of John J McNamara filed by Peabody Construction Company. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                MOTION to Impound Affidavit of John J McNamara by Peabody Construction Company.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005, Terminated: 6/16/2006 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to Withdraw as counsel for Reach and apply Defendant Construction Co., INC. by Peabody Construction Company.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by A.C.T. Abatement Corp..(York, Steve)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                      JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Sills, Anne)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2005. Counsel report that they are trying to settle this case. Motions or an agreement for judgment due by 1/31/2006. (Court Reporter None Present.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005, Terminated: 9/7/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to a Date After September 15, 2005 by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Sills, Anne)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 9/15/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [7] Motion to continue scheduling conference (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION Consented to Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference re [6] Notice of Scheduling Conference by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Sills, Anne)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Assented to Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint. A.C.T. Abatement Corp. answer due 3/18/2005. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint. filed by A.C.T. Abatement Corp..(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint filed by Peabody Construction Company.(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed A.C.T. Abatement Corp. served on 2/9/2005, answer due 3/1/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Peabody Construction Company served on 2/10/2005, answer due 3/2/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against A.C.T. Abatement Corp., Peabody Construction Company Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61655, filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Paul J. McNally, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Category Sheet# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C)(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to A.C.T. Abatement Corp., Peabody Construction Company. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?