Great Northern Insurance Company v. Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10165-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Great Northern Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Luccaro

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Cullen, Jr. +1 215 665 4105 +1 215 665 2013 jcullen@cozen.com
Space JOSEPH FRANK RICH +1 856 910 5000 +1 215 665 2013 jrich@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Loftus, III +1 617 723 7770 +1 617 248 9752 SoxDctr@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Hatem +1 617 406 4500 dhatem@donovanhatem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Robinson McCammon Osthimer & Tatum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Gregory +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 jay.gregory@leclairryan.com
No Logo W. B. Marden Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F Gleavy, Jr +1 508 230 2500 +1 508 230 2510 JGleavy@lynchlynch.com
No Logo Ellis & Schneider, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cosgrove, Eisenberg & Kiley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin S. Cosgrove +1 617 479 7770 +1 617 773 6901 dcarter@ceklaw.net
No Logo Thirty Acre Wood, LLC, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Space Frank S. Puccio +1 617 439 4758 +1 617 439 4148 puccio@burnsandfarrey.com
No Logo Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Hatem +1 617 406 4500 dhatem@donovanhatem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Robinson McCammon Osthimer & Tatum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Gregory +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 jay.gregory@leclairryan.com
No Logo Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Robinson McCammon Osthimer & Tatum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Gregory +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 jay.gregory@leclairryan.com
No Logo W. B. Marden Company, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo W. B. Marden Company, Cross-Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/27/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/13/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 59 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Johnson, Mary)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Mary)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Remark
      Remark by Deputy Clerk M. Johnson: "Atty. Patrick Loftus reported the case settled to the Court on this date, and requested a 30-day Settlement Order of Dismissal." ( Johnson, Mary) Modified on 7/13/2007 (Johnson, Mary).
        LREF
        Legal Document 58 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007, Terminated: 4/4/2007 Motion to Continue
        Joint MOTION to Continue TRIAL to 06/23/2007 OR AFTER and pre-trial conference by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP.(Gregory, Jay)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
          Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [58] Motion to Continue."The motion will be allowed, with no further requests for a continuance. Trial is hereby re-scheduled to MONDAY, JULY 23, 2007 AT 9:00 A.M. The Final Pre-Trial Conference is re-scheduled to July 19, 2007 at 4:00 P.M. All Trial Documents shall be filed by July 16, 2007. SO ORDERED". R. G. Stearns, USDJ. (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 4/4/2007 (Johnson, Mary).
            LREF
            Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
            Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2007 04:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns.(Johnson, Mary)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #57 - Trial Order - corrected because: it contained typographical errors. It has been corrected and re-docketed. (Johnson, Mary)
                LREF
                Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consulting Engineering Services, LLC. (Gregory, Jay)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Answer
                  Fourth Party Defendant ANSWER to Complaint by Consulting Engineering Services, LLC.(Gregory, Jay)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Waiver of Service Executed
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Consulting Engineering Services, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2006, answer due 12/4/2006. (Puccio, Frank)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Amended Complaint
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth against Consulting Engineering Services, Inc., filed by Thirty Acre Wood LLC.(Puccio, Frank)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: fourth amended complaint corrected because: counsel sent check for $350.00 which is not necessary (Flaherty, Elaine)Counsel have been notified by Clerk's Cashier Office and the check shall be returned
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [49] Motion to Compel, granting [50] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and allowing Appearance of James P. Cullen, Jr., for Pltf. Great Northern Ins. Co. "as to motion #49, the motion is ALLOWED except to the extent plaintiff has supplemented its answers by producing the report of its expert. R. G. Stearns, USDJ." (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 9/8/2006 (Johnson, Mary).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT (Fourth Party) against Consulting Engineering Services, LLC filed by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC.(Puccio, Frank) Modified on 9/11/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [15] MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M)(Cullen, James)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert Caplan by Great Northern Insurance Company.(Cullen, James)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [45] MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Party Complaint filed by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC, "The court's ruling denying motion to file fourth party complaint is VACATED. It is clear from the motion that there was compliance re: service pursuant to rule 15.1." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [48] Motion to Amend scheduling order "complete fact discovery 9/28/06; Pltf's expert reports 10/13/06; deft expert reports 10/30/06; complete all discovery 11/13/06; Complete expert depos 12/14/06; dispositive motions by 12/29/06; opps 14 days thereafter. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 8/10/06 electronic order corrected because: to reflect Judge's complete ruling "Denied. There is no notification of compliance with L.R. 15(1)(B)." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered denying [45] Motion for Leave to File; (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 8/10/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine)."Denied. There is no certification of compliance with L.R.15(1)(B)."
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion to Compel
                                          MOTION to Compel by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8))(Gregory, Jay)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Amend
                                            Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Puccio, Frank)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Attorney John Gleavy's record updated in this case to permit electronic noticing. Attorney Kathleen Brink terminated, following the filing of a notice of withdrawal of appearance filed on 10/6/05. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Response
                                                Answers to Interrogatories Response by Ellis & Schneider, Inc. to Interrogatories of Thirty Acre Wood, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Cosgrove, Martin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [45] MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Party Complaint filed by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC. (Puccio, Frank)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Party Complaint by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Puccio, Frank)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [43] Motion to Compel "No further extensions." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [43] MOTION to Compel Answers & Document Response from Plaintiff filed by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC. (Puccio, Frank)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006, Terminated: 6/6/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                          MOTION to Compel Answers & Document Response from Plaintiff by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC. (Attachments: # (1))(Puccio, Frank)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Scheduling Conference
                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2006. Attys. Loftus and Cullen present for the pltf. Attys. Smith, Cosgrove, Canty, and Gleavy present for the defts. After colloquy with the Court, the Joint Statement filed by parties is adopted as follows: all remaining written discovery shall be completed by 5-15-06; all remaining fact discovery shall be completed by 6-30-06; pltf's expert reports shall be served no later than 7-15-06; defts' expert reports shall be served no later than 8-1-06; all discovery shall be completed by 8-15-06 with exception of expert depositions; dispositive motions to be filed by 9-30-06 with oppositions due 14 days thereafter unless enlarged by the Court. If expert depositions are required, they shall be completed by 9-15-06. (Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 3/24/2006 (Johnson, Mary).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                              Amended JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Cullen, James)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Cullen, Jr on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Cullen, James)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [39] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James P. Cullen, Jr for Great Northern Insurance Company, Joseph F. Rich for Great Northern Insurance Company receipt number 70015 in the amount of $100.00 (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Northern Insurance Company re [39] First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Cullen and Joseph Rich. (Loftus, Patrick)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006, Terminated: 2/2/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Cullen and Joseph Rich by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Order# (2) Affidavit James P Cullen Jr# (3) Affidavit Joseph Rich# (4) Supplement Certficate of Good Standing James Cullen Jr# (5) Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Joseph Rich)(Loftus, Patrick)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, ENTERED. "DENIED."(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Ellis & Schneider, Inc. served on 12/20/2005, answer due 1/9/2006. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                              Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP REPLY BRIEF, filed. (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 1/6/2006 (Johnson, Mary).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [31] Motion for Leave to File (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey, III, Frank S. Puccio on behalf of Thirty Acre Wood, LLC, filed. Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC, filed.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                      ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Thirty Acre Wood, LLC, filed.Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP, Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Reply Brief)(Gregory, Jay)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                          THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ellis & Schneider, Inc. , filed by W. B. Marden Company, filed.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : ElectronicORDER entered granting [23] Motion for Leave to File (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response
                                                                                              Response by Great Northern Insurance Company to Defendant Ferguson's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Counterstatement of Material Facts in Dispute. (Caplan, Robert)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Opposition re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment and for the Entry of Separate and Final Judgment filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A thru D# (2) Exhibit E thru I)(Caplan, Robert)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Opposition re [26] MOTION for Summary Judgment and for the Entry of Separate and Final Judgment filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Caplan, Robert)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005, Terminated: 1/19/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment and for the Entry of Separate and Final Judgment by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Supplement Memorandum of Law# (6) Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts# (7) Affidavit of Oscar Shamamian# (8) Affidavit of Jay S. Gregory)(Gregory, Jay)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: motion amend complaint corrected because: unsigned (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Crossclaim by W. B. Marden Company.(Gleavy, John)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                          Proposed THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ellis & Schneider, Inc., filed by W. B. Marden Company.(Gleavy, John) Modified on 10/21/2005 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 11/10/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            First MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by W. B. Marden Company. (Attachments: # (1))(Gleavy, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2005 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by John F Gleavy, Jr (Gleavy, John)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John F Gleavy, Jr on behalf of W. B. Marden Company, W. B. Marden Company (Gleavy, John)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by John F Gleavy, Jr (Gleavy, John)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                    Third Party Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint of Third Party Plaintiff by Ellis & Schneider, Inc..(Cosgrove, Martin)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Martin S. Cosgrove on behalf of Ellis & Schneider, Inc. (Cosgrove, Martin)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 E-mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                        E-Mail Notices issued to Kathleen Brink returned as undeliverable. Clerk's Office has contacted staff at Mintz Levin, who will contact Ms. Brink and instruct her to update her address with this office. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to Rule 14(a) against Thirty Acre Wood, LLC, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company.(Caplan, Robert)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Thirty Acre Wood, LLC , filed by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Leave to File (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of motion: [15] MOTION to Compel filed by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP,. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel responses to the first set of interrogatories and first request for the production of documents from the plaitniff and for sanctions by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File third party complaint by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Scheduling Conference held on 5/18/2005. Attys. Loftus and Caplan present for the pltf. Attys. Brink and Gregory present for the deft. Pltf. will amend the Complaint to add additional parties within the next few weeks. All written discovery shall be served on or before 5-20-05; all responses to written discovery shall be served on or before 6-30-05; all fact discovery shall be completed by 10-28-05; all dispositive motions shall be filed by 12-15-05 with responses due 14 days thereafter; pltf's expert reports shall be served by 11-30-05; deft's expert reports shall be served by 12-30-05; ALL discovery shall becompleted by 12-30-05. (Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 6/1/2005 (Johnson, Mary).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by W. B. Marden Company. (Brink, Kathleen) Modified on 5/6/2005 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference entered. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2005 04:30 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP served on 2/16/2005, answer due 3/8/2005. Acknowledgement filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert M. Caplan for Great Northern Insurance Company, Daniel J. Luccaro for Great Northern Insurance Company, granting [6] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert M. Caplan for Great Northern Insurance Company, Daniel J. Luccaro for Great Northern Insurance Company (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against W. B. Marden Company by Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Luccaro Filing fee $ 100., receipt number 62389. by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Caplan Filing fee $ 100., receipt number 62389. by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by W. B. Marden Company.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen C. Tulloh Brink on behalf of W. B. Marden Company (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed W. B. Marden Company served on 2/7/2005, answer due 2/28/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP, W. B. Marden Company Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number Engel & Sc, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1))(Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 3/1/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine). Modified on 3/1/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Ferguson & Shamamian Architects, LLP, W. B. Marden Company. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?