LaserDynamics, LLC v. Boss Audio Systems et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01773
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:11 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laserdynamics, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 917 702 9135 gkroub@kskiplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@kskiplaw.com
v.
No Logo Boss Audio Systems, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Isackson +1 212 506 5280 +1 212 506 5151 rmisackson@orrick.com
No Logo Gpx, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
(Inactive), PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Stewart Love +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 jeffrey.love@klarquist.com
No Logo Pyle Audio, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Moskowitz +1 212 382 0700 mmoskowitz@ostrolenk.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against defendant Pyle Audio, Inc., pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The above-entitled matter is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE without costs, attorneys' fees, or disbursements to any party and without further notice or hearing. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/30/2015) (tn) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
    DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Pyle Audio, Inc. and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) Modified on 6/30/2015 (km). (Entered: 06/29/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
      AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/12/2015 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tn) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: that this action be conditionally discontinued without prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal for the Court to So Order. Otherwise, within such time Plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the active calendar of this Court in the event that the settlement is not consummated. Upon such application for reinstatement, the parties shall continue to be subject to the Court's jurisdiction, the Court shall promptly reinstate the action to its active docket, and the parties shall be directed to appear before the Court, without the necessity of additional process, on a date within ten (10) days of the application, to schedule remaining pretrial proceedings and/or dispositive motions, as appropriate. This Order shall be deemed a final discontinuance of the action with prejudice in the event that Plaintiff has not requested restoration of the case to the active calendar within such 30-day period. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/12/2015) (tn) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Gaston Kroub dated 06/11/2015. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST GPX, INC.: that Plaintiff hereby gives notice of dismissal with prejudice of its claims against Defendant GPX pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and Plaintiff and Defendant GPX, through their undersigned attorneys of record, hereby stipulate to the dismissal of, and request this Court to dismiss, Plaintiff's claims for relief against Defendant GPX with prejudice, and with all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses borne by the party incurring same. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/29/2015) (tn) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Gpx, Inc.. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Kroub, Gaston) Modified on 5/29/2015 (dt). (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff LaserDynamics, LLC and Defendant Ava Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Boss Audio Systems and/or their respective counsel(s), that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, as to defendant Ava Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Boss Audio Systems, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Ava Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Boss Audio Systems without costs, attorneys' fees, or disbursements to any party and without further notice or hearing. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/28/2015) (ama) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Boss Audio Systems and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 25 Second Letter Motion for Extension of Time. In light of Defendant GPX's settlement in principle with Plaintiff, the Court shall extend GPX's deadline to answer, or submit a pre-motion conference letter in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, to June 3, 2015. The initial pretrial conference in this action is hereby ADJOURNED to June 16, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties' joint letter shall be filed on June 11, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/7/2015) (kl) Modified on 5/8/2015 (kl). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeffrey S. Love dated May 7, 2015. Document filed by Gpx, Inc..(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Boss Audio Systems.(Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 22 Motion for Jeffrey S. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2015) (tn) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Jeffrey Stewart Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gpx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 California Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Oregon Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Pyle Audio, Inc..(Moskowitz, Max) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pyle Audio, Inc..(Moskowitz, Max) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. Pyle Audio, Inc. answer due 4/17/2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/6/2015) (kl) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Max Moskowitz dated April 6, 2015. Document filed by Pyle Audio, Inc..(Moskowitz, Max) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Moskowitz on behalf of Pyle Audio, Inc.. (Moskowitz, Max) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gpx, Inc..(Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. There will be no further extensions absent compelling circumstances. Gpx, Inc. answer due 5/13/2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/3/2015) (tn) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from James E. Geringer dated 4/2/2015. Document filed by Gpx, Inc..(Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Geringer on behalf of Gpx, Inc.. (Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kamatani Technologies, LLC for LaserDynamics, LLC. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. Boss Audio Systems answer due 5/3/2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/27/2015) (tn) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert M. Isackson dated March 27, 2015. Document filed by Boss Audio Systems.(Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boss Audio Systems.(Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M. Isackson on behalf of Boss Audio Systems. (Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Ray S. Mostafavi, Director of Operations. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Pyle Audio, Inc. served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. Service was accepted by Harry Hari, Manager. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 7 Affidavit) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Boss Audio Systems served on 3/13/2015, answer due 4/3/2015. Service was accepted by Ray S. Mostafavi, Director of Operations. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Silbersher, Zachary) Modified on 3/27/2015 (db). (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Gpx, Inc. served on 3/17/2015, answer due 4/7/2015. Service was accepted by Melissa Chadbourne, Controller. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/26/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/17/2015) (tn) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT against Boss Audio Systems, Gpx, Inc., Pyle Audio, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401119214)Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(moh) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?