Adams v. Washington DC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10399-MEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shirron Adams, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Washington, D.C., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 2/14/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Bristol
Terminated 3/29/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter from The Court to Ms. Adams. (Howarth, George)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 10/10/2006 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
    Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered denying [11] Motion to Appoint Counsel- See letter dated 12/07/05 (Howarth, George)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
      MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shirron Adams.(Howarth, George)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Remark
        Remark The Court received two letters sent to the address of the plaintiff as not being able to deliver. The defendant not long at address sent to and no forwarding address was listed. (Howarth, George)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
          Letter from The Law Clerk of Judge Lasker to Ms. Adams with recent fillings returned due to the fact that the case is closed. (Howarth, George)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
            Letter/request (non-motion) from Shirron Adams. (Howarth, George)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
              Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CASE.(Greenberg, Rebecca)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                Judge Morris E. Lasker : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum and Order, this action is dismissed sua sponte. [Motions terminated: [3] MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shirron Adams].(Greenberg, Rebecca)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                  Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered granting [1] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Greenberg, Rebecca)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                    Notice of Reassignment. Judge Morris E. Lasker added. Judge Reginald C. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Stanhope, Don)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. (Losco, Marie)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shirron Adams.(Jenness, Susan)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against Washington DC Filing fee: $ 0.00, receipt number 0.00, filed by Shirron Adams.(Jenness, Susan)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shirron Adams.(Jenness, Susan)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Jenness, Susan)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?