James et al v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01161

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 3:59 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Allen Johnson, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo Ashley Johnson, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo Carolyn Johnson, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo Jermain James, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo Michael Lawton, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo Quamiek Robinson, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo Shaquasia Sanders, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
No Logo William Smith, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David A. Zelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Zelman +1 718 604 3072 +1 718 604 3074 dzelman@civrtslaw.com
v.
No Logo Captain Fernando Guimares, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective Dmaine Freeland, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #461 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective Emerah Ates, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #257 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective FNU Santana, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective Gabriel Nacelewicz, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #6511 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective John McHugh, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #581 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective Joseph Fernandez, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #1815 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Detective Karanlall Brijbukhan, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #660 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer FNU Blake, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer John Paul Catano, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #20210 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer Juner Cevallos, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #4590 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer Sean Gillespie, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Shield #2626 Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officers John/Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Sgt. Omar Colon, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Hearing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 3/16/2016 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 9/23/2016. On or before 9/23/2016, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 10/14/2016, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 11/152016, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 7/13/2016 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Defendants' counsel is to organize a conference call, then phone Chambers at (718) 613-2300 with all counsel on the line. On or before 7/7/2016, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01161-AMD-VMS, 1:15-cv-06118-AMD-VMS (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER: As discussed during the 12/14/2015 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), 17 Motion for additional time is denied without prejudice. If counsel need additional time after conducting additional discovery, they may request it on or before 1/31/2016. Any request should include a detailed discovery schedule, including dates for depositions. Counsel must review the Rules of District Judge Donnelly which are available on the court's website. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/14/2015. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 7/14/2015 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 2/16/2016. On or before 2/19/2016, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 3/18/2016, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 3/18/2016, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial conference request. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/14/2015 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiff's counsel is to organize a conference call, then phone Chambers at (718) 613-2300 with all counsel on the line. On or before 12/7/2015, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/14/2015. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Zelman, David) Modified on 12/15/2015 to add motion (Quinlan, Krista). (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?