WEBER v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00378

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2017 at 1:56 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Weber, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Lee Einspanier +1 202 588 7728 +1 202 588 7795 keinspanier@citizen.org
v.
United States Food and Drug Administration United States Food and Drug Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION"
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?