In the matter of Complaint Bru
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-665

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 5:50 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-76), on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED. Service date 06/22/2015 by CM/ECF.[1537588] [15-665] [Entered: 06/22/2015 02:48 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED. Service date 06/22/2015 by CM/ECF.[1537585] [15-665] [Entered: 06/22/2015 02:47 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
      ORDER, dated 05/13/2015, setting Appellant's brief and appendix filing date for on or before June 22, 2015, FILED.[1508681] [15-665] [Entered: 05/13/2015 09:39 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
        NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1466822] [15-665] [Entered: 03/23/2015 11:19 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
          FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED. Service date 03/19/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1464983] [15-665] [Entered: 03/19/2015 02:11 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
            FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED. Service date 03/19/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1464980] [15-665] [Entered: 03/19/2015 02:10 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED. Service date 03/19/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1464979] [15-665] [Entered: 03/19/2015 02:09 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, Form D, and Acknowledgment/Appearance Form, [7], [8], [9], on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED.[1464932] [15-665] [Entered: 03/19/2015 01:44 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                  ORDER, dismissing appeal by 4/2/2015, unless Appellant Bruce Germain, submits Forms C and D, FILED.[1464768] [15-665] [Entered: 03/19/2015 11:32 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                    ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1453317] [15-665] [Entered: 03/05/2015 11:30 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                      DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/09/2015, RECEIVED.[1453314] [15-665] [Entered: 03/05/2015 11:29 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Germain, FILED. [1453309] [15-665] [Entered: 03/05/2015 11:26 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 40 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?