SUN v. HAN et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00703-JMV-MF
District Judge John Michael Vazquez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2021 at 3:45 PM ST (8.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHAO SUN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
v.
No Logo Bruce Zurbrick, Defendant
No Logo DAQING HAN, Defendant
No Logo GUANGHUI CHENG, Defendant
No Logo GUANGJUN LU, Defendant
No Logo GUOBIN PAN, Defendant
No Logo Hong, Li, Defendant
No Logo LIAN ZHU, Defendant
No Logo MAZARS CPA LIMITED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FELICE BETH GALANT +1 212 318 3000 +1 212 318 3400 fgalant@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FELICE BETH GALANT +1 212 318 3000 +1 212 318 3400 fgalant@fulbright.com
No Logo MAZARS SCRL, Defendant
No Logo Ming, Li, Defendant
No Logo TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo WeiserMazars LLP, Defendant
No Logo XIAOLI YU, Defendant
No Logo YUANPIN HE, Defendant
No Logo Bin Qu, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E Cecchi +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 JCecchi@CarellaByrne.com
Space DONALD A. ECKLUND +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 decklund@carellabyrne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lionel Z. Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160
No Logo Joseph Hirsch, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blakemore, David

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antonio Vozzolo +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 avozzolo@vozzolo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antonio Vozzolo +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 avozzolo@faruqilaw.com
No Logo Ting Xiong, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E Cecchi +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 JCecchi@CarellaByrne.com
No Logo Walter Aerts and Zhu Xi, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eduard Korsinsky +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 ek@zlk.com
No Logo Zurbrick Family, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BARRY J. GAINEY +1 201 225 9001 +1 201 225 9002 bgainey@gme-law.com
No Logo JED D. MELNICK, Mediator
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Office Newark
Filed 2/2/2015
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags MEDIATION-PRIVATE,RULE16
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Telephone Conference
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2017. (LM, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                    TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that there shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on February 1, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 1/27/17. (LM, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  QC - Updating Account
                        CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Change of Address document [62] submitted by (FELICE BETH GALANT, ESQ.) on 9/8/2016 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ld, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by FELICE BETH GALANT (GALANT, FELICE)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Remark
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Telephone Conference
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 8/17/2016. (LM, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                    TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that there shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on August 17, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/12/16. (LM, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 8/10/2016. (LM, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Settlement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 60 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Letter
                                            Letter from Donald A. Ecklund to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. (ECKLUND, DONALD)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that there shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on August 10, 2016 at 10:15 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 7/20/16. (LM, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2016. (LM, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Order Appointing MediatorCourt Filing
                                                      Order Appointing Mediator, "Referring to Mediation" JED D. MELNICK appointed.This action is hereby stayed for ninety (90) days from the date of this Order. If mediation is not successful, there shall be a telephone conference beforethe Undersigned on July 13, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/11/16. (DD, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 4/8/2016. (LM, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that there shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on April 8, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/29/16. (LM, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 3/29/2016. (LM, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the scheduling conference before the Undersigned on March 29, 2016 will now proceed as a telephone conference at 11:15 a.m. Defendant Mazars CPA Limited is directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/28/16. (LM, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
                                                                    Pro Hac Vice counsel, CASEY E. SADLER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                      Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Casey E. Sadler to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        TEXT ORDER: On or before March 11, 2016, each party shall deliver a letter to the Court, via mail, not to exceed 5 pages, summarizing the relevant facts, the legal positions, and the status of the case. Counsel are also to provide a courtesy copy to Magistrate Judge Falk. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 3/1/16. (rg, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2016 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 2/29/16. (LM, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                            TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Jose L. Linares, Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/23/2016. (seb)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint) by MAZARS CPA LIMITED.(GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER that all claims against defendants Telestone Technologies Services, Hong Li, Ming Li, Lian Zhu, Guanghui Cheng, Guobin Pan, Yuanpin He, Mazars Scrl and Weisermazars LLP, are hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk's Office is hereby directed to terminate the aforementioned defendants. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/19/2016. (ld, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  TEXT ORDER: This Court is in receipt of the letter filed by Plaintiffs counsel explaining Plaintiffs efforts to serve foreign defendants (ECF No. 48), filed in response to the Clerks Notice of Call for Dismissal pursuant to Rule 4(m) (ECF No. 47). The parties are advised that, on account of the representations made by Plaintiffs counsel in the January 15, 2016 letter that Plaintiff is attempting to serve certain foreign defendants in accordance with the Hague Convention and the applicable rules of service under the laws of China, the in-person conference scheduled for January 19, 2016 at 10:00am relating to this Courts 4(m) notice is hereby CANCELLED. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Jose L. Linares on 01/19/2016. (lr, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Letter
                                                                                    Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. re [47] Notice of Call for dismissal. (CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Notice of Call for dismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                      Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 4(m) Motion set for 1/19/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (lr, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting Extension of Time to File Answer; the time for Mazars CPA's deadline to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint has been extended to January 29, 2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/4/2016. (ld, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015, Terminated: 1/4/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [28] Amended Complaint, (Letter Motion) by MAZARS CPA LIMITED. (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [29] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/21/2015. (ld, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                              OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/21/2015. (ld, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MAZARS CPA LIMITED re [41] Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MAZARS CPA LIMITED re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                    Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Scott P. Drake to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                      Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tyler H.Lipp to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice counsel, TYLER H. LIPP, ESQ. and SCOTT P. DRAKE, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW027884 for TYLER H. LIPP, ESQ. (ld, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW027884 for SCOTT P. DRAKE, ESQ. (ld, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bin Qu re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice admission as to Scott P. Drake, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/12/2015. (anr)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice admission as to Tyler H. Lipp, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/12/2015. (anr)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Letter
                                                                                                                    Letter from Felice B. Galant. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Felice B. Galant in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott P. Drake, # (2) Declaration of Scott P. Drake, # (3) Certification of Felice B. Galant in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler H. Lipp, # (4) Declaration of Tyler H. Lipp, # (5) Text of Proposed Order Admitting Scott P. Drake Pro Hac Vice, # (6) Text of Proposed Order Admitting Tyler H. Lipp Pro Hac Vice, # (7) Certificate of Service)(GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER: Per this Courts Order dated July 27, 2015 (ECF No. 27), Plaintiff may file an Opposition to Defendant Mazars Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 29) no later than November 17, 2015, and to the extent Defendant Mazars wishes to file a Reply, such Reply is to be filed no later than December 4, 2015. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/7/15. (lr, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAZARS CPA LIMITED. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (ld, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MAZARS CPA LIMITED re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by MAZARS CPA LIMITED. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support filed by MAZARS CPA LIMITED re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015, Terminated: 12/21/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by MAZARS CPA LIMITED. Responses due by 11/17/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against GUANGHUI CHENG, DAQING HAN, YUANPIN HE, HONG LI, MING LI, GUANGJUN LU, MAZARS CPA LIMITED, MAZARS SCRL, GUOBIN PAN, TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, WEISERMAZARS LLP, XIAOLI YU, LIAN ZHU, Bruce Zurbrick., filed by Bin Qu.(ld, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER extending deadline by which Plaintiff must file an Amended Complaint to 8/17/2015;etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/27/2015. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD A. ECKLUND on behalf of Bin Qu (ECKLUND, DONALD)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Letter
                                                                                                                                  Letter from Donald A. Ecklund to the Honorable Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. (ECKLUND, DONALD)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number NEW026616 for ROBERT V. PRONGAY, ESQ., CASEY E. SADLER, ESQ. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission as to ROBERT V. PRONGAY, ESQ., CASEY E. SADLER, ESQ.; ORDERED that Robert V. Prongay and Casey E. Sadler shall each make payment of $150 to the Clerk of the Court in Accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/18/2015. (ld,).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission as to ROBERT V. PRONGAY, ESQ., CASEY E. SADLER, ESQ.; ORDERED that Robert V. Prongay and Casey E. Sadler shall each make payment of $150 to the Clerk of the Court in Accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/18/2015. (ld,). (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE AS TO LEAD PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; Lead Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 3, 2015 to file a response to any motion to dismiss filed by Mazars. Mazars shall have up to and including November 20, 2015 to file a reply in support of any motion to dismiss, Lead Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 3, 2015 to file an amended complaint, Mazars shall have up to and including September 18, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/2/2015. (ld, ) Modified on 6/22/2015 (ld).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE AS TO LEAD PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; Lead Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 3, 2015 to file a response to any motion to dismiss filed by Mazars. Mazars shall have up to and including November 20, 2015 to file a reply in support of any motion to dismiss, Lead Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 3, 2015 to file an amended complaint, Mazars shall have up to and including September 18, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/2/2015. (ld, ) Modified on 6/22/2015 (ld). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015, Terminated: 6/5/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Answer or Motion in Response by MAZARS CPA LIMITED. (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Letter
                                                                                                                                                Letter from Donald A. Ecklund to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. requesting pro hac vice admission of Robert V. Prongay and Casey E. Sadler.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Donald A. Ecklund, # (2) Declaration of Robert V. Prongay, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing for Robert v. Prongay, # (4) Declaration of Casey E. Sadler, # (5) Certificate of Good Standing for Casey E. Sadler, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(ECKLUND, DONALD)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED that lead Plaintiff will file an amended complaint, regarding an agreed schedule, and Mazars will answer or otherwise respond to same. Counsel for Mazars and co-lead counsel for the Lead Plaintiff will work together to create such agreed schedule, and will submit same for the Court's approval no later than June 2, 2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/21/2015. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Letter
                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Scott Drake and Felice Galant. (GALANT, FELICE)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead PlaintiffCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [5] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; granting [6] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; denying [7] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; denying [8] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; denying [9] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff.; ORDERED that Bin Qu shall serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action; ORDERED that Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C. and Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP shall serve as Lead Plaintiffs co-lead counsel;etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/14/2015. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/14/2015. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; granting 6 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; denying 7 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. ; denying 9 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff.; ORDERED that Bin Qu shall serve as Lead Plaintiff in this action; ORDERED that Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C. and Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP shall serve as Lead Plaintiffs co-lead counsel;etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/14/2015. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/14/2015. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Bin Qu of Firm Name Change. (ECKLUND, DONALD)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Walter Aerts and Zhu Xi re [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff (KORSINSKY, EDUARD)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Bin Qu re [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [5] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [9] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [7] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [8] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff (CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Zurbrick Family re [7] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion (GAINEY, BARRY)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support filed by Bin Qu re [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [5] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [9] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [7] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [8] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of James E. Cecchi, # (2) Exhibit A to the Cecchi Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to the Cecchi Declaration)(CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Walter Aerts and Zhu Xi re [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [5] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [9] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [7] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff (KORSINSKY, EDUARD)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ting Xiong re [5] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff (CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to [9] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [8] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [5] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , [7] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff . Motion set for 5/4/2015 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Joseph Hirsch. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Declaration of Antonio Vozzolo, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Text of Proposed Order)(VOZZOLO, ANTONIO)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Walter Aerts and Zhu Xi. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Text of Proposed Order)(KORSINSKY, EDUARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Bruce Zurbrick, Zurbrick Family. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Declaration of Thomas J. McKenna, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Text of Proposed Order)(GAINEY, BARRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Bin Qu. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Declaration of James E. Cecchi, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Ting Xiong. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Declaration of Patrick Donovan, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Returned Unexecuted by CHAO SUN as to TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted by CHAO SUN as to TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAO SUN. TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to GUANGHUI CHENG, DAQING HAN, YUANPIN HE, HONG LI, MING LI, GUANGJUN LU, MAZARS CPA LIMITED, MAZARS SCRL, GUOBIN PAN, TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, WEISERMAZARS LLP, XIAOLI YU, LIAN ZHU Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against GUANGHUI CHENG, DAQING HAN, YUANPIN HE, HONG LI, MING LI, GUANGJUN LU, MAZARS CPA LIMITED, MAZARS SCRL, GUOBIN PAN, TELESTONE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, WEISERMAZARS LLP, XIAOLI YU, LIAN ZHU ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6184685) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHAO SUN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PSLRA Certification, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 383 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?