James McCalmont, et al v. FNMA/Fannie Mae, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-16990

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 8:15 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/25/2016. [9878675] [14-16990] (Goldsmith, Sylvia) [Entered: 02/25/2016 12:37 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [48] submitted by James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9689190] (GV) [Entered: 09/18/2015 04:26 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
      Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont. Date of service: 09/16/2015. [9685966] [14-16990] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 09/18/2015 by TYL] (Goldsmith, Sylvia) [Entered: 09/16/2015 11:59 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [42] submitted by FHFA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9643622] (GV) [Entered: 08/11/2015 05:36 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
          Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Federal Housing Finance Agency. Date of service: 08/10/2015. [9641668] [14-16990] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/10/2015 08:21 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order: The answering brief [38] submitted by FNMA/Fannie Mae is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9633286] (GV) [Entered: 08/04/2015 08:42 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
              Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 08/03/2015. [9632595] [14-16990] (DM) [Entered: 08/03/2015 02:46 PM]
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 08/03/2015. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [9572037] (TH) [Entered: 06/12/2015 09:13 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 08/03/2015. Date of service: 06/11/2015. [9571585] [14-16990] (DM) [Entered: 06/11/2015 03:45 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Arthur Francis for Amici Curiae NASUCA and NCLC. Date of service: 05/29/2015. [9554887] [14-16990] (JS) [Entered: 05/29/2015 01:23 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [22] submitted by NASUCA and NCLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9552205] (WP) [Entered: 05/28/2015 08:40 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian R. Matsui for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 05/28/2015. [9552119] [14-16990] (BM) [Entered: 05/28/2015 07:31 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 05/28/2015. [9552117] [14-16990] (DM) [Entered: 05/28/2015 07:23 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by National Association of Consumer Advocates and National Consumer Law Center. Date of service: 05/27/2015. [9551926] [14-16990] (JS) [Entered: 05/27/2015 04:18 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Soumilas for Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont. Date of service: 05/27/2015. [9551270] [14-16990] (JS) [Entered: 05/27/2015 01:07 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [18] submitted by James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [18] submitted by James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9546445] (GV) [Entered: 05/21/2015 03:04 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont. Date of service: 05/20/2015. [9545269] [14-16990] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 05/21/2015 by TL] (SAG) [Entered: 05/20/2015 10:20 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                    Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is reset as follows: appellants shall file an opening brief on or before April 20, 2015; appellees shall file an answering brief on or before May 22, 2015; appellants may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. This case is released from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [9428761] (SML) [Entered: 02/20/2015 03:16 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                      MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 02/20/2015, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. [9418230] (CL) [Entered: 02/11/2015 02:37 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                        Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): An in-person mediation conference will be held on February 5, 2015, beginning at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time, at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 230 N. First Avenue, Room 6420, Phoenix, Arizona [telephone (602) 682-4000]. Unless excused by the Circuit Mediator prior to the scheduled conference, the following participants shall attend on behalf of appellants: client representatives James and Katherine McCalmont, Richard and Kristin Zabriskie, and attorneys Sylvia Goldsmith, Paul Mengedoth and Nick Walton. Unless excused by the Circuit Mediator prior to the scheduled conference, the following participants shall attend on behalf of appellees: FILED JAN 23 2015 MOLLY C. DWYER, CLERK U.S. COURT OF APPEALS lj/mediation a client representative of Federal National Mortgage Association, and attorneys Michael Miller and Gregory Marshall. Participants shall have full authority to negotiate and settle the case on any terms at the conference. Mediation statements of no more than 10 pages shall be submitted to the Circuit Mediator [fax no. (415) 355-8566] on or before January 28, 2015. Mediation statements shall contain brief statements of the following: (a) factual and procedural background; (b) issues to be raised on appeal; (c) legal argument on appeal; (d) your clients’ interests; (e) perceived interests of the opposing parties; and (f) obstacles to settlement and proposals for overcoming them. Sections (a), (b) and (c) shall be served on counsel for the opposing parties on the same date they are submitted to the undersigned. Sections (d), (e) and (f) shall be confidential and shall not be served on the opposing parties. Mediation statements shall not be filed with the court. Mediation statements shall contain the addresses and telephone and fax numbers of all participants. Participants should plan to spend the entire day engaged in meaningful settlement discussions and come prepared with thoughtful solutions to this dispute. [9393672] (SM) [Entered: 01/23/2015 11:24 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - Further Conference, 02/04/2015, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 01/30/2015 ). [9349375] (CL) [Entered: 12/15/2014 12:20 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                            Filed Appellee FHFA motion copy of dc order. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/08/2014. [9348128] (MT) [Entered: 12/12/2014 03:59 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                              Received Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont notice regarding representation statement. [9348062] (MT) [Entered: 12/12/2014 03:36 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Katherine McClamont and James McCalmont Correspondence: Representation Statement. Date of service: 11/03/2014 [9298924] [14-16990] (PBM) [Entered: 11/03/2014 11:05 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on January 30, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the next scheduled conference. [9339472] (SML) [Entered: 12/05/2014 04:31 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Katherine McClamont and James McCalmont Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/03/2014. [9298667] [14-16990] (PBM) [Entered: 11/03/2014 09:49 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sylvia A. Goldsmith for Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont. Date of service: 11/14/2014. [9313286] [14-16990] (SAG) [Entered: 11/14/2014 11:22 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Filed order MEDIATION: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire...dismiss the appeal voluntarily... or show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [9298657] (BS) [Entered: 11/03/2014 09:45 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 12/05/2014, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9304757] (CL) [Entered: 11/06/2014 02:55 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/21/2014. Transcript ordered by 11/13/2014. Transcript due 12/15/2014. Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McClamont opening brief due 01/22/2015. Appellees Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 02/23/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9275905] (IV) [Entered: 10/14/2014 02:03 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 335 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?