Lehman v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00138

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 3:06 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 motion to dismiss. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 9 as to Count 5 and Count 6 is GRANTED with prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 9 as to the remaining Counts is DENIED as moot. T he Clerk of Court is directed to REMAND the case to the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida, and to transmit a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of that Court. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and close this case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/13/2015. (LMF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/7/2015. (LMF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Case Management Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Strike
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Appear Telephonically
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Standing Order re: 25 pages
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Extend Time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?