New Vision Hotels Two, LLC v. Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00350
District Judge Marcia S. Krieger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 19, 2017 at 9:18 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Safe Streets Alliance, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo Accounting Specialists, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bank of the West, Defendant
No Logo Christine Voutour, Defendant
No Logo David Katz, Defendant
No Logo Dirk Fowler, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Jay Olson, Defendant
No Logo Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Merchants Bonding Co., Defendant
No Logo Michael Massa, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Haussman, Defendant
No Logo The Managers, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice filed in this case on 12/10/15. Text Only Entry (dkals, ) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE re 100 Order Response to Order Directing Refiling by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER DIRECTING REFILING by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/8/15. (msksec, ) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC (Thompson, David) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STIPULATION by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. (Ray, Colin) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 96 Judgment, Add and Terminate Parties entered In favor of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC Against Accounting Specialists, Inc., In favor of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC Against Michael Massa by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              JUDGMENT in favor of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC and against Accounting Specialists, Inc. and Michael Massa, pursuant to 93 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, by Clerk on 9/9/15. (dkals, ) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE re 93 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment (Proposed Order) by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY to Response to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25 - Summit Marijuana Website Letter, # 2 Exhibit 26 - New Vision Backup Contract, # 3 Exhibit 27 - Summit Marijuana Contract Extension, # 4 Exhibit 28 - Thompson Declaration)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment from Accounting Specialists, Inc. and Michael Massa by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Offer of Judgment)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 89 Judgment, Add and Terminate Parties entered In favor of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC Against Merchants Bonding Co. by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Michael Massa)(Pink, Jason) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          BRIEF in Opposition to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Wolf, Adam) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            JUDGMENT in favor of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC and against Merchants Bonding Co., pursuant to 88 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, by Clerk on 7/9/15. (dkals, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Under Rule 68 by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CLERK'S NOTICE: 86 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment will not be issued as: the terms listed in the acceptance do not match those in the offer. Text Only Entry (dkals, ) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment Under Rule 68, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: 84 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment will not be issued as: the acceptance does not match the offer, the acceptance was not timely filed. Text Only Entry (dkals, ) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) RE Offer of Judgment)(Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Plaintiff to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 82 . Extension granted up to and including July 17, 2015, for filing of a response and up to and including August 3, 2015, for filing of a reply. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/15. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pink, Jason) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            BRIEF in Opposition to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant David Katz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of David B. Katz)(Katz, David) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STIPULATION of Undisputed Facts by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Party Safe Streets Alliance terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal filed in this case on 6/15/15. Text Only Entry (dkals, ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal filed in this case on 6/15/15. Text Only Entry (dkals, ) Modified on 6/15/2015 to note that this was filed in error, and has no bearing on this case (dkals, ). (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Safe Streets Alliance by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      JOINDER re 70 Brief in Support of Motion, 68 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co.. (Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/11/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/10/2015. (emill) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2015. Discovery due by 2/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2016. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff New Vision Hotels Two, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summit Marijuana Incorporation, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Summit Marijuana Application Materials, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Katz Contract, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Merchants Bond, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2013 Accounting Documents, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 2009 Accounting Documents, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 2011 Organizational Minutes, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Merchants Iowa Certificate of Existence, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Managers Lease, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Managers Purchase Contract, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Summit Daily News Article, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Summit Marijuana Website Photograph, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Carroll Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Dwyer Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Brickson Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Burke 2014 Contract, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Rowmark 2014 Bill, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Helmer Bill, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Carroll Jan. 13 Travel Bill, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Carroll Jan. 28 Travel Bill, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Easement Bill, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Onorato Bill, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Carroll April Travel Bill, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Burke 2015 Contract)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  BRIEF in Support of 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Pink, Jason) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REPLY to Response to 52 MOTION to Dismiss , 50 MOTION to Dismiss , 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6), 45 MOTION to Dismiss Reply to Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co.. (Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY to Response to 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. (Wolf, Adam) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs in Support of Motions to Dismiss, up to and including 5/29/2015, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/26/2015.(emill) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION to Dismiss , 50 MOTION to Dismiss , 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6), 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Accounting Specialists, Inc., Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Merchants Bonding Co., Gerald Jay Olson, Michael Massa, David Katz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/26/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION to Dismiss , 50 MOTION to Dismiss , 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6), 45 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., David Katz, Michael Massa, Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Merchants Bonding Co., Gerald Jay Olson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pink, Jason) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets AllianceAttorney Peter A. Patterson added to party New Vision Hotels Two, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Patterson added to party Safe Streets Alliance(pty:pla) (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference, to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference, and to Stay Discovery. The Scheduling Conference remains set on 6/10/2015 at 10:00 AM and the proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before 6/3/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/18/2015.(alowe) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 61 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, to Continue Rule 26(F) Conference, and to Stay Discovery filed by New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/18/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, to Continue Rule 26(F) Conference, and to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE to 52 MOTION to Dismiss , 50 MOTION to Dismiss , 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6), 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A: Declaration of Bill Carroll, # 2 Attachment B: Declaration of Kirk Dwyer, # 3 Attachment C: Declaration of Todd T. Brickson)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/6/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Katz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/6/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Merchants Bonding Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/6/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM regarding 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/6/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                JOINDER re 52 MOTION to Dismiss , 53 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co.. (Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  JOINDER in Other Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Pink, Jason) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    BRIEF in Support of 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Pink, Jason) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Pink, Jason) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        BRIEF in Support of 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant David Katz. (Katz, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant David Katz. (Katz, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co.. (Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Adam B. Wolf has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and one or more of the following Electronic Case Filing Procedures(Civil Cases): 1.1, 1.3(f), 4.1(a), and/or 4.3, which mandate, with exceptions inapplicable here, that all documents filed in civil cases must be filed electronically, shall be converted directly to portable document format (PDF) from software applications in which they were created (i.e., No scanned documents), shall include a signature block with the filer's typed name, typed signature and must match the filers login and password (i.e. a filer may not use non-signatory's login and password to file a document). See ECF Procedure 4.3. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, ) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                JOINDER in other Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. (Ray, Colin) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Support of 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. (Ray, Colin) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. (Ray, Colin) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party The Managers, Inc., Robert L. Haussman, and Christine Voutour by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Reset Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/2/15. All defendants shall have until 4/17/15 to answer the Complaint, and the Scheduling Conference is reset to 6/10/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (dkals, ) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to ComplaintJoint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/2/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin Reece Ray on behalf of Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay OlsonAttorney Colin Reece Ray added to party Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Reece Ray added to party Gerald Jay Olson(pty:dft) (Ray, Colin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam B. Wolf on behalf of Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay OlsonAttorney Adam B. Wolf added to party Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adam B. Wolf added to party Gerald Jay Olson(pty:dft) (Wolf, Adam) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel John Carr on behalf of Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLCAttorney Daniel John Carr added to party Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC(pty:dft) (Carr, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Dirk Fowler by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/19/15. Defendant Accounting Specialists, Inc. and Michael Massa shall answer by 4/17/2015. (dkals, ) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint,,, filed by Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/19/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Merchants Bonding Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re 1 Complaint. Merchants Bonding Co. answer due 4/17/2015. Scheduling Conference remains set 4/27/2015 10:00 AM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/18/2015.(emill) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon N. Banashek on behalf of Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael MassaAttorney Jon N. Banashek added to party Accounting Specialists, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jon N. Banashek added to party Michael Massa(pty:dft) (Banashek, Jon) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Accounting Specialists, Inc., Michael Massa. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pink, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint,,, filed by Merchants Bonding Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/18/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Merchants Bonding Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order RE Merchants Bonding Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading)(Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to 1 Complaint. Robert L. Haussman answer due 4/15/2015; The Managers, Inc. answer due 4/15/2015; Christine Voutour answer due 4/15/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/2015. (emill) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Gerald Jay Olson. Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC answer due 4/8/2015; Gerald Jay Olson answer due 4/9/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Robert L. Haussman, The Managers, Inc., Christine Voutour. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/16/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Robert L. Haussman, The Managers, Inc., Christine Voutour. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sprouse, Frederick) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant David Katz. David Katz answer due 4/13/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Connor Lee Cantrell on behalf of Merchants Bonding Co.Attorney Connor Lee Cantrell added to party Merchants Bonding Co.(pty:dft) (Cantrell, Connor) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick Quinn Hustead on behalf of Merchants Bonding Co.Attorney Patrick Quinn Hustead added to party Merchants Bonding Co.(pty:dft) (Hustead, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. David Katz served on 3/2/2015, answer due 3/23/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. Michael Massa served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Michael Massa served on 2/24/2015, answer due 3/17/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Accounting Specialists, Inc. served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Merchants Bonding Co. served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Dirk Fowler served on 2/23/2015, answer due 3/16/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Christine Voutour served on 2/23/2015, answer due 3/16/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Robert L. Haussman served on 2/23/2015, answer due 3/16/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. The Managers, Inc. served on 2/23/2015, answer due 3/16/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Gerald Jay Olson served on 2/26/2015, answer due 3/19/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Brian Wesley Barnes on behalf of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets AllianceAttorney Brian Wesley Barnes added to party New Vision Hotels Two, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Wesley Barnes added to party Safe Streets Alliance(pty:pla) (Barnes, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Charles J. Cooper on behalf of New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets AllianceAttorney Charles J. Cooper added to party New Vision Hotels Two, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Charles J. Cooper added to party Safe Streets Alliance(pty:pla) (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Bank of the West by Plaintiffs New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/24/15. Text Only Entry (pglov) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 4/27/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/24/2015. (slibi, ) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/23/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Accounting Specialists, Inc., Bank of the West, John Doe 1, Dirk Fowler, Robert L. Haussman, David Katz, Michael Massa, Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, Merchants Bonding Co., Gerald Jay Olson, The Managers, Inc., Christine Voutour (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4277043)Attorney David H. Thompson added to party New Vision Hotels Two, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David H. Thompson added to party Safe Streets Alliance(pty:pla), filed by New Vision Hotels Two, LLC, Safe Streets Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Medical Marijuana of the Rockies, LLC, # 2 Summons Gerald Jay Olson, # 3 Summons The Managers, Inc., # 4 Summons Robert L. Haussman, # 5 Summons Christine Voutour, # 6 Summons David Katz, # 7 Summons Dirk Fowler, # 8 Summons Bank of the West, # 9 Summons Merchants Bonding Co., # 10 Summons Accounting Specialists, Inc., # 11 Summons Michael Massa, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 286 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?