Cavendish Farms, Inc. v. Prime Poultry Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10267-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cavendish Farms, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula Bonnell +1 617 367 5990

Toggle Switch Represented by Keaton and Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary E. Gardner +1 847 934 6500 gardner@pacatrust.com
v.
No Logo Eric Talcofsky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C. Gilleran +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 439 4170 mgilleran@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Prime Poultry Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ruth Talcofsky, Defendant
No Logo Susan Talcofsky-Aguiar, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 2/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 891 - Agriculture Acts
Cause Section 07 U.S.C. § 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Suffolk
Terminated 5/3/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to All Defendants by Cavendish Farms, Inc. (Bell, Marie)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
    Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint Eric Talcofsky answer due 5/9/2005. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005, Terminated: 4/26/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
      MOTION for Extension of Time to May 9, 2005 to File Answer by Eric Talcofsky.(Gilleran, Michael)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint. Eric Talcofsky answer due 4/25/2005. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 4/13/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
          MOTION for Extension of Time to April 25, 2005 to File Answer by Eric Talcofsky.(Gilleran, Michael)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Gilleran on behalf of Eric Talcofsky (Gilleran, Michael)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Answer
              Stipulation by Plaintiff and Defendant for Extension of Time for Eric Talcofsky's Time to Answer Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Eric Talcofsky.(Gilleran, Michael)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed Susan Talcofsky-Aguiar served on 2/25/2005, answer due 3/17/2005. (Bell, Marie)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Eric Talcofsky served on 2/16/2005, answer due 3/8/2005. (Bell, Marie)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Ruth Talcofsky served on 2/15/2005, answer due 3/7/2005. (Bell, Marie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Prime Poultry Corp. served on 2/25/2005(Susan Talcofsky-Aguiar) and 2/9/05 (Ruth Talcofsky), answer due 3/17/2005. (Bell, Marie) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2005 (Bell, Marie).
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Order on Motion for Order
                        Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered denying [4] Motion for Order Establishing Paca Claims Procedure. MOTION DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE PLAINTIFF PRESENTING EVIDENCE THAT IT HAS A PERFECTED INTEREST. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Opposition to Motion
                          Opposition re [4] MOTION for Order to Establishing Paca Claims Procedure filed by Stewart F. Grossman. (Henderson, Perry)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                            Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mary E. Gardner for Cavendish Farms, Inc. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cavendish Farms, Inc. re [4] MOTION for Entry of Order Establishing Paca Claims Procedure,and [5] Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Bell, Marie)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION for Entry of Order Establishing Paca Claims Procedure filed by Cavendish Farms, Inc.. (Bell, Marie)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Motion for Order
                                  MOTION for Entry of Order Establishing Paca Claims Procedure by Cavendish Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Bell, Marie)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Mary E. Gardner re [2] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary E. Gardner Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 62010.. (Bell, Marie)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary E. Gardner Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 62010. by Cavendish Farms, Inc.. c/s.(Bell, Marie)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against Prime Poultry Corp., Eric Talcofsky, Susan Talcofsky-Aguiar, Ruth Talcofsky Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 62010, filed by Cavendish Farms, Inc.. c/s.(Bell, Marie)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Bell, Marie)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Summons Issued
                                            Summons Issued as to Prime Poultry Corp., Eric Talcofsky, Susan Talcofsky-Aguiar, Ruth Talcofsky. (Bell, Marie)
                                              LREF

                                              Space Space

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 333 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?