USA v. Clark
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-mj-00072-LPC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori J. Holik +1 617 748 3161 +1 617 748 3960 lori.holik@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Peter Clark, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 2/26/2002
County Suffolk
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level 4
181073.F-FLIGHT TO AVOID PROSECUTION/GIVING TESTIMONY
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Dismissal of ComplaintCourt Filing
Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER entered. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to Peter Clark. (Hurley, Virginia)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005, Terminated: 3/22/2005 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION for Dismissal of complaint in accordance with the courts conditional order of dismissal as to Peter Clarkby USA. (Simeone, Maria)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Terminate Criminal Case
      Case Terminated as to Peter Clark (Hurley, Virginia)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
        Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER entered. For want of prosecution, the above-entitled case is hereby ordered dismissed effective March 24, 2005, unless, on or before the close of business on the last business day immediately preceding March 24, 2005, a status report requesting that the case remain open be delivered to the Courtroom Clerk, Maria Simeone. If that status report is not timely filed, the case will be dismissed and the outstanding warrant(s) of arrest shall be vacated as of the date of the dismissal. as to Peter Clark re [1] Complaint (Simeone, Maria)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/23/2005 Complaint
          COMPLAINT as to Peter Clark (1). (Simeone, Maria)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 27 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?