Sheehan v. Richard W. Reid Electrical Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10424-RWZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:29 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony J. Salamone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Joint Appprenticeship and training fund, Local 103 IBEW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund Local 103 IBEW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo National Electrical Benefit Fund, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ramtron International Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Russell F. Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo City Of Boston, Defendant
No Logo Richard W. Reid Electrical Company, Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 3/7/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 12/6/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Jay)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Electrical Workers Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Joint Appprenticeship and training fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Anthony J. Salamone, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan, Electrical Workers Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, IBEW (Sills, Anne) Modified on 12/6/2005 (Johnson, Jay).
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
      SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Boston, Public Facilities Department served on 3/31/2005, answer due 4/20/2005. (Sills, Anne)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Summons Returned Executed
        SUMMONS Returned Executed Richard W. Reid Electrical Company, Inc. served on 3/22/2005, answer due 4/11/2005. (Sills, Anne)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against Richard W. Reid Electrical Company, Inc., City of Boston, Publiv Facilities Department Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 62567, filed by Electrical Workers Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Joint Appprenticeship and training fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Anthony J. Salamone, Nationa Electrical Benefit Fund, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan, Electrical Workers Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, IBEW. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B Part 1# (3) Exhibit B Part 2# (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Johnson, Jay)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Richard W. Reid Electrical Company, Inc., City of Boston, Publiv Facilities Department. (Johnson, Jay)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 198 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?