Montalbano v. Ariad Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-60508

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 7, 2017 at 10:28 AM EST (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thomas Montalbano, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda A. Alley +1 954 467 8800 +1 954 523 4803 lalley@schlesingerlaw.com
Space Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
Space Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
v.
No Logo ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Defendant
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Gdanski on behalf of Thomas Montalbano, Jr. Attorney Jonathan Gdanski added to party Thomas Montalbano, Jr(pty:pla). (Gdanski, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Ariad Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (vjk) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (vjk) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (vjk) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Ariad Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7548288, filed by Thomas Montalbano, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?