Rasetta et al v. SAI Surveying Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10425-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis G. Rasetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Pension and Annuity Funds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Barbara Szepatowski, Defendant
No Logo SAI Surveying Corporation, Defendant
RBS Citizens Bank, NA RBS Citizens Bank, NA, Trustee
Officially listed as "Citizens Bank"
Office Boston
Filed 3/7/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Suffolk
Terminated 7/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Competency Hearing
ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Competency Hearing held on 1/31/2007. Anne Sills for the plaintiff. Barbara Szepatowski appearing pro se. Parties report that they are settling this matter and that most of the papers have been turned over to the plaintiff. Court sets further Status Conference for 5/3/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
    Letter from Gregory A. Geiman. (York, Steve)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Notice of Hearing.
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Contempt Hearing set for 1/31/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Court requests that counsel for the plaintiff notify the defendant of the hearing date.(Hourihan, Lisa)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Contempt Hearing reset for 1/2/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Court requests that counsel for the plaintiff notify the defendant of the hearing date.(Hourihan, Lisa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
          Letter/request (non-motion) from Gregory A. Geiman, Esquire to Barbara Szepatowski, President. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 OrderCourt Filing
            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER VACATING the arrest warrant issued for the arrest of Barbara Szepatowksi entered. (Hourihan, Lisa)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Contempt Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Court requests that counsel for the plaintiff notify the defendant of the hearing date.(Hourihan, Lisa)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Hearing (Other)
                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Hearing held on 10/31/2006. Ms. Szepatowski appears in Court. She notifies the clerk that she is here for a hearing. The clerk informs Ms. Szepatowski that the hearing was scheduled for 10/30/06 and notifies her that there is a warrant issued for her arrest. Clerk calls Attorney Geiman and requests that he appear in Court. Judge explains to Ms. Szepatowski about the contempt order and her failure to appear. Ms. Szepatowski turns over discovery to the plaintiff. Clerk to set a further hearing on the motion for contempt. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Order on Motion for Contempt
                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [18] Motion for Contempt. The defendants have neither responded to the court's order of June 8, 2006 to answer the plaintiff's discovery requests nor appeared in court to show cause why they have failed to comply the court's order. Accordingly, the court finds that the defendants are in contempt of the June 8, 2006 order and further that they appear to be in contempt of court's order of October 19, 2006 requiring that they appear in court to answer the original motion for contempt (document #18 on the court's docket). The court will determine a remedy for the contempt of its order of June 8, 2006 once the defendants have been brought into court pursuant to a warrant to be issued by the court. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander Referred for: bail, appointment of counsel(Lovett, Jarrett)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Warrant Issued
                      WARRANT of arrest issued (Hourihan, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Show Cause Hearing
                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Show Cause Hearing held on 10/30/2006. Attorney Geiman for the plaintiff. No one appears on behalf of the defendant. Court determines that the defendant has been properly served. Court to issue a warrant for the arrest of Barbara Szepatowski for failure to appear. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Affidavit of Service
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. Acknowledgement filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 10/30/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay.(York, Steve)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/30/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (York, Steve)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Motion Hearing
                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2006 re [18] MOTION for Contempt filed by International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare,, John J. Shaughnessy,, Christopher Barletta,, Louis G. Rasetta,, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds,, Pension and Annuity Funds,. No one appears on behalf of the defendant. Court to issue a show cause order. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/30/06 at 2:30PM. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                  Service of the Hearing to Counsel. (York, Steve)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [18] MOTION for Contempt: Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Counsel for the plaintiff are directed to serve notice of this hearing on the defendants.(Hourihan, Lisa)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman in Support re [18] MOTION for Contempt filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Memorandum of Law
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare to [18] MOTION for Contempt. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 10/31/2006 Motion for Contempt
                                          MOTION for Contempt by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [15] Motion to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiffs' Post-Judgment Discovery Requests (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Affidavit
                                              AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman by Pension and Annuity Funds, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [15] MOTION to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiffs' Post-Judgment Discovery Requests filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006, Terminated: 6/8/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                  MOTION to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiffs' Post-Judgment Discovery Requests by Pension and Annuity Funds, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [17] Affidavit,, [15] MOTION to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiffs' Post-Judgment Discovery Requests, [16] Memorandum in Support of Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (York, Steve)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Writ Issued
                                                      WRIT of First Execution issued (York, Steve)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [7] Motion for Entry of Default (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs (York, Steve)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 7/22/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                            Proposed Order as to SAI Surveying Corporation and Barbara Szepatowski by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare.(Geiman, Gregory) Modified on 6/27/2005 (Smith3, Dianne).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support re [7] MOTION for Entry of Default Against SAI Surveying Corporation and Barbara Szepatowski filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Gina Alongi in Support re [7] MOTION for Entry of Default Against SAI Surveying Corporation and Barbara Szepatowski filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills in Support re [7] MOTION for Entry of Default Against SAI Surveying Corporation and Barbara Szepatowski filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [7] MOTION for Entry of Default Against SAI Surveying Corporation and Barbara Szepatowski filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 7/25/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Default Against SAI Surveying Corporation and Barbara Szepatowski by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document #12 corrected because: it is a proposed order instead of a motion (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                                                          NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SAI Surveying Corporation, Barbara Szepatowski (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Request for notice of default
                                                                            Request for notice of default Barbara Szepatowski. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Request for notice of default
                                                                              Request for notice of default SAI Surveying Corporation. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Barbara Szepatowski served on 4/29/2005, answer due 5/19/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed SAI Surveying Corporation served on 4/29/2005, answer due 5/19/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against SAI Surveying Corporation, Barbara Szepatowski Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 62538, filed by Pension and Annuity Funds, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health And Welfare. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (NOT SCANNED)) (2) Civil Cover Sheet(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to SAI Surveying Corporation, Barbara Szepatowski. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?