SimmTech Co., Ltd. v. Citibank, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-736

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file supplemental appendix [57] filed by Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation and Citicorp Holdings Inc., FILED. [1568358][62] [15-736] [Entered: 08/04/2015 10:19 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
    SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1568095] [15-736] [Entered: 08/03/2015 08:22 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
      BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1568094] [15-736] [Entered: 08/03/2015 08:19 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
        MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1568093] [15-736] [Entered: 08/03/2015 08:14 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
          STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd.'s letter[48] from the docket, FILED.[1511852] [15-736] [Entered: 05/15/2015 04:20 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc. Brief due date as 08/03/2015, FILED.[1508703] [15-736] [Entered: 05/13/2015 09:54 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter[48], on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED.[1507591] [15-736] [Entered: 05/12/2015 09:50 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citicorp Holdings Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 08/03/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 05/11/2015 by CM/ECF.[1507399] [15-736] [Entered: 05/11/2015 05:16 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                  JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 5, (pp. 801-960), on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502135] [15-736] [Entered: 05/05/2015 05:19 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                    JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 5, (pp. 601-800), on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502133] [15-736] [Entered: 05/05/2015 05:17 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                      JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 5, (pp. 401-600), on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502131] [15-736] [Entered: 05/05/2015 05:16 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 5, (pp. 201-400), on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502128] [15-736] [Entered: 05/05/2015 05:14 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 5, (pp. 1-200), on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502121] [15-736] [Entered: 05/05/2015 05:12 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, appendix, [33], [32], [31], [30], [29], on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED.[1501956] [15-736] [Entered: 05/05/2015 04:00 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                              BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/04/2015 by CM/ECF. [1500055] [15-736] [Entered: 05/04/2015 11:10 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/29/2015, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[1491819] [15-736] [Entered: 04/23/2015 08:56 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  ORDER, setting appellant's brief due date as 05/04/2015, for Appellant Simmtech Co., Ltd. failure to submit a scheduling notification, FILED.[1485648] [15-736] [Entered: 04/15/2015 03:13 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 04/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1474540] [15-736] [Entered: 04/01/2015 01:05 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 03/30/2015 by CM/ECF. [1472541] [15-736] [Entered: 03/30/2015 03:53 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 03/30/2015 by CM/ECF. [1472473] [15-736] [Entered: 03/30/2015 03:32 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                          CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/29/2015, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[1469941] [15-736] [Entered: 03/26/2015 09:43 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                            NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1469796] [15-736] [Entered: 03/25/2015 05:21 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank Overseas Investment Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 03/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1469647] [15-736] [Entered: 03/25/2015 04:00 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                FORM D, on behalf of Appellant SimmTech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 03/24/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1467892] [15-736] [Entered: 03/24/2015 11:24 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                  FORM C, on behalf of Appellant SimmTech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 03/24/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1467880] [15-736] [Entered: 03/24/2015 11:21 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant SimmTech Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 03/24/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1467866] [15-736] [Entered: 03/24/2015 11:16 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1458648] [15-736] [Entered: 03/12/2015 09:32 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                        DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/17/2015, RECEIVED.[1458644] [15-736] [Entered: 03/12/2015 09:31 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                          DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/10/2015, RECEIVED.[1458641] [15-736] [Entered: 03/12/2015 09:30 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant SimmTech Co., Ltd., FILED. [1458634] [15-736] [Entered: 03/12/2015 09:28 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 333 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?