Ambrose, et al v. Danvers, Town of
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10329-MBB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian Caspanano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Carol A Germano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Craig Labastie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Dana Hagan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Dana K Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Dana L Milne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Daniel Kenneally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo David A Wotovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo David Joyce, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Devin Janvrin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Edmund M. Plamoski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Edward Campbell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo J. Michael Bean, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo James A. George, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo James P Lovell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Jason Skane, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo John F Melto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Joseph Kolodzic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Justin Ellerton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Keith Chalmers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Kevin Wood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Leonard Flynn, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Olivia M Silva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Patrick Ambrose, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Paul F Stone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Peter Z Shabowich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Richard A Stoney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Richard E Barthelmess, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Robert Bettencourt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Robert Gorman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo ROBERT J. SULLIVAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Robert Santo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Roland Levasseur, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Scott Frost, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Stephen D. Baldassare, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Steven McDonald, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Timothy C. Zuck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Timothy J Timmons, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Timothy Williamson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo Walter Roberts, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo William E Broadstreet, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo William S Carlson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
No Logo William S. Loughlin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Hynes +1 617 723 5500
Space John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Danvers, Town of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Furey Doolan and Abell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Francis Xavier Dolan, Jr. +1 301 652 6880 +1 301 652 8972 mdolan@fdalaw.com
Office Boston
Filed 2/18/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Essex
Terminated 1/6/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STAY
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice and without costs. (Feeney, Eileen)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Danvers, Town of. (Dolan, Michael)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
      Status Conference set for 2/1/2006 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler pursuant to the electronic order entered on 11/4/05 granting the motion to stay. (Hurley, Virginia)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order on Motion to Stay
        Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion to Stay. The court will conduct a status conference on February 1, 2006 at 10:30 a.m. No further notice will be sent to the parties. (Bowler, Marianne)
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005, Terminated: 11/4/2005 Motion to Stay
          Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding and Other Relief by Patrick Ambrose.(McMahon, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE by Dana Hagan (McMahon, John)
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Stipulation
              STIPULATION Parties' Initial Stipulation by Patrick Ambrose. (McMahon, John)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Status Conference
                Electronic clerk's notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status conference held on 7/26/2005; John McMahon for the pltfs. and Michael Dolan for the deft.; The court adopts the proposed schedule filed by the parties and sets a status conference for 12/15/2005 at 10:00 AM. (Tape #Digital.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Dolan, Michael)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Danvers, Town of.(Dolan, Michael)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                      NOTICE of Hearing: Status conference set for 7/26/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(Rynne, Michelle)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
                          CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Ambrose, Danvers, Town of. (Rynne, Michelle)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Answer
                              Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Danvers, Town of.(Dolan, Michael)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F.X. Dolan, Jr on behalf of Danvers, Town of (Dolan, Michael)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines
                                  Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for Danvers, Town of. Answer due 4/13/05. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Stipulation
                                    STIPULATION of the Parties Extending for an Additional Twenty-One Days the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint by Patrick Ambrose, Danvers, Town of. (Dolan, Michael)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Danvers, Town of served on 3/3/2005, answer due 3/23/2005. (Nici, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against Danvers, Town of Filing fee: $ 250, filed by Patrick Ambrose. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Sheet# (2) Notice of Filing of Written Consents Part 1# (3) Notice of Filing of Written Consents Part 2# (4) Notice of Filing of Written Consents Part 3)(Nici, Richard)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Receipt
                                          Receipt# 62242 for Filing fee for Complaint. (Nici, Richard)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Nici, Richard)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Summons Issued
                                              Summons Issued as to Danvers, Town of. (Nici, Richard)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?