Trusty v. Cambridge Real Estate Services et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00354
District Judge Anna J. Brown, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 12:44 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Herbert Trusty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Kemper +1 503 648 7163 +1 503 648 0513 heather.kemper@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Johnson +1 503 473 8310 +1 503 295 0676 ejohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen E. Johnson +1 503 648 7163 +1 503 648 0513 eljohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Cambridge Real Estate Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bittner & Hahs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark J. McGranaghan +1 503 445 4304 +1 503 228 8566 mmcgranaghan@bittner-hahs.com
No Logo Jill Picard, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
Order of Dismissal pursuant to LR 41.1 (settlement). Signed on 7/1/2008 by Clerk. (sm) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
    Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Herbert Trusty. (Kemper, Heather) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
      Scheduling Order by Anna J. Brown. Rule 16 Conference is set for 7/2/2008 at 01:30PM in Chambers before Honorable Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, counsel shall hold an initial planning conference as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) to determine the case management schedule they will ask the Court to adopt at the Rule 16 Conference (including deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial), determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26.2. (sm) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
        Answer to Complaint. Filed by Cambridge Real Estate Services, Jill Picard. (McGranaghan, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
          Return of Service Executed as to Jill Picard served on 5/7/2008 Filed by Herbert Trusty. (ecp) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
            Return of Service Executed as to Cambridge Real Estate Services, via J. David Bennett, served on 5/6/2008 Filed by Herbert Trusty. (ecp) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 1 . (copy of this order and forms mailed to plaintiff) Signed on 3/28/08 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                  Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: no.Filed by Herbert Trusty against Cambridge Real Estate Services, Jill Picard. (ljl) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                    Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Herbert Trusty. (ljl) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 389 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?