Rodriguez v. Mishey Real Estate et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-06232
District Judge Michael R Hogan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 11:00 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Maribel Beltran Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cashauna M. Hill +1 503 473 8311 +1 503 295 0676 chill@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Johnson +1 503 473 8310 +1 503 295 0676 ejohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Gabriel Gamez, Defendant
No Logo Lincoln Development Co., Defendant
No Logo Mishey Real Estate, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony D. Kuchulis +1 541 548 6044 +1 541 548 6034 adk@hhw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gordon L. Welborn +1 541 548 6044 +1 541 548 6034 glw@hartwagner.com
No Logo William S. Ouderkirk, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (plb) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTES of Proceedings: Settlement Conference. Case settles. The Clerk is ordered to enter a 60-day Order of Dismissal. Cashauna Hill present as counsel for plaintiff. Gordon Welborn present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Deb Wilhelm. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin presiding. (plb) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER: Granting Motion to Excuse Defendants From Personally Appearing at Settlement Conference and Allow Representatives of Insurers to Appear by Phone 21 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
        Unopposed Motion and Order to Excuse Defendants From Personally Appearing at Settlement Conference and Allow Representatives of Insurers to Appear by Phone. Filed by All Defendants. (Welborn, Gordon) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Settlement Conference is set for 3/28/2011 at 10:00AM in Eugene Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Presence of all parties with settlement authority required. This includes anyone who is to have input on the decision of whether or not to settle the case. Ordered parties to submit settlement document to the court by 12:00PM, 3/24/2011, in which they state realistic proposals they are willing to make or accept to resolve this case. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING SETTLEMENT DOCUMENT. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2011 is vacated. Settlement Conference will be reset at the earliest possible convenience. Denying as Moot Motion to Excuse Defendants from Personally Appearing at Settlement Conference and Allow Representatives of Insurers to Appear by Phone 18 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
              Unopposed Motion to Excuse Defendants from Personally Appearing at Settlement Conference and Allow Representatives of Insurers to Appear by Phone. Filed by All Defendants. (Welborn, Gordon) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Settlement Conference is set for 3/18/2011 at 10:00AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Presence of all parties with settlement authority required. This includes anyone who is to have input on the decision of whether or not to settle the case. Ordered parties to submit settlement document to the court by 12:00PM, 3/14/2011, in which they state realistic proposals they are willing to make or accept to resolve this case. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING SETTLEMENT DOCUMENT. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: Granting Motion for Settlement Conference 15 . The parties are directed to contact Judge Coffin's Courtroom Deputy for scheduling. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                    Unopposed Motion for Settlement Conference. Filed by All Defendants. (Welborn, Gordon) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 13 . Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 4/1/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                        Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint ADR Report and Pretrial Order. Filed by Maribel Beltran Rodriguez. (Johnson, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: Granting Motion for Stipulated Protective Order 11 . Signed on 1/5/2011 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                            Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Filed by All Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Kuchulis, Anthony) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Scheduling Order by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Discovery is to be completed by 3/3/2011. Dispositive Motions are due by 3/3/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Scheduling Order by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Pretrial Documents are due by 7/18/2011, 7/25/2011, and 7/29/2011. Pretrial Conference is set for 8/9/2011 at 11:30AM in Eugene Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. 3 Day Jury Trial is set for 8/24/2011 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                  Joint Status Report and Proposed Discovery Plan. Filed by All Defendants. (Welborn, Gordon) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                    Answer to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand. Filed by Gabriel Gamez, Lincoln Development Co., Mishey Real Estate, William S. Ouderkirk. (Welborn, Gordon) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                      Stipulated Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Maribel Beltran Rodriguez. (Hill, Cashauna) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: Plaintiff moves to proceed in forma pauperis 1 . An examination of the application reveals that plaintiff is unable to afford the costs of this action. Therefore, plaintiff's Application is allowed, subject to further review by the court. This action may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process. Service of the summons and complaint shall be made by the United States Marshal's Service. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (sln) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                          Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by Maribel Beltran Rodriguez. (Hill, Cashauna) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Discovery is to be completed by 12/1/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 12/1/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/3/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 1/3/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (cp) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                              Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes.Filed by Maribel Beltran Rodriguez against Gabriel Gamez, Lincoln Development Co., Mishey Real Estate, William S. Ouderkirk. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cp) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Maribel Beltran Rodriguez. (cp) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?