Obal v. Deutsche Bank National Trust C
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-775

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 7:20 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
FRAP4(a)4 STAY STATUS UPDATE, REQUESTED.[1594502] [15-775] [Entered: 09/09/2015 03:43 PM]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
    FRAP4(a)4 STAY STATUS UPDATE, REQUESTED.[1560905] [15-775] [Entered: 07/23/2015 02:32 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Morgan Stanley Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-9, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-9, Certificateholders of the Morgan Stanley Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-9, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-9 and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/30/2015 by CM/ECF.[1472718] [15-775] [Entered: 03/30/2015 05:13 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
        PAPERS, Form C, RECEIVED.[1466331] [15-775] [Entered: 03/20/2015 04:23 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
          FRAP 4(a)4 NOTICE, to Appellant David Obal, copy to District Court, copy to pro se, SENT.[1462503] [15-775] [Entered: 03/17/2015 11:54 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE, to Appellee Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[1461587] [15-775] [Entered: 03/16/2015 02:56 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
              INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1461581] [15-775] [Entered: 03/16/2015 02:52 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1461575] [15-775] [Entered: 03/16/2015 02:48 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                  DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 02/13/2015, RECEIVED.[1461574] [15-775] [Entered: 03/16/2015 02:46 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant David Obal, FILED. [1461548] [15-775] [Entered: 03/16/2015 02:29 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 126 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?