USA v. Beals
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-30006-MAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Smyth +1 413 785 0106 paul.smyth@usdoj.gov
Space William M. Welch, II +1 413 785 0237 +1 413 785 0394

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Springfield
Filed 2/10/2005
County Hampden
Terminated 1/31/2007
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Count 3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Elliott Beals (Donato, Christopher)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Order on Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Pro
    Judge Michael A Ponsor : EndorsedORDER entered granting [13] Motion to Modify conditions of Probation as to Elliott Beals (1)RE: (May possess firearms outside of home solely for hunting purposes) (French, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 2/22/2007 Motion to Show Cause re Modification/Revocation of
      Consent MOTION to Show Cause re Revocation/Modification of Probation To Modify Conditions of Probation as to Elliott Beals. (Pucci, John)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
        Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Elliott Beals (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Probation 3 yrs, to consist of terms of 3 yrs on ea. ct. to be served concurrently; $15,000 fine;$400 assessment fee due immediately. Special Conditions of Probation: poss. no firearm; pay fine in full w/i first 90 days of the period of supervision; def. to meet w/Internal Revenue Service w/i 45 days of the period of supervision in order to determine the prior tax liability and is to file tax returns and pay any past or future taxes due; Reside for a period of 3 mos in a community corrections center and shall observe rules of that facility; following term of community confinement, serve 4 mos in home detention w/electronic monitoring and pay a daily rate for each day under electronic monitoring; (French, Elizabeth) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2007 (Stuckenbruck, John).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Sentencing
          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Sentencing held on 1/29/2007 for Elliott Beals (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Probation 3 yrs, to consist of terms of 3 yrs on ea. ct. to be served concurrently; $15,000 fine; $400 assessment fee due immediately. Special Conditions of Probation: poss. no firearm; pay fine in full w/i first 90 days of the period of supervision; def. to meet w/Internal Revenue Service w/i 45 days of the period of supervision in order to determine the prior tax liability and is to file tax returns and pay any past or future taxes due; Reside for a period of 3 mos in a community corrections center and shall observe rules of that facility; following term of community confinement, serve 4 mos in home detention w/electronic monitoring and pay a daily rate for each day under electronic monitoring;. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth) .
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Sealed Document +
            Sealed Document filed by Government - Statement of facts (French, Elizabeth)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
              Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered granting [9] Motion to Continue as to Elliott Beals (1) Sentencing RESET FROM 12/21/06 at 2:00 p.m. TO 1/29/2007 03:00 PM before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006, Terminated: 11/13/2006 Motion to Continue
                Consent MOTION to Continue Sentencting as to Elliott Beals. (Pucci, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Paul Smyth appearing for USA. (Smyth, Paul)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                    Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Elliott Beals Sentencing set for 12/21/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Order on Motion for Hearing
                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSEDORDER entered granting [6] Motion for Sentencing Hearing as to Elliott Beals (1) See Procedural Order entered this date (French, Elizabeth)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006, Terminated: 9/5/2006 Motion for Hearing
                        MOTION for Hearing for Sentencing as to Elliott Bealsby USA. (Welch, William)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Elliott Beals (1) Personal recognizance (Sent to counsel's office to be signed by defendant - returned 3/29/05) (French, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Waiver of Indictment
                            WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Elliott Beals (French, Elizabeth)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Plea Agreement
                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Elliott Beals filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Plea Entered
                                Proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Plea entered by Elliott Beals (1) Guilty Count 1,2,3,4. No sentencing date set; to be set at a later date (French, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Arraignment
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Arraignment/Initial appearance (Information) as to Elliott Beals (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 3/15/2005 (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Remark
                                    Notice to Counsel by Phone of cancellation of plea on 3/8/05 as to Elliott Beals: Parties notified plea reset to 3/15/05 at 2:00 p.m. (French, Elizabeth)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Elliott Beals Arraignment/Plea set for 3/8/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. Defendant shall contact Pretrial Services immediately for an appointment for interview prior to court appearance.(French, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Information - Felony
                                        INFORMATION (Felony) as to Elliott Beals (1) counts 1, 2, 3, 4. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 1,201 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?