Agina v. United States of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10402-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eugene Okechukwu Agina, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ambert Randall, Defendant
No Logo C. Dr. Howard, Defendant
No Logo Jerome Philbin, Defendant
No Logo R. Newland, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Dr. Varney, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 2/22/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 5/19/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Greenberg, Rebecca)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the March 21, 2005 Memorandum and Order (#4), and for Plaintiff's failure to show cause why this action should not be dismissed, it is hereby ORDERED that the above captioned matter is dismissed in its entirety.(Greenberg, Rebecca)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. This action shall be dismissed in forty-two (42) days unless Plaintiff either pays the $250.00 filing fee for civil actions, or in the alternative, files a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit demonstrating that he lacks sufficient funds to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff is also directed within that forty-two (42) day time period, to show cause in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for the reasons stated herein. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action. (McGlamery, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
        Status Letter/request(non-motion)from Deputy Clerk Jenness responding to Mr. Agine. cc/US mail enc. coversheet, categor sheet and IFP Application (Jenness, Susan)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
          Letter/request (non-motion)from Eugene Agina for status of case, coversheet, category sheet and IFP Application (Jenness, Susan)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against United States of America, Jerome Philbin, Ambert Randall, Thomas Dr. Varney, R. Newland, C. Dr. Howard Filing fee: $ 0.00, receipt number 0.00, filed by Eugene Okechukwu Agina.(Jenness, Susan)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Jenness, Susan)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Remark
                Case received for filing without payment of the filing fee or submission of an application to waive the filing fee. (Jenness, Susan)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?