Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., et al v. Hitachi, Ltd., et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-10014

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 3:44 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mantese and Rossman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brendan H. Frey +1 248 457 9200 +1 248 457 9201 bfrey@manteselaw.com
Space Gerard V. Mantese +1 248 457 9200 +1 248 457 9201 gmantese@manteselaw.com
No Logo Stoebner Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Aisin Automotive Casting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Aisin Seiki Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Aisin Seiki Co., Ltd."
No Logo Delphi Automotive LLP, Defendant
No Logo Delphi Automotive Systems, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Delphi Powertrain Systems Korea Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Denso Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Denso International America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Denso International Korea Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd., Defendant
Hitachi, Ltd. Hitachi, Ltd., Defendant
Unknown Role, Opnext, Inc.
Unknown Role, Western Digital Corp
No Logo Mikuni America Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mikuni Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Defendant
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Unseal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER to unseal 1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (DPer) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
      Letter Declining to Prosecute from State of Hawaii, Department of the Attorney General. (KDoa) (KDoa) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (SSch) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
          STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stoebner Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
            STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brendan H. Frey appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frey, Brendan) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Complaint Under Seal (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-5021997 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC - Eastern District of Michigan, 12-md-02311, Judge Marianne O. Battani] (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 66 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?