United States v. Lopez
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-mj-00032-LPC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:09 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Oscar Lopez, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 2/5/2002
County Middlesex
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level 4
181073.F-FLIGHT TO AVOID PROSECUTION/GIVING TESTIMONY
Def Custody Status
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Status Report
STATUS REPORT and MOTION to request complaint remain open by USA as to Oscar Lopez (Simeone, Maria)
    LREF
    Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
    Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER entered. For want of prosecution, the above-entitled case is hereby ordered dismissed effective March 24, 2005, unless, on or before the close of business on the last business day immediately preceding March 24, 2005, a status report requesting that the case remain open be delivered to the Courtroom Clerk, Maria Simeone. If that status report is not timely filed, the case will be dismissed and the outstanding warrant(s) of arrest shall be vacated as of the date of the dismissal. as to Oscar Lopez re [1] Complaint (Simeone, Maria)
      LREF
      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/23/2005 Complaint
      COMPLAINT as to Oscar Lopez (1). (Simeone, Maria)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 10 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?