Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. Xtera Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00335

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 1:10 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sycamore Ip Holdings LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Xtera Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lithaw Howard Lim +1 214 740 8555 +1 214 756 8555 hlim@lockelord.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder cphipps@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 740 8662 +1 214 756 8662 plein@lockelord.com
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 23 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?