Adames v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10189-JGD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edwin Adames, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by One Faneuil Hall Marketplace

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Palmer +1 617 723 7010 jpalmer@socialaw.com
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Mark Cohen +1 617 748 3626 +1 617 748 3969 jeffrey.cohen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Todd, Richard S., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Mark Cohen +1 617 748 3626 +1 617 748 3969 jeffrey.cohen@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 2/1/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause Section 19 U.S.C. § 1305 Custom Duties U.S.C. § 0Forfeiture-Immoral Articles
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Essex
Terminated 9/24/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Edwin Adames, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Palmer, John)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Motion Hearing
      Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2007 re [30] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Edwin Adames. Attorney Palmer with his client Adames and AUSA Cohen; Attorney Palmer reports he withdraws his motion and plaintiff Adames will dismiss the complaint. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered withdrawing [30] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Motion Hearing
          Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2007 re [30] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Edwin Adames. USMJ Dein hears from Attorney Palmer and continues this hearing for 9/19/07 @ 2:00pm. Attorney Palmer shall have his client present at hearing. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [30] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing for Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel ONLY set for 9/17/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Counsel is to the notify the Plaintiff of the time and place of hearing. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
              LREF
              Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edwin Adames.(Palmer, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Status Conference
                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 6/28/2007.; Counsel state status of the case; court sets the case for trial; A Bench Trial has been set for 9/25/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Trial briefs are due by 9/11/07;(Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 6/28/2007 (Simeone, Maria). Modified on 6/28/2007 (Simeone, Maria).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial
                    Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER RE TRIAL entered. A jury waived trial will be held before this court on Tuesday, September 25, 2007, beginning at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom #15 on the Fifth Floor. The parties shall each submit a trial brief by September 11, 2007. The trial briefs shall include a list of witnesses, exhibits and any legal issues the parties wish the court to address. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                      Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [28] Joint Motion to Continue. Status Conference reset for 6/28/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007, Terminated: 6/18/2007 Motion to Continue
                        Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to June 28, 2007 by Plaintiff and by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                          Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                            Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [26] Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007, Terminated: 6/13/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/19/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Status Conference
                                  Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 4/26/2007. Counsel report discovery is not complete and seek 6 weeks to complete discovery. USMJ Dein extends discovery 6 weeks for counsel to take depositions and review documents. Next conference is set for 6/19/07 @ 10:00am. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/26/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Status Conference
                                      Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 1/25/2007. Attorney Palmer and AUSA Cohen report case status; USMJ Dein lifts stay on written discovery, sets schedule; next conference is set for 4/26/07 @ 2:30pm. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered regarding [22] Plaintiff's Motion to Revoke Stay. A status conference has been scheduled for 1/24/07 at 3:00PM in Courtroom #15 on the 5th Floor, at which time the court will address whether the stay should be continued and, if not, an appropriate discovery schedule. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                          Opposition re [22] MOTION to Revoke Stay filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006, Terminated: 12/6/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            MOTION to Revoke Stay by Edwin Adames.(Palmer, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Order
                                              Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered re [21] Status Report filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. The case remains stayed, either party may move to lift the stay at any time, and the defendant is to file a status report with this court by 2/2/07. The next status report shall be a joint report.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Status Report
                                                STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Order
                                                  Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered re [20] Joint Status Report. The case remains stayed, either party may move to lift the stay at any time, and the defendant is to file a status report with this court by 10/2/06.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by Edwin Adames and by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                      Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Joint Motion to Stay. Either party may move to lift the stay at any time. The defendant is to file a status report with this court by 6/1/06. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 2/21/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay by Edwin Adames and by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/28/2006 02:45 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Status Conference
                                                            Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 12/5/2005.; Attorneys Palmer and Cohen report case status; discovery motions due 2/17/06; next status conference is set for 2/28/06 @ 2:45pm. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT For Return Of Property against Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Edwin Adames.(Palmer, John)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/5/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Status Conference
                                                                    Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 10/27/2005.; AUSA Cohen and Attorney Palmer report current case status; plaintiff will amend complaint by 11/15/05 and dft. will file answer. Next conference is set for 12/5/05 @ 2:30pm (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/30/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                                                                        Judge Rya W. Zobel : Order ORDER entered. ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Rya W. Zobel no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(Urso, Lisa)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magis
                                                                          CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge.. (Smith3, Dianne) Modified on 11/30/2005 (Smith3, Dianne).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                            Proposed Document(s). Document received: Settlement Proposal. (Palmer, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Edwin Adames.(Palmer, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel : Scheduling Conference held on 6/28/2005. Case to be referred to Mag. Judge Dein for all purposes. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Jeffrey Mark Cohen on behalf of Todd Richards. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Jeffrey Mark Cohen on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                      JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                        Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [4] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Allowed with respect to any claim for damages. Denied with respect to the equitable claim. A scheduling conference is set for 6/28/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Opposition re [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Edwin Adames. (Palmer, John)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [6] Motion to extend time to file opposition. Opposition due 5/16/05 (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005, Terminated: 5/10/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION To Enlarge Time For Filing Opposition To Motion To Dismiss by Edwin Adames.(Palmer, John)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 5/31/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Todd Richards.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                      Judge Rya W. Zobel : electronicORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Todd Richards answer due 4/22/2005; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 4/22/2005. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005, Terminated: 4/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April, 22, 2005 to File Answer and/or otherwise respond by Todd Richards, Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61738, filed by Edwin Adames. (Attachments: # (1) category sheet# (2))(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, Todd Richards. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?