Klingenschmitt v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 15-5050

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 10:46 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's principal brief [14] filed by Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt. Brief due 05/06/2015. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [228651]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
    MOTION of Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt to extend the time to 05/06/2015 at 05:00 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 04/13/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/31/2015 by email. [228183]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
      Notice of Rejection to Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt, the following document(s) is REJECTED for filing: motion to extend time to file appellant/petitioner principal brief [12]. Reason(s): No certificate of interest. Federal Circuit Rule 27(a)(7). Service: 03/30/2015 by email. [228179]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
        MOTION of Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt to extend the time to 05/06/2015 at 05:00 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 04/13/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/30/2015 by email. [227933]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
          Docketing Statement for the Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt. Service: 03/06/2015 by email. [222063]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
            Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 03/04/2015 by email. [221559]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
              Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt. Service: 02/19/2015 by email. [218355]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                Corrected Entry of appearance for John B. Wells as principal counsel for Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt. Service: 02/19/2015 by email. [218342]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt. Service: 01/18/2015 by email. [218150]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                    Entry of appearance for John B. Wells as principal counsel for Appellant Gordon J. Klingenschmitt. Service: 02/18/2015 by email. [218146]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                      Entry of appearance for Mikki Cottet as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 02/18/2015 by email. [217908]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                        Appeal docketed. Received: 01/30/2015. [215039]Entry of Appearance due 02/18/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/18/2015. Docketing Statement due 03/06/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 04/06/2015.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 110 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?