Ablow v. Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10347-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Keith R. Ablow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. LeGrand +1 617 623 3001 +1 617 623 0101 LeGrandlaw@aol.com
Space Eric N. Stafford +1 617 623 3001 +1 617 623 0101 ericstaffordlaw@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo C.B. Marine Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson, Bull, Furey, Bass & Maccoll, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK G. FUREY +1 207 774 7600 mfurey@thomport.com
No Logo Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Murphy +1 570 343 7444 +1 617 523 7379 rjmlaw@earthlink.net
No Logo Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMPSON & BOWIE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy Skeirik Roberts +1 207 774 2500 +1 207 774 3591 croberts@thompsonbowie.com
No Logo C.B. Marine Corporation, Cross-Claimant
No Logo C.B. Marine Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMPSON & BOWIE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy Skeirik Roberts +1 207 774 2500 +1 207 774 3591 croberts@thompsonbowie.com
No Logo Guy Splettstoesser, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. DeTroy +1 207 774 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. D'Orsi +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 msd@dcglaw.com
Space T. Christopher Donnelly +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 tcd@dcglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NORMAN, HANSON & DETROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AARON KENNETH BALTES abaltes@nhdlaw.com
No Logo Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMPSON & BOWIE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy Skeirik Roberts +1 207 774 2500 +1 207 774 3591 croberts@thompsonbowie.com
Office Boston
Filed 2/14/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Barnstable
Terminated 8/27/2007
Origin 4
Reopened 5/3/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 73 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns : SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Johnson, Mary)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Mary)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Remark
      Remark by Deputy Clerk Mary Johnson: "Attorneys Bob Murphy and Eric Stafford reported the case SETTLED on this date (trial was set to commence on 9-17-07). The Court will issue a 60-day Settlement Order of Dismissal." M. Johnson, Deputy Clerk. (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 8/27/2007 (Johnson, Mary).
        LREF
        Legal Document 72 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Opposition to Motion
        Opposition re [64] MOTION for Bench Trial filed by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Roberts, Cathy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 71 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to Motion re [62] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Roberts, Cathy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Statement of Facts
            STATEMENT of facts re [62] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Joint Pre-Trial Memo# (2) Exhibit Splettstoesser Deposition# (3) Exhibit Affidavit of Roger A. Hale# (4) Exhibit Roger P. Hale Deposition# (5) Exhibit Town of Newbury Demand Letters# (6) Exhibit Danger Sign)(LeGrand, John)
              LREF
              Legal Document 69 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Opposition to Motion
              Opposition re [62] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Danger Sign# (2) Exhibit Splettstoesser deposition# (3) Exhibit Roger P. Hale Deposition pages 49-52)(LeGrand, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 68 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Statement of Facts
                STATEMENT of facts re [62] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Town of Newbury Demand Letters# (2) Exhibit No-Cure, No-Pay Removal Agreement)(LeGrand, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Opposition to Motion
                  Opposition re [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Roger P. Hale Deposition# (2) Exhibit Town of Newbury Demand Letter)(LeGrand, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Opposition to Motion
                    Opposition re [61] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the United States Coast Guard Report filed by Keith R. Ablow. (LeGrand, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Opposition to Motion
                      Opposition re [64] MOTION for Bench Trial filed by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint)(LeGrand, John)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        MOTION for Bench Trial by Guy Splettstoesser.(Baltes, Aaron)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Statement of Facts
                          STATEMENT of facts re [62] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ablow Depo# (2) Exhibit Daigle Depo# (3) Exhibit Deed from Betsy Peet to Keith Ablow dated 11/24/99# (4) Exhibit Packer Depo# (5) Exhibit Plan of Sections 1 and 2 of Land of Plum Island Beach Company dated May 1920# (6) Exhibit Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure# (7) Exhibit Splettstoesser Depo)(Baltes, Aaron)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Guy Splettstoesser.(Baltes, Aaron)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion in Limine
                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the United States Coast Guard Report by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - U.S. Coast Guard Report 12-11-02)(Roberts, Cathy)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                AFFIDAVIT of Roger P. Hale in Support re [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C.B. Marine Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Furey, Mark)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                  Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C.B. Marine Corporation. (Furey, Mark)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C.B. Marine Corporation. (Furey, Mark)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by C.B. Marine Corporation.(Furey, Mark)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [51] Motion to Compel; denying [53] Motion to Compel re: 53, "the request far exceeds what is authorized by F.R.Civ.P. 26 (2)(B)." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Order on Motion for Discovery
                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [46] Motion for Discovery; denying [49] Motion to Compel as this is not a matter that involves the court; granting [50] Motion to Compel (Zierk, Marsha)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [55] Motion for Reconsideration. As stated by counsel, the court will permit him to inspect and photograph the vessel in his role as plaintiff's counsel to prepare himself for the upcoming trial. (Zierk, Marsha)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Eric N. Stafford on behalf of Keith R. Ablow (Stafford, Eric)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [47] Motion to Compel as it was previously noticed within the original discovery period. (Zierk, Marsha)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [45] Motion for Leave to File; Court considered Ablow's response in ruling on Maine COast Marine COnstruction's motion. (Zierk, Marsha)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [54] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Outstanding Discovery, as described in the joint motion, to be completed by 9/4/2007. (Zierk, Marsha)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Motion to Compel (Zierk, Marsha)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Terminate Motions
                                                        Motions terminated: [48] MOTION to Compel Copies of Photographs Used as Exhibits at the Trial of the Grounding Caption Entitled: C.B. Marine Corporation vs. Fore River Dock & Dredge, Maine Coast Marine Construction and Guy Splettstoesser filed by Keith R. Ablow. (WITHDRAWN BY COUNSEL) (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [42] MOTION for Discovery to Inspect, Photograph and Survey Tug Seawind by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 10, 2007 to Complete Discovery From July 27, 2007 Up to and Including September 10, 2007 by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 8/7/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                              MOTION to Compel Defendants to Supplement Their Expert Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 (a) (2) (B) and Provide Copies of Experts Prior Reports Generated in Other Collateral Cases Concerning the Grounding of the Tug Seawind and Barge DS-64 by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                Withdrawal of motion: [48] MOTION to Compel Copies of Photographs Used as Exhibits at the Trial of the Grounding Caption Entitled: C.B. Marine Corporation vs. Fore River Dock & Dredge, Maine Coast Marine Construction and Guy Splettstoesser filed by Keith R. Ablow.. (LeGrand, John)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 8/7/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                  MOTION to Compel All Defendants to Comply with Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Requests Number 12 and Number 13 by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [37] Motion for Sanctions. Defendant's Maine Coast Marine Construction's incorporated motion to strike plaintiff's newly designated expert is ALLOWED. (Zierk, Marsha)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered denying [42] Motion for Discovery. No leave to substitute an expert witness was sought. The deadline for designating experts has long-since expired. (Zierk, Marsha)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                        MOTION to Compel Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc. to Produce any and all Records, Receipts, Canceled Checks and Documentation Concerning the Clean Up of the Beach on Plum Island Following the Grounding of the Tug Seawind and Barge DS-64 by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                          MOTION to Compel Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc. or all Defendants Equally to Pay the Deposition Expert Witness Fee of Jean Francois Barre by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                            MOTION to Compel Copies of Photographs Used as Exhibits at the Trial of the Grounding Caption Entitled: C.B. Marine Corporation vs. Fore River Dock & Dredge, Maine Coast Marine Construction and Guy Splettstoesser by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) Email)(LeGrand, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                              MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Neal Rosen of Marine Safety Consultants by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Inspect, Photograph and Survey Metal Debris Confiscated From The Beach Where the Grounding Occurred by Richard Harden of Marine Safety Consultants Following the Grounding and Removal of the Tug Seawind and Barge DS-64 by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.'s Objection to Inspect, Photograph and Survey Tug Seawind AND Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Maine Coast Marine Construction Inc.'s "INCORPORATED" Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Expert Designation" by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) Report of Captain Raymond Bono)(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Opposition re [42] MOTION for Discovery to Inspect, Photograph and Survey Tug Seawind and Incorporated Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Expert" who would do the Requested Inspection filed by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure Subject Matter of Expert Testimony)(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007, Terminated: 7/20/2007 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                        MOTION for Discovery to Inspect, Photograph and Survey Tug Seawind by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Discovery Depositions Noticed Prior to the Close of Discovery by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEShow Cause Response due by 7/22/2007. "...Ablow will have twenty-one days from the date of this Order to show cause why the court should not impose sanctions for his failure to supplement and narrow his expert witness disclosures by the 5/25/07 deadline ordered by the court."(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Supplemental Opposition re [37] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Comply with Order filed by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure)(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: motion for sanctions and opposition corrected because: to reflect correct images (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Opposition re [37] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Comply with Order filed by Keith R. Ablow. (LeGrand, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2007 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007, Terminated: 7/20/2007 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                    MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Comply with Order by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosure)(Roberts, Cathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2007 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [36] Motion to Compel (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007, Terminated: 6/12/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Response to a Request for Production of Document by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc..(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : ElectronicORDER entered granting [35] Motion for Extension of Time "to 6/20/07 for defendants to designate experts." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007, Terminated: 5/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to June 20, 2007 to Designate Experts by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc..(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Aaron K. Baltes for Guy Splettstoesser (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2007 09:00 AM before Judge Richard G. Stearns. Trial Documents to be filed by 9-7-07.(Johnson, Mary)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron K. Baltes Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1383048. by Guy Splettstoesser.(D'Orsi, Michael)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Status Conference held on 1/25/2007. Attys. LeGrand and Stafford present for the plaintiff. Attys. Murphy, Furey, Roberts and Baltes present for the defendants. All discovery shall be completed by 7-27-07; dispositive motions to be filed by 8-10-07 with oppositions due 14 days thereafter; plaintiff to designate his experts by 3-20-07 and defendants to designate their experts by 5-20-07; jury trial shall commence on MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2007 AT 9:00 A.M. Clerk to issue Trial Order to counsel. (Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 1/26/2007 (Johnson, Mary).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Status Conference: "A Status Conference is set for 1/25/2007 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The attorneys who are located in Boston are required to attend the conference in person, but for the attorneys who are located in Maine, the conference can be conducted by telephone if one of the attorneys is willing to initiate the conference call with the Judge and the Boston lawyers present in the confernce room of Courtroom 21. Please contact the clerk at 617-748-9162 and the trip to Boston will not be necessary if done as a conference call". (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 12/8/2006 (Johnson, Mary).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [32] Motion to Compel (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006, Terminated: 9/21/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents from Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc. and C.B. Marine Corporation by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy Skeirik Roberts on behalf of Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc. (Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [30] Opposition to Motion filed by Keith R. Ablow, "Treated as a motion to reconsider and Denied."(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [29] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [29] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for the Defendant Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.'s filed by Keith R. Ablow. (LeGrand, John)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006, Terminated: 5/19/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc., Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Judgment# (2) Exhibit 2 - 5/5/06 Letter to C. Roberts# (3) Exhibit 3 - 5/5/06 Letter to N. Walsh)(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Case Reopened
                                                                                                                                      Case Reopened (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic Order entered granting [28] Motion to Vacate (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 5/19/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006, Terminated: 5/3/2006 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal, Restore to the Docket and Continue to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome of Bankruptcy Proceedings in the State of Maine and Request for Hearing by Keith R. Ablow.(LeGrand, John)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER FOR CLOSURE entered. (Johnson, Mary)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Terminated Case
                                                                                                                                              Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [26] Motion to Stay "The court notes that no opposition was filed." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005, Terminated: 11/29/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc..(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2005. Atty. LeGrand present for the pltf. Attys. Roberts, Holbrook and Furey present for the defts. Court adopts schedule as follows: Phase 1 - answers to interrogatories to be filed by 1-15-06; pltf's answers to expert interogatories to be filed by 6-15-06; defts' answers to expert interrogatories to be filed by 7-15-06; all fact witness depositions to be completed by 8-15-06; dispositive motions to be filed by 11-15-06; pleadings to be amended and parties to be added no later than 10-15-06; Phase 2 - depositions of experts to be noticed by 11-2-06; additional requests for admissions to be filed by 9-4-06. (Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) .
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Guy Splettstoesser of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay (D'Orsi, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (LeGrand, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2005 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [23] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Peter J. DeTroy for Guy Splettstoesser (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter J. DeTroy (with Certificate of Good Standing) by Guy Splettstoesser.(D'Orsi, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee: $ 50., receipt number 66476 regarding motion appear pro hac (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Guy Splettstoesser.(D'Orsi, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by T. Christopher Donnelly on behalf of Guy Splettstoesser (Donnelly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. D'Orsi on behalf of Guy Splettstoesser (D'Orsi, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Crossclaim by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc..(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.B. Marine Corporation. (Furey, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by C.B. Marine Corporation.(Furey, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc..(Holbrook, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc.. (Holbrook, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [12] Opposition to Motion and to allow late answer, filed by C.B. Marine Corporation, "The motion is allowed."(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered denying [11] Motion for Entry of Default "C.B. Marine will file its answer forthwith." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Guy Splettstoesser , filed by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc..(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent Opposition re [11] MOTION for Entry of Default and Motion to Allow a "Late" Answer filed by C.B. Marine Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Melody Hale in Support of Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment# (2) Exhibit A to Affidavit of Melody Hale# (3) Exhibit B to Objection, Answer of Defendant C.B. Marine Corporation)(Furey, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion for Leave to File (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Default by Keith R. Ablow against C.B. Marine, filed.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 6/23/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Third Party Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial# (2) Exhibit B-Third Party Summons in a Civil Action)(Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy Skeirik Roberts on behalf of Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc. (Roberts, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc..(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa F. Bendetson on behalf of Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Seth S. Holbrook on behalf of Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed C.B. Marine Corporation served on 3/7/2005, answer due 3/28/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc. served on 3/2/2005, answer due 3/22/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc. served on 3/2/2005, answer due 3/22/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 62273, filed by Keith R. Ablow. (Attachments: # (1))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge new Judge. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Fore River Dock & Dredge, Inc., C.B. Marine Corporation, Maine Coast Marine Construction, Inc.. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?