Viola Hubbs v. Big Lots Stores, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01601

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 23, 2021 at 8:44 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Viola Hubbs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capstone Law APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/05/2015 Robert Kenneth Friedl +1 310 556 4811 +1 310 943 0396 robert.friedl@capstonelawyers.com
TERMINATED: 03/05/2015 Katherine W Kehr +1 310 556 4811 +1 310 943 0396 katherine.kehr@capstonelawyers.com
TERMINATED: 03/05/2015 Jonathan Sing Lee +1 310 556 4811 +1 310 943 0396 Jonathan.Lee@capstonelawyers.com
TERMINATED: 03/05/2015 Matthew Thomas Theriault +1 310 556 4811 +1 310 943 0396 matthew.theriault@capstonelawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mark Yablonovich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W Korn +1 310 286 0246 +1 310 407 5391 jeff@matison-margolese.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Yablonovich +1 310 286 0246 +1 310 496 2477 mark@yablonovichlaw.com
v.
No Logo Big Lots Stores, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Bockes +1 415 433 1940 kbockes@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa K. Horgan +1 415 433 1940 +1 415 704 3334 lhorgan@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy E. Pritikin +1 415 433 1940 +1 415 399 8490 npritikin@littler.com
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Pns Stores, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Bockes +1 415 433 1940 kbockes@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa K. Horgan +1 415 433 1940 +1 415 704 3334 lhorgan@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy E. Pritikin +1 415 433 1940 +1 415 399 8490 npritikin@littler.com
  Entries (299) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Settlement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Ruling
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Transcript Order Form (G-120)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Motion Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Settlement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Settlement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Ruling
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Settlement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Review
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Compel Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Compel Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Reply (Motion related),,, 90 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Opposition to Summary Judgment)(Knueve, Mark) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO ADHERE TO COURTS STANDING ORDER RE THE PREPARATION OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS (DKT. [90-10]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has received Defendants' Evidentiary Objections filed in relation to the Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 90-10) (Objections), which do not comply with the Courts Initial Standing Order with respect to how such objections shall be prepared. S.O., p. 16 (iii)(d). Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval and/or a ruling. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re Evidentiary Objections" with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by May 8, 2017. Additionally, the proposed order shall be uploaded in Word through the Court's CM/ECF system pursuant to the CM/ECF Procedures and Local Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc2, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. Notice of Status of Troester v. Starbucks, Corp. Pending Before the California Supreme Court (Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes 100 filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 7 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 8 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes, # 9 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Keith Mendes)(Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 87 filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Re Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 36 to Mark Yablonovich Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 37 to Mark Yablonovich Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 38 to Mark Yablonovich Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 39 to Mark Yablonovich Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 40-50 to Mark Yablonovich Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Keith Mendes, CFA in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Re Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Supplement Plaintiffs Objections to the Rebuttal Expert Report of Brendan P. Burke" Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Proposed Order Re Plaintffs' Objections to the Rebuttal Expert Report of Brendan P. Burke, # 10 Supplement Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to 41 Class Member Declarations Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to 41 Class Member Declarations, # 12 Supplement Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Non-Class Member Declarations Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Non-Class Member Declarations)(Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Re: Page Limit For Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion For Class Certification (ECF No. 87))(Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF KEITH MENDES (DKT. 100 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from July 3, 2017 to May 15, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Any opposition shall be filed by April 12, 2017, with the reply to be filed no later than April 24, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Exclude, 97 filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Knueve, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report on Settlement Efforts and continues the Post Mediation Status Conference from February 27, 2017 to April 17, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss what, if any, settlement efforts would be productive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MARK YABLONOVICH (DKT. 91 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from April 24, 2017 to April 17, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Any opposition shall be filed by March 13, 2017, with the reply to be filed no later than March 27, 2017.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Certify Class Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Declaration of Viola Hubbs in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 38 Declaration of Tamika Williams in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 39 Declaration of Brandon Coleman in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 40 Declaration of Keith Mendes in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 41 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, # 42 Exhibit A to RJN, # 43 Exhibit B to RJN, # 44 Proposed Order) (Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plainitffs' First, Second, Third, Fourth, and Eighth Causes of Action 83 filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Yablonovich in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition and Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Declaration of Brandon Coleman in Support of Opposition, # 33 Supplement, # 34 Supplement, # 35 Supplement, # 36 Proposed Order)(Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT. 83 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from March 27, 2017 to April 17, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. If an earlier date becomes available, the Court will advanced the hearing on the Motion. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER NOTIFYING PARTIES OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COURT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Effective December 19, 2016, Judge Kronstadt will relocate to the 1st Street Courthouse. His new address is 350 W. 1st Street, Courtroom 10B, Los Angeles, California 90012. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the mailbox for this Court outside the Clerk's Office, which is located on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING JURY TRIAL (DKT. 74 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Trial from January 17, 2018 to January 16, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark Yablonovich counsel for Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. Christopher Pantel is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING TIME OF POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE (DKT. 69 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of the Court's Order continuing the pretrial and trial dates (Dkt. 74 ), the Court continues the time of the February 27, 2017 Post Mediation Status Conference from 8:30 a.m. to 1:30 p.m. The joint report remains due on or before February 17, 2017. The Court will determine whether the February 27 hearing is necessary upon review of the report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE AND VACATE REMAINING DATES PENDING OUTCOME DATES PENDING OUTCOME OF CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation to Continue, 73 . The Court hereby orders that case schedule be amended as follows: Non-expert Discovery cut-off 7/31/2017., Last day to file Motions due by 9/11/2017., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2017 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt., Jury Trial set for 1/17/2018 09:00 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt.) (bp) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Continue Certification Schedule and Vacate Remaining Dates Pending Outcome of Certification Motion filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Pantel in Support of Stipulation to Continue Certification Schedule and Vacate Remaining Dates Pending Outcome of Certification Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Pantel, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting 71 Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. Rocco APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plainfiff, Viola Hubbs, designating Yvette Davis as local counsel. (bp) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam I. Rocco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18224953) filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate Supreme Court of Ohio, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Davis, Yvette) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Order Granting-in-part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 65 held before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. On March 15, 2016, the parties filed a joint stipulation regarding Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents from Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., ("Motion") (Docket Entry No. 66 ). The Court orders Defendant to produce the requested documents on a rolling production basis and to complete its production no later than June 7, 2016. (See Order for complete details) Court Recorder: CS 04/07/16. (afe) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Report. Dkt. 68 . Counsel report that they participated in a mediation session with Mark S. Rudy but were not able to reach a settlement. The report does not indicate whether the parties are engaging in direct settlement discussions or whether a further session with Mr. Rudy would be productive. The Court continues the April 18, 2016 Post Mediation Status Conference to February 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., to be heard with the motion for class certification. On or before February 17, 2016, counsel shall file an updated report on their settlement efforts and whether a further session with Mr. Rudy or another form of settlement would be productive and, if so, the anticipated date of its completion. The report shall not disclose the substantive contents of any settlement discussions between the parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CURRENT CASE SCHEDULE 64 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Post mediation status conference 01:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. Hearing on Class Certification motion February 27, 2017 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for September 18, 2017 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. Jury Trial set for October 10, 2017 09:00 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Continue Current Case Schedule filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Pantel in Support of Stipulation to Continue Current Case Schedule, # 2 Proposed Order)(Pantel, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark Yablonovich counsel for Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. Adding Christopher Pantel as counsel of record for Viola Hubbs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Yablonovich, Mark) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of James W. Pauley, III filed by defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Pauley, James) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 56 filed by defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc..(Pauley, James) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Pauley, James) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 56 filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc..(Pauley, James) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick Joseph Clifford counsel for Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. Jeffrey Korn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Clifford, Patrick) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick Joseph Clifford counsel for Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. Adding Patrick J. Clifford as counsel of record for Viola Hubbs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attorney Patrick Joseph Clifford added to party Viola Hubbs(pty:pla))(Clifford, Patrick) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Seconded AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Viola Hubbs(Korn, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney re Order by Judge John A. Kronstadt re Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106), 48 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Bockes, Kurt) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Continue Current Case Schedule filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Current Case Schedule And To Amend Complaint, # 3 Declaration of Yvette Davis in Support of Stipulation to Continue Current Case Schedule)(Davis, Yvette) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting 42 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel J. Clark on behalf of Defendants, designating Yvette Davis as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James W. Pauley, III on behalf of Defendants, designating Yvette Davis as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark A. Knueve on behalf of Defendants, designating Yvette Davis as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yvette Davis counsel for Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. Adding Yvette Davis as counsel of record for Big Lots Stores, Inc. and PNS Stores, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc. and PNS Stores, Inc.. (Attorney Yvette Davis added to party Big Lots Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Yvette Davis added to party PNS Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Davis, Yvette) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED CONSOLIDATED STANDING ORDERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on September 11, 2015, the Court amended its Standing Orders. Counsel shall obtain a copy of the Orders by referring to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (www.cacd.uscourts.gov). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pso) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: FINDING AS MOOT 34 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (shb) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike, 34 filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Supplement(Motion related), 33 filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Clifford, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **STRICKEN** REFER TO DKT. 30 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Jeffrey Korn filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Korn, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/30/2015 (pso). (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/8/15, 8:30 AM re Transcript 27 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/8/15, 8:30 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2015. (Joko, Alexander) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. Court Reporter. Court will contact Kurt R. Bockes at kbockes@littler.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: June 8, 2015 proceedings. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Bockes, Kurt) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND (DKT. 13) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion is DENIED. See Civil Minutes For Specifics. (bp) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CO-COUNSEL TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF LEAD TRIALCOUNSEL AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: **Note Changes Made By The Court**: Pursuant to Big Lots Stores, Inc.'s and PNS Stores, Inc.'s ("Defendants") Notice of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel to Attend Scheduling Conference (ECF No. 18), Section 2(a) of the Courts Order Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference (ECF No. 11), and good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby orders that Kurt R. Bockes, attorney for Defendants, is hereby permitted to appear at the June 8, 2015, scheduling conference in place of Nancy Pritikin. Mr. Bockes shall have full knowledge of the case, be fully aware of lead trial counsel's schedule and have full authority to set all dates in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cr) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Order Regarding Notice of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel to Attend Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Notice of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel to Attend Scheduling Conference)(Bockes, Kurt) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. 18 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency(ies) has been found with your electronically filed document: Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by June 4, 2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc.. of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel, Nancy E. Pritikin to Attend June 8, 2015 Scheduling Conference and Request for Defendants' Attorney of Record, Kurt R. Bockes to Appear (Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MAY 4, 2015 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Scheduling Conference from May 4, 2015 to June 8, 2015 at 8:30 a.m., with the Motion to Remand. The parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report is due no later than May 29, 2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc..(Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2015 at 01:30 PM. Joint Report: April 24, 2015.(See order for details) (bp) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to PNS Stores, Inc. answer now due 3/27/2015; Big Lots Stores, Inc. answer now due 3/27/2015, filed by Defendant PNS Stores, Inc.; Big Lots Stores, Inc..(Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change in Counsel filed by Plaintiff Viola Hubbs. (Korn, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED by Judge John A. Kronstadt: See document for details. (cr) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., served on March 5, 2015. (Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., served on March 5, 2015. (Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., (Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC535754 Receipt No: 0973-15318415 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant PNS Stores, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-K) (Attorney Lisa K Horgan added to party Big Lots Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa K Horgan added to party PNS Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Horgan, Lisa) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 870 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?