Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. Menara Networks, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00333

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:18 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sycamore Ip Holdings LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Menara Networks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/28/2015 Lithaw Howard Lim +1 214 740 8555 +1 214 756 8555 hlim@lockelord.com
TERMINATED: 10/28/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY TTAB Attorney Placeholder cphipps@lockelord.com
TERMINATED: 10/28/2015 TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 740 8662 +1 214 756 8662 plein@lockelord.com
No Logo Packetlight Networks Ltd., Defendant
No Logo PacketLight USA, Defendant
No Logo Xena Networks Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pogach & Trachtenberg PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/03/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Kelly Trachtenberg +1 713 226 6686 +1 713 226 6286 brian@law-pt.com
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Order Staying Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 33 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?