Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. Transmode Systems Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00334

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 1:14 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sycamore Ip Holdings LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Transmode Systems Ab, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Indranil Mukerji +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mukerji@fr.com
No Logo Transmode Systems Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Indranil Mukerji +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mukerji@fr.com
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 22 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?