AMCO Produce, Inc. v. Lee
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10151-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:31 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMCO Produce, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula Bonnell +1 617 367 5990

Toggle Switch Represented by Keaton and Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary E. Gardner +1 847 934 6500 gardner@pacatrust.com
v.
No Logo Larry V. Lee, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/26/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 891 - Agriculture Acts
Cause Section 07 U.S.C. § 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Barnstable
Terminated 11/8/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STAYED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Nicewicz, Craig)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by AMCO Produce, Inc. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE - The parties will file a joint status report by 9/30/05 regarding the status of bankruptcy proceedings. (Nicewicz, Craig)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Notice of filing of Bankruptcy matter
        NOTICE of filing of Bankruptcy matter (05-15137-JNF) in the District Court issued to counsel with copy to Bankruptcy Clerk. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Summons Returned Executed
          SUMMONS Returned Executed Larry V. Lee served on 2/8/2005, answer due 2/28/2005. (Barrette, Mark)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against Larry V. Lee Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61678, filed by AMCO Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrette, Mark)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Larry V. Lee. (Barrette, Mark)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Barrette, Mark)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 30 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?