Tatro v. Actuarial Strategies, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-40024-FDS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Dana Tatro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Wozniak +1 508 478 3788 +1 508 478 3731 attywozniak@comcast.net
No Logo Actuarial Strategies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Salazar-Austin +1 860 275 0390 +1 860 275 0343 dcsalazaraustin@daypitney.com
v.
No Logo Actuarial Strategies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn William Dowd +1 860 275 0570 +1 860 275 0343 gwdowd@daypitney.com
Space John P. McLafferty +1 617 345 4669 +1 617 345 4745 jpmclafferty@daypitney.com
Space David C. Salazar-Austin +1 860 275 0390 +1 860 275 0343 dcsalazaraustin@daypitney.com
No Logo Charles Dana Tatro, Counter-Defendant
Office Worcester
Filed 2/4/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Worcester
Terminated 4/1/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
NOTICE of Change of Address by John P. McLafferty (McLafferty, John)
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Certificate of Consultation
    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by John P. McLafferty on behalf of Actuarial Strategies, Inc.. (McLafferty, John)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005, Terminated: 4/27/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
      ASSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time to May 31, 2005 to Reopen Action by Actuarial Strategies, Inc.(McLafferty, John) Modified on 4/28/2005 (Hassett, Kathy).
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time. (Castles, Martin)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered. 30 day SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Castles, Martin) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2005 (Hassett, Kathy).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Terminated Case
            Civil Case Terminated. (Castles, Martin)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
              Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Castles, Martin)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added David C. Salazar-Austin for Actuarial Strategies, Inc. (Castles, Martin)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                  Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 404527 regarding [12] Pro hac vice (Hassett, Kathy)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actuarial Strategies, Inc.. (McLafferty, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT of David C. Salazar-Austin by Actuarial Strategies, Inc.. (McLafferty, John)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/9/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David C. Salazar-Austin by Actuarial Strategies, Inc..(McLafferty, John)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday 4/12/2005 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Evidentiary Hearing
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2005. Case called, Counsel (Wozniak/Dowd) appear for hearing on plaintiff's injunction request, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules from the bench denying P.I. request, Court states reasons on the record, Written order to follow, Court schedules Scheduling Conference for 4/12/05 at 3:00PM. Notice to issue. (Court Reporter Kusa-Ryll.) (Castles, Martin)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Opposition to Motion
                              Opposition re [4] MOTION for Hearing re [3] MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Order to to remand MOTION for Order to to remand filed by Actuarial Strategies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6)(McLafferty, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2005 (Jones, Sherry).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles Dana Tatro by Actuarial Strategies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(McLafferty, John)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 state court record
                                  STATE COURT Record received. (Attachments: # (1))(Hassett, Kathy)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                    Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Glenn W. Dowd for Actuarial Strategies, Inc. (Castles, Martin)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                      Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 404516 regarding pro hac vice (Hassett, Kathy)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Order on Motion to Remand to State CourtCourt Filing
                                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered denying [3] Motion to Remand to State Court. (Castles, Martin)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support. (McLafferty, John)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005, Terminated: 2/22/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Glenn W. Dowd by Actuarial Strategies, Inc..(McLafferty, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                              NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING: Injunction hearing set for Friday 3/4/2005 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Parties to file memorandum of law by 2/28/05. (Castles, Martin)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Hearing and injunction and denying [4] Motion for short Order. (Castles, Martin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005, Terminated: 2/17/2005 Motion for Hearing
                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION for a short order of notice on motion for remand for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and alternatively, for hearing on Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. re [3] MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Order to to remand by Charles Dana Tatro, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005, Terminated: 2/17/2005 Motion to Remand to State Court
                                                    MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles Dana Tatro, c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sherry)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John P. McLafferty on behalf of Actuarial Strategies, Inc., c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Notice of Removal
                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Actuarial Strategies, Inc. from Worcester Superior Court, case number 05-00185C. $ 150, receipt number 404509, filed by Actuarial Strategies, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 1# (2) Exhibit Part 2# (3) Exhibit Part 3# (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Sherry)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 622 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?